October 13, 2023 |
Filing 1154
MOTION to Reopen Case by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. Responses due by 10/27/2023. (Dwiggins, Dana)
|
September 18, 2023 |
Filing 1153
ORDERED that this case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED without prejudice to reopening upon a motion by either Party. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/18/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
July 12, 2023 |
Filing 1152
Second STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants Second Quarter 2023 Status Report by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC.. (Dwiggins, Dana)
|
April 10, 2023 |
Filing 1151
First STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' First Quarter 2023 Status Report by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC.. (Dwiggins, Dana)
|
January 23, 2023 |
Filing 1150
Fourth STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' Fourth Quarter 2022 by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC.. (Dwiggins, Dana)
|
January 23, 2023 |
Filing 1149
Third STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendant's Third Quarter 2022 by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC.. (Dwiggins, Dana)
|
July 22, 2022 |
Filing 1148
Second STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants Second Quarter 2022 Status Report by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC.. (Dwiggins, Dana)
|
April 14, 2022 |
Filing 1147
First STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' First Quarter 2022 Status Report by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Dwiggins, Dana)
|
January 10, 2022 |
Filing 1146
Fourth STATUS REPORT by Defendant Maryland Square, LLC. (Dwiggins, Dana)
|
October 19, 2021 |
Filing 1145
Third STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' Third Quarter 2021 Status Report by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Solomon, Mark)
|
July 20, 2021 |
Filing 1144
Second STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants Second Quarter 2021 Status Report by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Solomon, Mark)
|
April 13, 2021 |
Filing 1143
First STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants First Quarter 2021 Status Report by Counter Claimant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Solomon, Mark)
|
January 13, 2021 |
Filing 1142
Fourth STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendant's Fourth Quarter 2020 Status Report by Counter Claimant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Solomon, Mark)
|
October 27, 2020 |
Filing 1141
Third STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants Third Quarter 2020 Status Report by Counter Claimant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Solomon, Mark)
|
July 16, 2020 |
Filing 1140
Second STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendents Second Quarter 2020 Status Report by Counter Claimant Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Solomon, Mark)
|
May 14, 2020 |
Filing 1139
ORDER GRANTING ECF Nos. #1135 , #1136 Motions to remove from CM/ECF service list, Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 15, 2020 |
Filing 1138
STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' First Quarter 2020 Status Report by Defendant Irwin Kishner. (Solomon, Mark)
|
January 23, 2020 |
Filing 1137
Fourth STATUS REPORT 2019 Fourth Quarter Kishner Defendants' by Defendant Herman Kishner. (Solomon, Mark)
|
January 14, 2020 |
Filing 1136
MOTION TO REMOVE COUNSEL FROM CM/ECF SERVICE LIST AND PROPOSED ORDER by Defendant Patricia Leibovici. Responses due by 1/28/2020. (Kistler, Joseph)
|
January 14, 2020 |
Filing 1135
MOTION TO REMOVE COUNSEL FROM CM/ECF SERVICE LIST by Defendant Patricia Leibovici. Responses due by 1/28/2020. (Kistler, Joseph)
|
January 9, 2020 |
Filing 1134
ORDER granting ECF No. #1133 Motion to Remove Attorney Steven J. Parsons from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
January 8, 2020 |
Filing 1133
MOTION to remove attorney Steven J. Parsons from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendants Jerry Engel, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
December 12, 2019 |
Filing 1132
ORDER granting ECF No. #1131 Revised Motion to Substitute Attorney : Attorney Craig D. Friedel substituted in the place and stead of Attorney Steven J. Parsons for Defendants Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC; Jerry Engel; and, Premier Trust as Trustees for the Herman Kishner Trust. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to substitute (ECF No. #1130 ) is DENIED asMOOT. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/12/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 12, 2019 |
Filing 1131
Amended MOTION to #1130 Motion to Substitute Attorney Craig D. Friedel in for Attorney Steven J. Parsons by Defendants Jerry Engel, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven) Modified on 12/12/2019 linked to 1130 (LE).
