FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. v. Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.
Defendant: Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. and Bina Shah
Case Number: 2:2008cv01293
Filed: September 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 5, 2012 Filing 199 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 3/5/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Roni Hayes. ORDERED that the bond posted in support of temporary restraining order in the amount of $100.00 receipt 121315, filed April 2, 2010 by plaintiff FilmKraft Production India PVT Ltd. is hereby exonerated and the clerk of court is hereby directed to release said funds to the rightful owner. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance - MMM)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER that the Shah defendants #195 Objection to #194 Proposed second amended final judgment is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/14/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 14, 2011 Filing 197 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. and against Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/14/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 13, 2011 Notice of Docket Correction to #196 Proposed Order Submission: ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney F. Christopher Austin ; CORRECTION: Court modified entry as #196 RESPONSE to 195 Objection to Document. (no image attached)(RFJ)
July 8, 2011 Filing 196 RESPONSE to #195 Objection to Document, filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Austin, F.) Event modified on 7/13/2011 (RFJ).
June 27, 2011 Filing 195 OBJECTION to #194 Proposed Order Submission, ; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah. (Dziminski, Brian)
June 24, 2011 Filing 194 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #192 Proposed Order Submission, ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. [Proposed] Second Amended Final Judgment. (Prunty, Donald)
June 2, 2011 Filing 193 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for [Proposed] Amended Final Judgment by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. re #192 Proposed Order Submission. AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Austin, F.)
June 1, 2011 Filing 192 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER re: #175 ORDER filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. [Proposed] Amended Final Judgment. (Austin, F.) Added document relationship on 6/6/2011 (RFJ).
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER GRANTING #179 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Case is Dismissed as to Defendants Raj Shah and Bina Shah; DENYING #181 Motion for relief from Judgment as to Defendant Spektrum and DENIED as moot as to the Shahs; DENYING #183 Motion to Strike DENYING #187 Motion for Monetary Sanctions in the full amount of the Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 15, 2011 Filing 190 REPLY to Response to #187 MOTION for Sanctions ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Austin, F.)
March 9, 2011 Filing 189 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #187 MOTION for Sanctions ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Setting Date for Filing of Reply Brief. (Austin, F.)
March 7, 2011 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #184 RESPONSE to Motion. ERROR: Document should've been filed as two separate entries by attorney Ronald D. Green in accordance with Special Order 109. CORRECTION: Entry refiled by Court as #187 Counter MOTION for Sanctions. (no image attached)(MJZ)
February 24, 2011 Filing 188 RESPONSE to #187 Counter MOTION for Sanctions; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. (MJZ)
February 24, 2011 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to #181 MOTION Relief from Judgment and to Alter or Amend Judgment ; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. and Response to Plaintiff's Alternative Countermotion to Sanction Raj and Bina Shah (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Dziminski, Brian)
February 24, 2011 Filing 185 RESPONSE to #179 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #183 MOTION to Strike; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C, #2 Exhibit D - G)(Dziminski, Brian) Event type corrected on 3/7/2011. (MJZ)
February 14, 2011 Filing 187 Counter MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. (MJZ)
February 14, 2011 Filing 184 RESPONSE to #181 MOTION Relief from Judgment and to Alter or Amend Judgment, filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Opposition to Motion for Relief from Judgment and Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment; Alternative Countermotion to Sanction Raj and Bina Shah for their Violations of the Preliminary Injunction as Agents of Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. Replies due by 2/24/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald D. Green, #2 Declaration of Rakesh Roshan, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3-5, #6 Exhibit 6-8, #7 Exhibit 9-11, #8 Exhibit 12-13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15-20)(Green, Ronald)
February 10, 2011 Filing 183 MOTION to Strike or, Alternatively, Opposition to Defendants Raj and Bina Shah's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Responses due by 2/27/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rakesh Roshan, #2 Declaration of Ronald D. Green)(Green, Ronald)
January 26, 2011 Filing 181 MOTION Relief from Judgment and to Alter or Amend Judgment by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Responses due by 2/12/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rajivkumar Shah and Beena Shah, #2 Exhibit A through D, #3 Exhibit E through I)(Dziminski, Brian)
January 24, 2011 Filing 180 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. and against Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Bina Shah, and Raj Shah. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 23, 2011 Filing 179 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Responses due by 2/9/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rajivkumar Shah and Beena Shah, #2 Exhibit A through D, #3 Exhibit E through H)(Dziminski, Brian)
January 23, 2011 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian R Dziminski on behalf of Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. (Dziminski, Brian)
January 18, 2011 Filing 177 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. [Proposed] Final Judgment. (Green, Ronald)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER that movant Duane Frizells motion to adjudicate attorneys lien and reduce attorneys lien to judgement #171 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/2/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER that plaintiffs application for entry of default judgment #172 is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff shall prepare and submit an appropriate final judgment for the courts review and signature. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 12, 2010 Filing 174 REPLY to Response to #172 MOTION for Default Judgment Application for Entry of Default Judgment and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs due to Defendants' Contempt Against Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah and Bina Shah ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Reply in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs due to Defendants' Contempt Against Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah and Bina Shah (Prunty, Donald)
