S. Parker Construction, Inc. v. Suntex Homes, LLC et al
Plaintiff: S. Parker Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Suntex Homes, LLC, Sierra Ridge Ventures, LLC and NU-CO-BB-I, LLC
Consol Claimant: Sierra Ridge Ventures, LLC, S. Parker Construction, Inc., Brent D. Butcher, Michael J. Lichtie, ANB FINANCIAL, N.A. and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as receiver for ANB Financial, N.A.
Consol Defendant: Barry Parker Construction, Inc.
Consol Third Party Defendant: Scott Barry, Sean Barry, Barry Shane and Heath H. Snow
Case Number: 2:2008cv01439
Filed: October 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Banks and Banking Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/22/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting 90 Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Defendant Michael J. Lichtie. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER that Plaintiff/Fourth Party Plaintiff, S. Parker Construction, Inc. dba Barry Parker Construction, and Third Party Defendants, Sean Barry, Shane Barry, and Scott Barry shall file a Motion to Dismiss or Stipulation to Dismiss no later than 4/29/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/29/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Denying S. Parker Construction, Inc's 54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 56 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting Motion to Strike 69 Answer and 70 Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint. Defendants Suntext Homes, LLC, Sierra Ridge, LLC, and NU-CO-BB-I, LLC's answers are stricken and default shall be entered against them. Sierr Ridge, LLC's counterclaim and third-party complaint be, and the same hereby are, dismissed. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Denying without Prejudice 61 Motion to Strike Sierra Ridge Ventures, LLCs Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on this matter presently scheduled for Tuesday,August 31, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/26/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 55 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/30/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. Parker Construction, Inc. v. Suntex Homes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Parker Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Ladine Oravetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntex Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Ridge Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NU-CO-BB-I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol claimant: Sierra Ridge Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol claimant: S. Parker Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol claimant: Brent D. Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol claimant: Michael J. Lichtie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol claimant: ANB FINANCIAL, N.A.
Represented By: Heath H. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol claimant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as receiver for ANB Financial, N.A.
Represented By: Heath H. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol defendant: Barry Parker Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol third party defendant: Scott Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol third party defendant: Sean Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol third party defendant: Barry Shane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol third party defendant: Heath H. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?