|
December 2, 2019 |
Filing 1130
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Shannon L. Evan in for Attorney Steven J. Parsons by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
October 21, 2019 |
Filing 1129
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' Third Quarter 2019 Status Report by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
July 17, 2019 |
Filing 1128
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' Second Quarter 2019 Status Report by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
April 17, 2019 |
Filing 1127
Quarterly STATUS REPORT First Quarter 2019 by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
January 16, 2019 |
Filing 1126
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Fourth Quarter 2018 by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
December 31, 2018 |
Filing 1125
NOTICE Substitution of Counsel by State of Nevada. (Nubel, Daniel)
|
October 26, 2018 |
Filing 1124
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' Third Quarter 2018 Status Report by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven) Modified on 10/29/2018link added to #592 . (BLG).
|
August 23, 2018 |
Filing 1123
ORDER granting ECF No. #1122 Motion to Remove Attorneys James J. Pisanelli and Debra L. Spinelli from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/23/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 21, 2018 |
Filing 1122
MOTION to remove attorney James J. Pisanelli and Debra L. Spinelli from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant Boulevard Mall. (Pisanelli, James)
|
August 9, 2018 |
Filing 1121
ORDER granting ECF no. #1120 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Frederick J. Perdomo in place and stead of Micheline N. Fairbank. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/9/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
August 8, 2018 |
Filing 1120
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Frederick J. Perdomo in for Attorney Micheline N. Fairbank by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Perdomo, Frederick)
|
August 6, 2018 |
Filing 1119
ORDER granting ECF No. #1118 Motion to remove attorney Cindie D. Hernandez from the Electronic Service List in this case only on behalf of ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/6/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
August 6, 2018 |
Filing 1118
MOTION to remove attorney Cindie D. Hernandez from the Electronic Service List in this case by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. (Hernandez, Cindie)
|
July 30, 2018 |
Filing 1117
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Second Quarter 2018 by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
January 17, 2018 |
Filing 1116
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' Fourth Quarter 2017 Status Report by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
October 16, 2017 |
Filing 1115
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' Third Quarter 2017 Status Report by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
July 24, 2017 |
Filing 1114
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' Second Quarter 2017 Status Report by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven) Modified on 7/25/2017 link to #592 added. (BLG).
|
July 20, 2017 |
Filing 1113
ORDER granting ECF No. #1112 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jeremy Gilman withdrawn as co-counsel for the Shapiro Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
July 19, 2017 |
Filing 1112
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeremy Gilman by Third Party Plaintiffs Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Cross Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Cross Claimant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, ThirdParty Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilman, Jeremy)
|
May 8, 2017 |
Filing 1111
NOTICE of Nevada Department of Environmental Protection's Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (DKT. 592) by State of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Fairbank, Micheline)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing 1110
Quarterly STATUS REPORT First Quarter 2017 Status Report by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing 1109
STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' Fourth Quarter 2016 Status Report by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
November 18, 2016 |
Filing 1108
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 11/18/2016. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach for all further pretrial proceedings within his jurisdiction. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:08-cv-01618-RCJ-VCF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)
|
November 18, 2016 |
Filing 1107
ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to another magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 11/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
October 26, 2016 |
Filing 1106
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Third Quarter 2016 Status Report by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
September 8, 2016 |
Filing 1105
NOTICE of Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (DKT. 592) by State of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Fairbank, Micheline)
|
August 17, 2016 |
Filing 1104
Second STATUS REPORT 2016 by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
June 10, 2016 |
Filing 1103
NOTICE OF NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION'S DOCUMENT FILING PURSUANT TO PERMANENT INJUNCTION by State of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fairbank, Micheline)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing 1102
First STATUS REPORT 2016 by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
February 5, 2016 |
Filing 1101
NOTICE of Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Document Filing Pursuant to #592 Permanent Injunction by State of Nevada . (Fairbank, Micheline)