September 28, 2010 Filing 173 RESPONSE to #172 MOTION for Default Judgment Application for Entry of Default Judgment and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs due to Defendants' Contempt Against Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah and Bina Shah, filed by Defendants Bina Shah and Raj Shah. Replies due by 10/8/2010. (ASB)
September 14, 2010 Filing 172 MOTION for Default Judgment Application for Entry of Default Judgment and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs due to Defendants' Contempt Against Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah and Bina Shah by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Motion ripe 9/14/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Donald L. Prunty, #2 Exhibit 1-8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10-17, #5 Exhibit 18-22, #6 Exhibit 23-26, #7 Exhibit 27-39)(Prunty, Donald)
August 10, 2010 Filing 171 MOTION Adjudicate Attorney's Lien and Reduce Attorney's Lien to Judgment re #170 Certificate of Service, #147 Notice of Claim FILED FOR AND BY ROBERT DUANE FRIZELL OF THE LAW FIRM CALLISTER & FRIZELL by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Responses due by 8/27/2010. (Frizell, Robert)
August 10, 2010 Filing 170 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for NOTICE AND CLAIM OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN PURSUANT TO NRS 18.015 [DOC 147] by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. re #147 Notice of Claim. FILED FOR AND BY ROBERT DUANE FRIZELL OF THE LAW FIRM OF CALLISTER & FRIZELL (Frizell, Robert)
August 2, 2010 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 158 Show Cause Hearing held on 6/23/2010, before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: NW Transcripts, LLC, 208-466-4148. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2010. (ABB)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Granting #167 Motion to Withdraw #100 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/26/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 22, 2010 Filing 167 WITHDRAWAL of Motion re #100 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Defendants should not be held in Contempt for Violations of this Court's Discovery Orders and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure ; by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying as moot Defendants Bina and Raj Shah's #157 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Se on Behalf of Spektrum Entertainment. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/12/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER that on or before 7/22/10, Plaintiff is required to show cause why the #100 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Defendants should not be held in Contempt for Violations of this Court's Discovery Orders and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure should not be denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/12/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 9, 2010 Filing 164 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bina Shah, Raj Shah, and Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. (ASB)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #137 Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause. #25 and #29 Answers and Counterclaims are stricken. Default judgment is entered against defendants. #126 Preliminary Injunction is hereby converted to a permanent injunction. Defendants shall pay Plaintiff's reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred in connection with the filing of the instant action, enforcing the orders of this Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) Modified to remove document #30 as a stricken document on 7/9/2010. NEF Regenerated. (ASB)
July 2, 2010 Filing 162 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt of Court for their Violations of the Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
June 28, 2010 Filing 161 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 6/28/2010 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: David Oakes; Pla Counsel: Don Prunty, Joseph Gutierrez; Def Counsel: None appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joy Garner; Time of Hearing: 11:00 am.; Courtroom: 6A; Mr. Prunty makes representations to the court. COURT ORDEREDthat defendant's are in contempt, and stated the court will enter a default judgment against defendants. FURTHER ORDERED: Defendant's counter-claim is STRICKEN. Court made two exhibits the plaintiff submitted. Court exhibit 1 and 2. Submission of Proposed Order obo plaintiff's is due by 7/2/2010.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
June 28, 2010 Filing 160 RESPONSE to #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Defendants Bina Shah and Raj Shah. (ASB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2010: #1 Part 2 of 2) (ASB).
June 24, 2010 Filing 159 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE [#154] re Contempt of Court for Violating Preliminary Injunction and RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE [#100] by Defendants Bina Shah and Raj Shah re Contempt of Court for Violating Court's Discovery Orders and Code of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(ECS) Docket entry relationship corrected on 6/28/2010. (MJZ)
June 23, 2010 Filing 158 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 6/23/2010 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Donald Prunty, Ronald Green; Def Counsel: pro se defendant appearing telephonically: Bina Shaw; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:34:21-10:50:25; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 3A;The Court makes preliminary remarks and inquires as to the status of production of documents from Defendants to Plaintiff. The Court hears the representations of Counsel and Ms. Shaw. Regarding Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Se on behalf of Spektrum Entertainment #157 , the Court advises Ms. Shaw that under Federal Law a corporation must have counsel and that if Spektrum does not retain counsel the Court must strike Spektrum's answer and enter default.It is ordered that Plaintiff shall file as a supplement to the Motion #100 the documents that were produced to them from Defendants through January 2010. The Court takes Plaintiff's Motion #100 under submission and will issue a written decision. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES) Modified on 6/23/2010 (DES).
