TRP Entertainment, LLC v. BC Entertainment, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: TRP Entertainment, LLC
Defendant: BC Entertainment, Inc., Barrie Cunningham and Ian Hammer
Case Number: 2:2008cv00579
Filed: May 7, 2008
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 113 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of TRP Entertainment, LLC and against BC Entertainment, Inc. and Barrie Cunningham in the amount of $52,000.00. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/1/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 11, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in its entirety 103 Report and Recommendation. TRP Entertainment, LLCs Motion to Strike Defendant Barrie Cunninghams 15 Answer to Complaint and for Dispositive Sanctions is GRANTED. Denying as moot 107 Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial. Trial Date set for 7/22/2013 is VACATED. Default Judgment due within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 27, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 82 Motion to Vacate and Reset Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 5/8/2013 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 26, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 75 Motion to Dismiss Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
September 17, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 70 Motion to Stay. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that Plaintiff shall have thirty days from entry of this Order to submit a pre-trial order. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
May 20, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant/Counterclaimant Barrie Cunningham and against Plaintiff/Counterdefendant TRP Entertainment, LLC re 49 Order on 23 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRP Entertainment, LLC v. BC Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRP Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BC Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrie Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?