|
January 27, 2016 |
Filing 1100
Fourth STATUS REPORT 2015 by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing 1099
NOTICE re #592 Permanent Injunction; filed by State of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Fairbank, Micheline)
|
November 9, 2015 |
Filing 1098
ORDER. The Court, having considered the comments to the Proposed Plan for Cleanup of Groundwater: Maryland Square PCE Site ("Proposed Plan") prepared by Plaintiff, the Nevada Division of Environmental Protection, pursuant to the Permanent Injunction #582 and the National Contingency Plan, and based upon the Stipulation and Order Regarding Proposed Plan #1082 , the Court hereby approves the Proposed Plan. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing 1097
Third STATUS REPORT 2015 by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
October 6, 2015 |
Filing 1096
NOTICE OF NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION'S DOCUMENT FILING PURSUANT TO PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DKT. 592) by State of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Fairbank, Micheline)
|
July 30, 2015 |
Filing 1095
STATUS REPORT by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
July 10, 2015 |
Filing 1094
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Fairbank, Micheline)
|
June 9, 2015 |
Filing 1093
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jasmine K. Mehta on behalf of Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
April 30, 2015 |
Filing 1092
STATUS REPORT KISHNER DEFENDANTS' FIRST QUARTER 2015 STATUS REPORT by Defendants Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing 1091
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 1084 Miscellaneous Hearing held on 3/19/2015, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website
|
April 9, 2015 |
Filing 1090
NOTICE of Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (Dkt 592) by State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Suwe, Belinda)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing 1089
ERRATA to Notice of Nevada Division of Enivornmental Protection's Document filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (Doc 592) filed by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Suwe, Belinda)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing 1088
ERRATA to Notice of Change of Attorney filed by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Suwe, Belinda)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing 1087
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Suwe, Belinda)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing 1086
NOTICE of Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Document Filing by State of Nevada. (Suwe, Belinda)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing 1085
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Suwe, Belinda)
|
March 25, 2015 |
Filing 1083
ORDER Granting #1046 Motion to Approve Corrective Action Reort. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 19, 2015 |
Filing 1084
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - RE: Proposed Plan Approval held on 3/19/2015 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettiner; Pla Counsel: Wayne Klomp. Appearing telephonically: Alexander Robertson; Def Counsel: Steven Parsons, Shan Davis, Neil Beller; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margareet Griener; Time of Hearing: 10:21 a.m. - 10:34 a.m.; Courtroom: 4A; Appearances are noted on the record. The Court makes inquiry and hears representations of counsel with respect to approving the proposed plan. The Court approves the #1047 proposed plan. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
March 19, 2015 |
Filing 1082
ORDER ON STIPULATION re #1047 MOTION Submission of Proposed Plan re #592 Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
March 19, 2015 |
Filing 1081
ORDER re #1047 Proposed Plan Pursuant to Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
March 18, 2015 |
Filing 1080
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 3/18/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. IT IS ORDERED that Mr. Robertson's #1078 Motion for Telephonic Appearance at Proposed Plan Approval Hearing scheduled for 3/19/2015 at 10:00 a.m. is granted. The following instructions are given in that regard: Counsel shall dial into the AT&T meet-me-line number (1-888-675-2535, Access Code 2900398, Security Code 031915) five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
March 17, 2015 |
Filing 1079
RESPONSE TO NDEP'S PROPOSED PLAN FOR CLEANUP OF PCE-CONTAMINATED GROUNDWATER AT MARYLAND SQUARE PCE SITE filed by Plaintiffs Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Robertson, Alexander)
|
March 17, 2015 |
Filing 1078
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. at Proposed Plan Approval Hearing Attorney: Alexander Robertson, IV. by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Robertson, Alexander)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing 1077
NOTICE of Change in Hearing Location: the Proposed Plan Approval Hearing currently scheduled for Thursday, 3/19/2015 10:00 AM shall be held at the Lloyd D. George U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Las Vegas, Nevada, Courtroom 4A before Judge Robert C. Jones (no image attached)(LE)
|
March 5, 2015 |
Filing 1076
NOTICE Submission of Record of Decision Pursuant to Permanent Injunction by State of Nevada. (Klomp, Wayne)
|
January 30, 2015 |
Filing 1075
STATUS REPORT Kishner Defendants' Fourth Quarter 2014 Status Report by Defendants Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Maryland Square, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
December 4, 2014 |
Filing 1074
STATUS REPORT Third Quarter 2014 by ThirdParty Plaintiff Bank of America, Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
December 4, 2014 |
Filing 1073
STATUS REPORT Second Quarter 2014 by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