June 22, 2010 Filing 157 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Se on Behalf of Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. by Defendants Bina Shah and Raj Shah. Motion ripe 6/22/2010. (ASB)
June 21, 2010 Filing 156 REPLY to Response to #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt of Court for their Violations of the Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
June 18, 2010 Filing 155 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendants Bina Shah and Raj Shah. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2)(ASB)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Granting #137 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/28/2010 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER that defendants cease faxing and/or emailing their pleadings and motions to the Court. Any pleadings that Defendants wish to file shall be filed with the Clerk of Court in person or through the U.S. Mail. Defendants are to cease engaging in ex parte communication with the Court, which is any communication that is not also served upon the other parties in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/14/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 11, 2010 Filing 152 EXHIBIT(s) to Response to #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause ; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24)(MJZ)
June 11, 2010 Filing 151 EXHIBIT(s) to Response to #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause ; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibit 15, #4 Exhibit 16, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 19)(MJZ)
June 11, 2010 Filing 150 EXHIBIT(s) to Response to #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause ; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 (Part 2), #2 Exhibit 8 (Part 3), #3 Exhibit 8 (Part 4), #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11 (Part 1), #7 Exhibit 11 (Part 2), #8 Exhibit 11 (Part 3), #9 Exhibit 11 (Part 4))(MJZ)
June 11, 2010 Filing 149 EXHIBIT(s) to Response to #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause ; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7 (Part 1), #4 Exhibit 7 (Part 2), #5 Exhibit 7 (Part 3), #6 Exhibit 7 (Part 4), #7 Exhibit 7 (Part 5))(MJZ)
June 11, 2010 Filing 148 RESPONSE to #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause ; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah. (Attachments: #1 Fax Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), #5 Exhibit 3 (Part 2))(MJZ)
June 11, 2010 Filing 147 NOTICE OF CLAIM Notice and Claim of Attorney's Lien Pursuant to NRS 18.015 by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. (Frizell, Robert)
June 8, 2010 Filing 146 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. [Proposed] Order to Show Cause. (Green, Ronald)
June 7, 2010 Filing 145 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2010 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: David Oakes; Pla Counsel: Ronald Green, Donald Prunty; Def Counsel: None Appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joy Garner; Time of Hearing: 10:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 6B; granting #137 Motion for Order to Show Cause.; ( Submission of Proposed Order due containing an order to show cause hearing date due by 6/14/2010.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
June 7, 2010 Filing 144 DECLARATION of Shashank Jare re #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause; by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald) Docket entry relationship added on 6/9/2010. (MJZ)
June 4, 2010 Filing 143 Supplemental BRIEF re #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt of Court for their Violations of the Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Supplement to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Defendants should not be held in Contempt of Court for their Violations of the Preliminary Injunction (Green, Ronald)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER that Defendants Motion for an Extension of Time to Retain Counsel #141 is denied. Defendants Request for Appointment of Counsel #141 is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/2/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 1, 2010 Filing 141 MOTION to Extend Time to Retain Counsel by Defendants. Motion ripe 6/1/2010. (EDS)
May 26, 2010 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. re #110 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Green, Ronald)
May 26, 2010 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Emergency Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt of Court for their Violations of the Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. re #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause Emergency Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt of Court for their Violations of the Preliminary Injunction. (Green, Ronald)
May 21, 2010 Filing 138 NOTICE of Hearing on #137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause Emergency Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt of Court for their Violations of the Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2010 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. (no image attached)(SRB)
May 20, 2010 Filing 137 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt of Court for their Violations of the Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Motion ripe 5/20/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Green, Ronald) .
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting #134 Defendant Bina Shah's Motion to Extend Time to Retain Counsel. Defendants shall have until 6/2/10 to retain new counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk serve Defendants with a copy of this Order at their last known address. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing re #100 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Defendants should not be held in Contempt for Violations of this Court's Discovery Orders and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is RESET for 6/23/2010 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Defendants have until 6/11/10 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for order to show case. Plaintiff will have until 6/18/10 to reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/14/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -cc: defendants - EDS)
May 5, 2010 Filing 135 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. RE: Plaintiffs shall have until Wednesday, May 12, 2010 to file any opposition to #134 Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.'s MOTION to Extend Time, should they choose to do so. (Entered 05/05/10) (no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - REO)
May 5, 2010 Filing 134 MOTION to Extend Time to Retain Counsel by Defendant Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. Motion ripe 5/5/2010. (ASB)
April 19, 2010 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for ORDER [DOC NO. 129] by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. re #129 Order (Frizell, Robert) Modified text on 4/23/2010 (SRK).
