Hoffman v. Las Vegas Valley Water District
Plaintiff: Miles Hoffman
Defendant: Las Vegas Valley Water District
Case Number: 2:2008cv00173
Filed: February 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that Defendant's insurance representative, Jered Vetramo, need not be personally present, however, shall be available telephonically for the duration of the settlement conference scheduled for 1/26/11 at 1:30pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Referring Case to The Honorable Peggy A. Leen for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/22/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the parties shall file a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by 9/21/2010. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions up to and including a recommendation to the District Judge of case dispositive sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/9/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING 23 parties' Stipulation for an extension of time to file their proposed Joint Pretrial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/31/2009. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/28/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. Las Vegas Valley Water District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Hoffman
Represented By: James R Rosenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Valley Water District
Represented By: James R Rosenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?