December 4, 2014 |
Filing 1072
STATUS REPORT First Quarter 2014 by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing 1071
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 11/21/2014. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. IT IS ORDERED that the Status Conference currently scheduled for 11/26/2014 before Judge Robert C. Jones is hereby VACATED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
November 19, 2014 |
Filing 1070
NOTICE of Hearing Location: Status Conference currently set for 11/26/2014 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(LE)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing 1068
ORDER granting #1067 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing 1067
MOTION to Seal filed by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. Motion ripe 11/6/2014. (Parsons, Steven)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing 1066
STATUS REPORT by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing 1065
NOTICE of Attorney Action Required: to #1064 Status Report: ERROR: Documents should have been filed as separate entries by attorney Steven J. Parsons , pursuant to Special Order 109 a separate document must be filed for each type of document or purpose . Counsel advised in the future please file documents in accordance with Special Order 109 filing procedures; to prevent delay in the timely filing of documents. CORRECTION: Counsel is advised to file the additional Motion contained in document #1064 STATUS REPORT as MOTION to Seal, found under the MOTIONS category. (no image attached)(RFJ)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing 1064
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. (Parsons, Steven)
|
October 9, 2014 |
Filing 1063
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 10/9/2014 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Eileen Wood; Pla Counsel: Wayne Klomp/Jan Greben/Bret Boone/Belinda Frey; Def Counsel: Steven Parsons/Neil Beller; Court Reporter: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 10:00-10:12 AM; Courtroom: 4B. The Court hears representations of counsel regarding status. Settlement documents are still be circulated. Status Conference/Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in a Las Vegas Courtroom to be determined before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
|
October 8, 2014 |
Filing 1062
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 10/8/2014. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. IT IS ORDERED that #1059 , #1060 , #1061 Motions for Leave to Appear telephonically for the 10/09/2014 Status Conference before Judge Robert C. Jones are granted. Counsel shall dial into the AT&T meet-me-line number (1-888-675-2535, Access Code 2900398, Security Code 100914) five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
October 6, 2014 |
Filing 1061
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at October 9, 2014, Status Conference. Attorney: Paul D. Rasmussen. by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. Motion ripe 10/6/2014. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
October 3, 2014 |
Filing 1060
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. For October 9th,2014 Status Conference Attorney: Jan Greben. by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. Motion ripe 10/3/2014. (Greben, Jan)
|
October 3, 2014 |
Filing 1059
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Attorney: Wayne Klomp. by Plaintiff State of Nevada. Motion ripe 10/3/2014. (Klomp, Wayne)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing 1058
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/25/2014 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Steven Parsons, Wayne Klomp and appearing telephonically Alexander Robertson, IV, Jan Greben and Brett Boon; Def Counsel: Neil Beller, Shan Davis and appearing telephonically Paul Rasmussen; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:06 - 9:22 a.m.; Courtroom: 4A; The Court inquires as to status and hears representations of counsel in that regard. The Court sets a date for the Proposed Plan Approval Hearing. The parties request that a another status conference be set in a couple of weeks.IT IS ORDERED that a further Status Conference is scheduled for Thursday, 10/9/2014 10:00 AM in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Proposed Plan Approval Hearing is scheduled for Thursday, 3/19/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Robert C. Jones and follows: Parties may appear at either location. Video Conference Las Vegas:: Lloyd D. George U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Las Vegas, Nevada, the Courtroom will be noticed at the public elevators.In Person Reno: Bruce R. Thompson Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 400 South Virginia Street, Nevada, Courtroom 6. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
September 24, 2014 |
Filing 1057
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 9/24/2014. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. The Court having granted #1051 , #1052 and #1053 Motions to appear telephonically for the 9/25/2014 Status Conference before Judge Robert C. Jones, the following instructions are given in that regard: Counsel shall dial into the AT&T meet-me-line number (1-888-675-2535, Access Code 2900398, Security Code 092514) five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
September 24, 2014 |
Filing 1056
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 9/24/2014. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING LOCATION: IT IS ORDERED that the Status Conference scheduled for Thursday, 9/25/2014 at 9:00 AM will held in Las Vegas Courtroom 4A before Robert C. Jones. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #1051 , #1052 and #1053 Motions for Leave to Appear Telephonically are GRANTED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing 1055
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Klomp, Wayne)