April 16, 2010 Filing 132 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Order Granting Motion to Withdraw [Doc 131] by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. re #131 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,. (Frizell, Robert)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting #112 Attorney Robert Duane Frizell's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Defendants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, and Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. Defendants Raj Shah and Bina Shah shall have until 5/5/10 to advise the court if they will retain new counsel. Defendant Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. must retain new counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall add the last known addresses of Defendants as listed in Order to the civil docket and serve Defendants with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: defendants - EDS)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Setting Hearing on #100 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Defendants should not be held in Contempt for Violations of this Court's Discovery Orders and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure : ( Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2010 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr..) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
April 14, 2010 Filing 128 SUPPLEMENT to #112 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney OF RECORD (EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED) by Robert Duane Frizell; by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. (Frizell, Robert)
April 13, 2010 Filing 127 LETTER from Bina Shah re: Participation in Case. (ASB)
April 13, 2010 Filing 126 PERMANENT INJUNCTION Granting #110 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/13/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) Document converted to a Permanent Injunction on 7/9/2010 per #163 Order. (ASB)
April 13, 2010 Filing 125 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. [Proposed] Preliminary Injunction. (Prunty, Donald)
April 12, 2010 Filing 130 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2010 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: David Oakes; Pla Counsel: Ronald Green, Donald Prunty; Def Counsel: Robert Duane Frizell; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joy Garner; Time of Hearing: 2:00 p.m.; Courtroom: 6A; Court Granted: #110 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
April 7, 2010 Filing 124 REPLY to Response to #110 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration Donald L. Prunty, #2 Exhibit 1-5)(Prunty, Donald)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Denying #115 Motion to Extend Time to File Response and to Continue Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/7/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 5, 2010 Filing 122 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for April 5, 2010 Court Minutes by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF APRIL 5, 2010 COURT MINUTES ON DEFENDANTS, BINA SHAH, RAJ SHAH, AND SPEKTRUM ENTERTAINMENT, INC. (Frizell, Robert)
April 5, 2010 Filing 121 RESPONSE to #110 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Replies due by 4/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Frizell, Robert)
April 5, 2010 Filing 120 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing on Mr. Frizzell's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record #112 and Defendants' Motion #114 to Extend Time to File Response and to Continue Hearing on Motion #100 for Order to Show Cause held on 4/5/2010 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Ronald Green, Donald Prunty; Def Counsel: Robert Duane Frizzell, Jonathan Callister; Court Reporter/FTR #: 2:37:37-2:51:36; Time of Hearing: 2:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 3A; Representations of counsel heard. It is ordered that Defendants have one week from today's date in which to file a response to Mr. Frizzell's Motion to Withdraw #112 . The Court will then issue a written Order on the Motion #112 . If the Motion #112 is granted, the Court will set new deadlines for a response to the Motion for an Order to Show Cause #100 . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
April 2, 2010 Filing 119 NOTICE of Hearing on #114 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO (AND CONTINUE HEARING ON) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SECOND REQUEST) re #100 MOTION and #112 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney OF RECORD (EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED) by Robert Duane Frizell : Motion Hearing set for Monday, April 5, 2010, at 2:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
April 2, 2010 Filing 118 CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit as to FilmKraft Production India PVT Ltd.: $ 100, receipt number 121315. (ASB)
April 1, 2010 Filing 117 RESPONSE to #115 First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter, filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. Replies due by 4/11/2010. (Green, Ronald) Docket entry relationship corrected on 4/2/2010. (MJZ)
March 31, 2010 Filing 116 RESPONSE to #114 Second MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to (and to Continue Hearing on) #100 MOTION for Order to Show Cause ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald) Modified to correct linkage per cnsl on 4/1/2010 (LMC). Docket entry relationship and event type corrected on 4/5/2010 (SRK).
March 31, 2010 Filing 115 First MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to (and to Continue Hearing on) #110 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Motion ripe 3/31/2010. (Frizell, Robert) Modified text on 4/5/2010 (SRK).
March 31, 2010 Filing 114 Second MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to (and to Continue Hearing on) #100 MOTION for Order to Show Cause; by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Motion ripe 3/31/2010. (Frizell, Robert) Modified text on 4/5/2010 (SRK).
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. #110 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Deadlines: Responses due by 4/5/2010. Replies due by 4/7/2010. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2010 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/31/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 31, 2010 Filing 112 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney OF RECORD (EXPEDITED RULING REQUESTED) by Robert Duane Frizell. by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Motion ripe 3/31/2010. (Frizell, Robert)
March 30, 2010 Filing 111 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. [Proposed] Temporary Restraining Order. (Green, Ronald)
March 30, 2010 Filing 110 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Responses due by 4/16/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ronald D. Green, #2 Exhibit 1 to 11, #3 Exhibit 12 to 19, #4 Exhibit 20 to 24, #5 Exhibit 25 (part 1), #6 Exhibit 25 (part 2), #7 Exhibit 26 to 30, #8 Exhibit 31 to 32)(Prunty, Donald)
March 29, 2010 Filing 109 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Motion ripe 3/29/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ronald D. Green, #2 Exhibit 1 to 11, #3 Exhibit 12 to 19, #4 Exhibit 20 to 24, #5 Exhibit 25 (part 1), #6 Exhibit 25 (part 2), #7 Exhibit 26 to 30, #8 Exhibit 31 to 32)(Prunty, Donald)
March 25, 2010 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 104 Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2010, before Judge James C. Mahan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joy Garner, 702-384-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2010. (ABB)
March 19, 2010 Filing 107 RESPONSE to #105 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Replies due by 3/29/2010. (Green, Ronald) Docket entry relationship modified on 3/23/2010 (SRK).
