Dayton Valley Investors, LLC v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Dayton Valley Investors, LLC
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv00127
Filed: January 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 JUDGMENT is hereby entered pursuant to the Courts Order. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/882010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Denying 68 Motion For Order in Limine, consistent with the Courts Order 87 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court declines to impose monetary sanctions related to these motions. Each party shall bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/24/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 76 Counter Motion for Rule11 Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/2/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 41 Motion to Strike; granting 47 Counter Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; granting 36 Motion to Exceed Page Limit; granting 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying 37 Counter Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 10/6/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dayton Valley Investors, LLC v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayton Valley Investors, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?