|
September 19, 2014 |
Filing 1054
STATUS REPORT And Request For Dispute Resolution Per Section X of the Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. (Greben, Jan)
|
September 19, 2014 |
Filing 1053
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Attorney: Paul D. Rasmussen. by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Premier Trust. Motion ripe 9/19/2014. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
September 19, 2014 |
Filing 1052
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Status Conference on September 25, 2014 Attorney: Alexander Robertson IV. by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. Motion ripe 9/19/2014. (Greben, Jan)
|
September 18, 2014 |
Filing 1051
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Status Conference on September 25, 2014 Attorney: Jan Greben. by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. Motion ripe 9/18/2014. (Greben, Jan)
|
September 18, 2014 |
Filing 1050
NOTICE of Hearing Location: Status Conference re: #1045 Stipulation Regarding Proposed Plan set for 9/25/2014 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(LE)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing 1049
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #1045 STIPULATION REGARDING PROPOSED PLAN. The Court will conduct a status conference on September 25, 2014, for purposes of considering the Proposed Plan. If necessary, the Parties will present any evidence in support of or in objection to the Proposed Plan at the September 25 hearing. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
July 28, 2014 |
Filing 1048
ORDER granting #1038 Motion to Substitute Party. Premier Trust as Trustee for Defendant Herman Kishner Trust substituted for Bank of America (Trustee). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing 1047
MOTION Submission of Proposed Plan re #592 Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff State of Nevada. Responses due by 8/4/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Klomp, Wayne)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing 1046
Joint MOTION Approval of Corrective Action Report by Plaintiff State of Nevada. Responses due by 8/4/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Klomp, Wayne)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing 1045
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED PLAN by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Klomp, Wayne)
|
July 15, 2014 |
Filing 1044
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #1040 STIPULATION to dismiss third-party Defendant BOULEVARD MALL, LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with each party bearing their own attorney's fees and costs. Boulevard Mall LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
July 15, 2014 |
Filing 1043
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #1042 STIPULATION to Dismiss Certain Claims, With Prejudice and with each party bearing its own costs, attorney's fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing 1042
STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order to Dismiss Certain Claims, With Prejudice by Defendants Jerry Engel, Estate of Philip Shapiro, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Patricia Leibovici, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Maryland Square, LLC, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Third Party Plaintiffs Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Melvin Shapiro, Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Parsons, Steven)
|
July 7, 2014 |
Filing 1041
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 7/7/2014 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Heidi Jordan; Pla Counsel: Jan Greben (telephonically); Wayne Klomp; Def Counsel: Neil Beller; Steve Parsons; Thomas Vanderburg; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:16 a.m. - 9:28 a.m.; Courtroom: 4A; The Court addresses the parties regarding the purpose of this hearing. The Court hears from counsel regarding the status of the case. The parties request a further status conference to discuss their proposed clean up plan and address any objections regarding the plan. IT IS ORDERED that the State shall prepare and submit a proposed joint order outlining deadlines for plan completion and objection deadlines. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED a further Status Conference is scheduled for Friday, 9/25/2014 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom to be determined before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
July 3, 2014 |
Filing 1040
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT BOULEVARD MALL, LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing 1039
NOTICE of Hearing Location: Status Conference set for 7/7/2014 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4A before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(LE)
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing 1038
MOTION to Substitute Party by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. Responses due by 7/19/2014. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing 1037
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 7/2/2014. Granting #1035 Motion for Telephonic Appearance at July 7, 2014 Status Conference. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing 1036
STATEMENT of July 7 Status Conference by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. (Greben, Jan)
|
June 9, 2014 |
Filing 1035
MOTION Telephonic Appearance at July 7 Status Conference by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. Responses due by 6/26/2014. (Greben, Jan)
|
May 30, 2014 |
Filing 1034
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on May 30, 2014, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the STATUS CONFERENCE currently set for THURSDAY, JUNE 5, 2014, in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM TBD, before Judge Robert C. Jones is VACATED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the STATUS CONFERENCE is RESCHEDULED to 09:00 A.M., MONDAY, JULY 7, 2014, IN LAS VEGAS COURTROOM TBD, before Judge Robert C. Jones.IT IS SO ORDERED.Signed Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