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting #105 Motion to Extend Time to File Response and to Continue Hearing re: #100 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Responses due by 4/5/2010. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2010 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/19/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 18, 2010 Filing 105 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO (AND CONTINUE HEARING ON) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Motion ripe 3/18/2010. (Frizell, Robert)
March 10, 2010 Filing 104 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2010 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: David Oakes; Pla Counsel: Donald Prunty, Ronald Green; Def Counsel: Robert Duane Frizell; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joy Garner; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 6A; Representations of counsel are heard. COURT ORDERED: denying #49 without prejudice Motion for Summary Judgment. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting #101 Motion for Leave to File Response to #100 Motion for Order to Show Cause. (Responses due by 3/21/2010.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 8, 2010 Filing 102 NOTICE of Hearing on #100 Plaintiff's MOTION for an Order to Show Cause why Defendants should not be held in Contempt for Violations of this Court's Discovery Orders and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure : Motion Hearing set for Monday, April 5, 2010, at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
March 5, 2010 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to File RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Motion ripe 3/5/2010. (Frizell, Robert)
March 4, 2010 Filing 100 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Defendants should not be held in Contempt for Violations of this Court's Discovery Orders and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Motion ripe 3/4/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ronald Green, #2 Exhibit 1 to 9, #3 Exhibit 10 to 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16 to 20)(Green, Ronald)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #98 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motions to Seal Transcripts and for Rebuttal Expert Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/23/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 22, 2010 Filing 98 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTIONS TO SEAL TRANSCRIPTS (SECOND REQUEST) AND FOR REBUTTAL EXPERT DISCLOSURES (THIRD REQEUST). (Frizell, Robert)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #96 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motions to Seal Transcripts and for Rebuttal Expert Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 11, 2010 Filing 96 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. OF STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTIONS TO SEAL TRANSCRIPTS (FIRST REQUEST) AND FOR REBUTTAL EXPERT DISCLOSURES (SECOND REQUEST). (Frizell, Robert)
February 9, 2010 Filing 95 NOTICE of Hearing on #49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding its Claims for Breach of Contract and Conversion and for Summary Judgment or Dismissal of Defendants' Counterclaims : Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2010 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. (no image attached)(SRB)
February 2, 2010 Filing 94 NOTICE by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. (Frizell, Robert)
February 2, 2010 Filing 93 NOTICE by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. (Frizell, Robert)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting in Part #88 Motion to Extend Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 2/15/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 26, 2010 Filing 91 RESPONSE to #88 MOTION to Extend Time regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline, filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Extend Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline Replies due by 2/5/2010. (Green, Ronald)
January 26, 2010 Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 1/26/2010. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. RE: #88 Defendants' MOTION to Extend Time regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' Motion #88 not later than Thursday, January 28, 2010. If no opposition is filed, the court will grant Defendants' motion. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
January 22, 2010 Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/5/2010 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: NW Transcripts, LLC, 208-466-4148. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2010. (ABB)
January 19, 2010 Filing 88 MOTION to Extend Time regarding Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline (EXPEDITED HEARING/RULING REQUESTED) by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Motion ripe 1/19/2010. (Frizell, Robert)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Denying as Moot #64 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/14/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 5, 2010 Filing 86 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing on Motions (65, 66, 71) held on 1/5/2010 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Donald Prunty, Ronald Green; Def Counsel: Robert Frizell; Court Reporter/FTR #: 2:35:54-3:13:28; Time of Hearing: 2:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks regarding the pending Motions (65, 66, 71) and hears the representations of counsel. Rule 36 generally provides that a Court may, and generally should, exercise its discretion to allow deemed admissions to be withdrawn where: 1) refusing to do so would preclude a trial on the merits; and 2) the requesting party's ability to present its case or defense is not prejudiced. The Court finds that Plaintiffs have not shown their ability to present their case would be prejudiced, accordingly, Defendants' Motion to Clarify Status of Their Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions #65 is granted. The Court allows Defendants deemed admissions to be withdrawn and further allows Defendants to serve its responses to requests for admissions. To the extent Plaintiff believes there is certain discovery that they now need to obtain in view of the admissions being withdrawn, the Court will grant reasonable disocvery to cover those matters. Defendants' Motion to Reopen Discovery #66 is denied. The Court finds that during the entire discovery period, including the extensions of discovery granted by the Court, the Defendants essentially failed to engage and pursue actively in any discovery as they were obligated to do under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.Defendants' Motion to Extend the Expert Disclosure Deadline #71 is granted to the extent that the designation of Defendants' Rebuttal Expert is due by February 1, 2010.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/5/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 4, 2010 Filing 84 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. Proposed Protective Order. (Green, Ronald)
December 30, 2009 Filing 83 RESPONSE to #71 MOTION to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Replies due by 1/9/2010. (Green, Ronald)
December 28, 2009 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to #66 MOTION Motion to Re-Open Discovery ; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Sub-Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Sub-Exhibit 2 (1 of 2), #4 Exhibit Sub-Exhibit 2 (2 of 2), #5 Exhibit Sub-Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Sub-Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit Sub-Exhibit A)(Frizell, Robert)
December 28, 2009 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to #64 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter re #49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding its Claims for Breach of Contract and Conversion and for Summary Judgment or Dismissal of Defendants' Counterclaims; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. (Frizell, Robert) Modified text on 1/12/2010 (SRK).
December 28, 2009 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to #65 MOTION To Clarify Status ; filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. (Frizell, Robert) .
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting #73 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Exhibit 6, part 3 and Exhibit 7 of #69 Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/21/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 18, 2009 Filing 78 RESPONSE to #66 MOTION Motion to Re-Open Discovery, filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Opposition to Motion to Reopen Discovery Replies due by 12/28/2009. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ronald D. Green, #2 Exhibit 1-5, #3 Exhibit 6-16)(Green, Ronald)
December 18, 2009 Filing 77 RESPONSE to #65 MOTION To Clarify Status, filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Opposition to Motion to Clarify Status of Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admission Replies due by 12/28/2009. (Green, Ronald)
December 18, 2009 Filing 76 RESPONSE to #64 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter re #49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding its Claims for Breach of Contract and Conversion and for Summary Judgment or Dismissal of Defendants' Counterclaims; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Opposition to Motion to Continue Summary Judgment Proceedings Replies due by 12/28/2009. (Green, Ronald) Modified text on 1/12/2010 (SRK).
December 17, 2009 Filing 75 ADDENDUM to #69 Reply to Response to Motion,,, ; by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 (part 3), #2 Exhibit 7 (part 1), #3 Exhibit 7 (part 2))(Green, Ronald)
December 17, 2009 Filing 74 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #73 MOTION to Seal #69 Reply to Response to Motion,,, Motion to Seal Portions of the Exhibits to the Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION to Seal #69 Reply to Response to Motion,,, Motion to Seal Portions of the Exhibits to the Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
December 16, 2009 Filing 73 MOTION to Seal #69 Reply to Response to Motion,,, Motion to Seal Portions of the Exhibits to the Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Motion ripe 12/16/2009. (Green, Ronald)
December 16, 2009 Filing 72 NOTICE of Hearing on #71 Defendants' MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter Expert Disclosure Deadline : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, January 5, 2010, at 2:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBH)
December 15, 2009 Filing 71 MOTION to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Motion ripe 12/15/2009. (Frizell, Robert)
December 15, 2009 Filing 70 NOTICE of Hearing on #66 Defendants' MOTION to Re-Open Discovery, #65 Defendants' MOTION To Clarify Status : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, January 5, 2010, at 2:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBH)
December 14, 2009 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to #49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding its Claims for Breach of Contract and Conversion and for Summary Judgment or Dismissal of Defendants' Counterclaims ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rakesh Roshan, #2 Exhibit 1-5, #3 Exhibit 6 (part 1), #4 Exhibit 6 (part 2), #5 SEALEDExhibit 6 (part 3), #6 SEALEDExhibit 7 (part 1), #7SEALED Exhibit 7 (part 2), #8 SEALEDExhibit 7 (part 3), #9 SEALEDExhibit 7 (part 4), #10 Exhibit 8-11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20-25)(Green, Ronald)
December 10, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. OF DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY DISCLOSURES AND COPIES OF PASSPORTS FOR INSPECTION ONLY (Frizell, Robert)
November 30, 2009 Filing 67 RESPONSE to #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding its Claims for Breach of Contract and Conversion and for Summary Judgment or Dismissal of Defendants' Counterclaims, filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Replies due by 12/14/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Frizell, Robert)
November 30, 2009 Filing 66 MOTION Motion to Re-Open Discovery by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Responses due by 12/18/2009. (Frizell, Robert)
November 30, 2009 Filing 65 MOTION To Clarify Status filed by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Responses due by 12/18/2009. (Frizell, Robert) Modified text to reflect correct Motion title on 12/1/2009 (RFJ).
November 30, 2009 Filing 64 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter re #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding its Claims for Breach of Contract and Conversion and for Summary Judgment or Dismissal of Defendants' Counterclaims by Defendants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Counter Claimants Bina Shah, Raj Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Motion ripe 11/30/2009. (Frizell, Robert)
November 25, 2009 Filing 63 NOTICE by Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY DISCLOSURES AND RESPONES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS (Frizell, Robert)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting #55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Theodore Parker III withdrawn as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/25/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 24, 2009 Filing 61 NOTICE by Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY DISCLOSURES AND RESPONSES (Frizell, Robert)
November 19, 2009 Filing 60 NOTICE by Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah Notice and Claim of Attorney's Lien Pursuant to NRS 18.015 (Parker III, Theodore)
November 17, 2009 Filing 59 NOTICE by Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY PRODUCTION AND DISCLOSURES AND COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S ORDER TO COMPEL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Frizell, Robert)
November 16, 2009 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 51 Motion to Compel Hearing held on 10/15/2009, before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: NW Transcripts, LLC, 208-466-4148. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2010. (ABB)
November 13, 2009 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Duane Frizell on behalf of Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah. (Frizell, Robert)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting #53 Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to #49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/30/2009. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/30/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 3, 2009 Filing 55 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Theodore Parker and Parker Nelson & Associates motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Theodore Parker, III, Esq.. by Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah. Motion ripe 11/3/2009. (Parker III, Theodore)
October 29, 2009 Filing 54 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #53 First MOTION (First Request) to Extend Time to File Opposition to #49 MOTION for Summary JudgmentFirst MOTION (First Request) to Extend Time to File Opposition to #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah Proposed Order. (Parker III, Theodore)
October 26, 2009 Filing 53 First MOTION (First Request) to Extend Time to File Opposition to #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment; by Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah. Motion ripe 10/26/2009. (Parker III, Theodore) Modified text on 10/27/2009 (SRK).