May 14, 2014 |
Filing 1033
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 5/14/2014, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. The Court is currently in trial. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the STATUS CONFERENCE currently set for FRIDAY, May 16, 2014 @ 09:00 A.M., in Las Vegas Courtroom 7C, is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 09:00 A.M., THURSDAY, JUNE 5, 2014, in Las Vegas Courtroom TBD, before Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing 1032
Joint STATUS REPORT OF KISHNER DEFENDANTS, INCLUDING MSLLC; SHAPIRO DEFENDANTS; and NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing 1031
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 5/13/2014. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger.IT IS ORDERED that the Status Conference currently set for 5/15/2014 is RESCHEDULED to FRIDAY, 5/16/2014 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing 1030
ORDER on Mandate as to #1028 USCA Mandate, #1008 USCA Order and #992 USCA Memorandum AFFIRMING in part, REVERSING in part, and REMANDING the judgment of the District Court re #606 Notice of Appeal filed by Patricia Leibovici. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 05/12/2014. (AC)
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing 1028
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #1008 USCA Order, #992 USCA Opinion and #606 Notice of Appeal filed by Patricia Leibovici. AFFIRMED in part, REVERSED in part, and REMANDED. (AC)
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing 1027
NOTICE of Nevada Division of Environmental Protections's Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (Doc 592) by State of Nevada. (Klomp, Wayne)
|
March 14, 2014 |
Filing 1026
ORDER Granting #1016 Defendants' Motion to Substitute Party. Patricia Leibovici, solely in her capacity as Special Administrator for the Estate of Melvin Shapiro, is substituted in place of Melvin Shapiro. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 03/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing 1025
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 2/13/2014 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Wayne Klomp; Def Counsel: Neil Beller, Shan Davis, Thomas Vandenburg, Steven Parsons; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:23 - 9:31 a.m.; Courtroom: 4B; The Court inquires as to status and hears representations of counsel in that regard. The parties seek additional time to negotiate a settlement in this case. IT IS ORDERED a further Status Conference is scheduled for 5/15/2014 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
February 5, 2014 |
Filing 1024
ERRATA to #1023 Status Report; filed by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
February 3, 2014 |
Filing 1023
Supplemental STATUS REPORT [JOINT] by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
January 30, 2014 |
Filing 1022
NON-OPPOSITION to #1016 MOTION to Substitute Party ; filed by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
January 30, 2014 |
Filing 1021
Quarterly STATUS REPORT (Fourth Quarter 2013) by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Tetra Tech EM Inc.'s Fourth Quarter 2013 Status Report)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
January 23, 2014 |
Filing 1020
ORDER AMENDING #1017 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 1/23/2014 by Deputy Clerk: Ari Caytuero. IT IS ORDERED that the Status Conference re #1014 Joint Status Report and Motion to Stay is reset for 2/13/2014 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 21, 2014 |
Filing 1019
ORDER Granting #1018 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jeffrey T. Oberman withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 01/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 18, 2014 |
Filing 1018
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Shapiro Defendants and Order Thereon by Jeffrey T. Oberman by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 1/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 15, 2014 |
Filing 1017
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 1/15/2014 by Deputy Clerk: Ari Caytuero. IT IS ORDERED that a Status Conference re: #1014 Joint Status Report and Motion for Stay is set for 2/6/2014 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 13, 2014 |
Filing 1016
MOTION to Substitute Party by Third Party Plaintiffs Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Counter Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Cross Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Cross Claimants Melvin Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Third Party Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Responses due by 1/30/2014. (Beller, Neil)
|
December 18, 2013 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #1015 NOTICE of Change of Attorney. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Joshua Segal. CORRECTION: Clerk's office modified event as #1015 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (no image attached)(ASB)
|
December 13, 2013 |
Filing 1015
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Defendant Maryland Square, LLC. (Segal, Joshua)
|
December 13, 2013 |
Filing 1014
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
December 4, 2013 |
Filing 1013
ORDER that #1010 Motion for Relief from Order and Judgment is GRANTED. The Court still REVERSES the judgment for indemnity against Melvin Shapiro but VACATES the judgment entered in favor of Melvin Shapiro entered in docket entry #1004.The Clerk of the Court is directed to VACATE the judgment entered in favor of Melvin Shapiro #1004 . Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM).