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that Defendants shall provide to Plaintiff within 15 days passport travel information of the Shaws since discovery requests were served. Plaintiff may thereafter file a supplement request for an award of attorney fees and costs on the motion, if warranted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/19/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 15, 2009 Filing 51 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #46 held on 10/15/2009 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Ronald Green and Donald Prunty; Def Counsel: Robert Sparks; Court Reporter/FTR #: 1:44:38-1:56:11; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 3C; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears the representations of counsel. Plaintiff's #46 Motion to Compel is granted. The Court overrules the objections as both untimely and in terms of relevance. Defendants shall provide full and complete responses to the requests for production of documents without objections by November 16, 2009. The expert witness disclosure deadline is extended until December 16, 2009. As stated on the record, the Court will award attorney fees and costs and may impose additional sanctions if a review of the Shaws' passports reflect they have been traveling to/from the United States during the intervening period. Plaintiff's request to depose the Shaws is granted. At this time, defendant's request to depose plaintiffs or their personnel is denied. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
October 9, 2009 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to #46 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendant FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
October 6, 2009 Filing 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding its Claims for Breach of Contract and Conversion and for Summary Judgment or Dismissal of Defendants' Counterclaims; by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Responses due by 10/24/2009. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rakesh Roshan, #2 Declaration Ronald D. Green, Jr., #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11 (part 1), #13 Exhibit 11 (part 2), #14 Exhibit 11 (part 3), #15 Exhibit 11 (part 4), #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14)(Green, Ronald) .
September 25, 2009 Filing 48 RESPONSE to #46 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, filed by Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah. Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents Replies due by 10/9/2009. (Parker III, Theodore)
September 15, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE of Hearing on #46 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for Thursday, October 15, 2009, at 1:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBH)
September 8, 2009 Filing 46 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Responses due by 9/26/2009. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald D. Green, #2 Declaration of Cynthia Ney)(Green, Ronald)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #44 Stipulation to Amend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/7/2009. Motions due by 10/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/27/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 20, 2009 Filing 44 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Amend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. (Second Request). (Green, Ronald) .
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #35 Motion to Compel Written Discovery. Defendants shall serve responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests within 10 days of the entry of this Order; Plaintiff's request for sanctions is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #40 Counter-Motion to Withdraw Answers is DENIED. The hearing on the instant motion and countermotion scheduled for 7/16/09 at 9:30 am is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/15/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 6, 2009 Filing 42 RESPONSE to #40 MOTION to Withdraw Answers of Defendants' Raj Shah and Bina Shah, filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Replies due by 7/20/2009. (Green, Ronald)
June 30, 2009 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to #35 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Written Discovery ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Written Discovery (Green, Ronald)
June 24, 2009 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #39 Response to Motion: ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate entries by Attorney Theodore Parker III; CORRECTION: Court refiled Counter-Motion portion of document as #40 COUNTER-MOTION to Withdraw Answers . (no image attached)(SRK)
June 16, 2009 Filing 40 Counter-MOTION to Withdraw Answers of Defendants' Raj Shah and Bina Shah; filed by Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah. Responses due by 7/4/2009. (SRK)
June 16, 2009 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #35 Motion to Compel Written Discovery and Coutermotion to Withdraw Answers of Defendants' Raj and Bina Shah filed by Counter Claimants Raj Shah, Bina Shah, Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Defendants Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah. Replies due by 6/30/2009. (Parker III, Theodore) Docket entry relationship modified on 6/24/2009 (SRK).
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting #37 Motion to Extend Time for Disclosure of Experts. The Court will set a new deadline for expert disclosures once it decides #35 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/15/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 8, 2009 Filing 37 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Deadline for Disclosure of Experts by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendants FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Motion ripe 6/8/2009. (Green, Ronald)
June 3, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE of Hearing on #35 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Defendant's Written Discovery : Motion Hearing set for Thursday, July 16, 2009, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George W Foley Jr.(JBH)
May 29, 2009 Filing 35 MOTION to Compel Defendant's Written Discovery by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendant FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Responses due by 6/16/2009. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ronald D. Green)(Green, Ronald)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #33 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling. ( Discovery due by 8/7/2009, Motions due by 9/6/2009, Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/7/2009.) Absent compelling circumstances and strong showing of good cause, no further extensions of the discovery deadlines will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 04/09/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
April 8, 2009 Filing 33 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Amend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. (Green, Ronald)
April 8, 2009 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT Joint Interim Status Report by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
March 4, 2009 Filing 31 REPLY to #29 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim ; FilmKraft Productions India PVT, Ltd.'s Answer to Raj Shah and Bina Shah's Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd., Counter Defendant FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
February 23, 2009 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint FilmKraft Productions India PVT, Ltd.'s Answer to Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.'s Counterclaim filed by FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/5/2009. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/9/2009.(Green, Ronald)
February 9, 2009 Filing 29 STRICKEN per #163 Order. (ASB) ANSWER to #1 Complaint ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/19/2009., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/26/2009.), COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs filed by Raj Shah, Bina Shah.(Parker III, Theodore)
February 9, 2009 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Bina Shah served on 12/20/2008, answer due 1/9/2009. (Green, Ronald)
February 9, 2009 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Raj Shah served on 12/20/2008, answer due 1/9/2009. (Green, Ronald)
January 29, 2009 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., Raj Shah, Bina Shah.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Parker III, Theodore) Modified filing parties information on 2/2/2009 (MAJ).
January 29, 2009 Filing 25 STRICKEN per #163 Order. (ASB) ANSWER to #1 Complaint ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/8/2009., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/15/2009.), COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs filed by Spektrum Entertainment, Inc..(Parker III, Theodore)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #11 . Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. answer due 10 days from the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/20/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
January 12, 2009 Filing 23 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc.12(b)(3) ; filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. denying Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(3). (Green, Ronald)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 6/8/2009. Motions due by 7/8/2009. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 1/5/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - OXC)
January 5, 2009 Filing 21 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 1/5/2009 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Ronald Green and Donald Prunty; Def Counsel: Theodore Parker III; Court Reporter/FTR #: Peggie Vannozzi; Time of Hearing: 10:30 AM - 10:45 AM; Courtroom: 6D; Mr. Parker and Mr. Green present arguments to the Court. The Court denies #11 Motion to Dismiss. Submission of Proposed Order due by 1/20/2009. Answer due within 10 days of the filing of the proposed order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
December 26, 2008 Filing 20 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. and Defendant Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. (Green, Ronald)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERdenying #15 Motion to Stay. Parties are to submit a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order or their separate request for a DiscoveryPlan and Scheduling Order by 12/31/2008. ( Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/31/2008.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 12/22/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - OXC)
December 19, 2008 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Stay re #14 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings, of Magistrate's Order Requiring the Filing of a Stipulated Discovery Plan MOTION to Stay re #14 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings, of Magistrate's Order Requiring the Filing of a Stipulated Discovery Plan, filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Opposition to Motion for Stay of Magistrate's Order Requiring the Filing of a Stipulated Discovery Plan Replies due by 1/2/2009. (Green, Ronald)
December 11, 2008 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing on #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc.12(b)(3) : Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2009 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. (no image attached)(SRB)
December 11, 2008 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr, on 12/11/2008. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Hill. RE: #15 MOTION to Stay re #14 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings, of Magistrate's Order Requiring the Filing of a Stipulated Discovery Plan --IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff respond to this motion by December 19, 2008. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will temporarily stay the order to file a Discovery Plan pending a decision on Defendant's Motion to Stay (#15). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBH)
December 10, 2008 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay re #14 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings, of Magistrate's Order Requiring the Filing of a Stipulated Discovery Plan by Defendant Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Motion ripe 12/10/2008. (Parker III, Theodore)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than December 11, 2008 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. ( Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/11/2008.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 12/2/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - OXC)
November 12, 2008 Filing 13 REPLY RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc.12(b)(3), filed by Defendant Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Reply in Support of Motion To Dismiss Replies due by 11/26/2008. (Parker III, Theodore) Modified DOCKET TYPE on 11/14/2008 (MAJ).
November 3, 2008 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc.12(b)(3), filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Pursurant to FRCP 12(b)(3) Replies due by 11/17/2008. (Green, Ronald)
October 15, 2008 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc.12(b)(3) by Defendant Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. Responses due by 11/2/2008. (Parker III, Theodore)
October 6, 2008 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Identifying Corporate Parent Rakesh Rashad for FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
September 29, 2008 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. served on 9/26/2008, answer due 10/16/2008. (Green, Ronald)
September 25, 2008 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bina Shah. (OXC)
September 25, 2008 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Raj Shah. (OXC)
September 25, 2008 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.. (OXC)
September 25, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #link. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (OXC)
September 25, 2008 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (OXC)
September 25, 2008 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Bina Shah, filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
September 25, 2008 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Raj Shah, filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
September 25, 2008 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Spektrum Entertainment, Inc., filed by Plaintiff FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. (Green, Ronald)
September 25, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 09780000000001005127), filed by FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/5/2008. Proof of service due by 1/23/2009.(Green, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd. v. Spektrum Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raj Shah
Represented By: Theodore Parker III
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Represented By: Brian R Dziminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spektrum Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Parker III
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Represented By: Brian R Dziminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bina Shah
Represented By: Theodore Parker III
Represented By: Robert Duane Frizell
Represented By: Brian R Dziminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FilmKraft Productions India PVT Ltd.
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Donald L Prunty
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Mark G Tratos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?