|
November 1, 2013 |
Filing 1012
RESPONSE to #1010 MOTION for Relief from Order and Judgment; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Replies due by 11/11/2013. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
October 29, 2013 |
Filing 1011
NOTICE of Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (Doc 592) by State of Nevada. (Klomp, Wayne)
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing 1010
MOTION for Relief from Order and Judgment ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. Responses due by 11/1/2013. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing 1009
NOTICE OF DEATH Upon the Record Notice of Suggestion of Death of Defendant Melvin Shapiro by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
October 4, 2013 |
Filing 1008
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit as to #502 Notice of Appeal, #605 Notice of Appeal, #606 Notice of Appeal, #942 Notice of Appeal, and #944 Notice of Appeal. The petition for panel rehearing by Appellees' Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et al is GRANTED. At slip op. 41, the fourth paragraph should read: The judgment for indemnity against SBIC is AFFIRMED, and the judgment for indemnity against Melvin Shapiro is REVERSED and REMANDED (11-15176). (SLD)
|
September 20, 2013 |
Filing 1007
ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on September 20, 2013, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulated Joint Motion for an Order Vacating the September 27, 2013 Status Conference and Other Relief [# 1006] is GRANTED and the Status Conference is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court on or before Friday, December 13, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the briefing schedule for Maryland Square LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment addressing the bona fide purchaser exception and Maryland Square LLCs Motion for Reconsideration is STAYED until Friday, December 13, 2013. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
September 20, 2013 |
Filing 1006
Joint MOTION to Continue District Judge Hearing (Stipulated Joint Motion for an Order Vacating or Continuing the September 27, 2013 Status Conference and Other Relief) by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. Motion ripe 9/20/2013. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
September 17, 2013 |
Filing 1005
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on September 17, 2013, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Status Conference is set for FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 27, 2013 @ 1:30 P.M., in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.IT IS SO ORDERED.Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
September 17, 2013 |
Filing 1004
VACATED per #1013 ORDER (MMM) CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Melvin Shapiro pursuant to Order #1003 filed September 16, 2013. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM).
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing 1003
ORDER that Maryland Square shall file a new motion for summary judgment addressing the bona fide purchaser exception within 20 days of this order. NDEP and Maryland Square may file a response and a reply in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. FURTHER ORDERED that Maryland Square shall re-file its motion for reconsideration within 20 days of this order. The homeowners may file a response and Maryland Square may file a reply in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules. FURTHER ORDERED that the sua sponte entry of summary judgment and the permanent injunction entered under the Resource Conservation and Recovery Act ("RCRA") against SBIC is now VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that the judgment for indemnity against Melvin Shapiro is REVERSED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Melvin Shapiro. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing 1002
ORDER on Mandate as to #999 USCA Mandate and #993 USCA Order AFFIRMING in part, REVERSING in part, VACATING in part, and REMANDING in part the Judgment of the US District Court re #502 Notice of Appeal, #605 Notice of Appeal, #942 Notice of Appeal, and #944 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/6/13. Status Conference set for 9/27/2013 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (EDS)
|
September 3, 2013 |
Filing 1001
EXHIBIT(s) to #998 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Klomp, Wayne)
|
August 20, 2013 |
Filing 999
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit as to #993 USCA Order AFFIRMING in part, REVERSING in part, VACATING in part, and REMANDING in part #502 Notice of Appeal, #605 Notice of Appeal, #942 Notice of Appeal, and #942 Notice of Appeal. (SLD)
|
August 20, 2013 |
Filing 998
NOTICE of Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction [Doc 592] by State of Nevada. (Klomp, Wayne)
|
August 20, 2013 |
Filing 997
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Klomp, Wayne)
|
August 14, 2013 |
Filing 996
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #606 Notice of Appeal, filed by Melvin Shapiro. Appellant Melvin Shapiros motion for enlargement of time to file bill of costs is GRANTED. (EDS)
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing 995
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #606 Notice of Appeal, filed by Melvin Shapiro. Within 14 days from the date of this order, Defendants-Appellants Melvin Shapiro; Shapiro Brothers Investment Company are directed to file a response to the petition for rehearing filed by Defendants-Appellees on August 9, 2013. (EDS)
|
July 30, 2013 |
Filing 994
Quarterly STATUS REPORT (Second Quarter 2013) by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Site Status Report 2nd Quarter 2013)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
July 26, 2013 |
Filing 993
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #605 Notice of Appeal, #942 Notice of Appeal, #944 Notice of Appeal, and #606 Notice of Appeal. Appellees Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et als motion to strike is DENIED. Plaintiff-Appellee NDEPs motion to take judicial notice is DENIED. (AC)
|
July 26, 2013 |
Filing 992
OPINION of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #605 Notice of Appeal, #942 Notice of Appeal, #944 Notice of Appeal, #502 Notice of Appeal, and #606 Notice of Appeal. AFFIRMED in part, REVERSED in part, VACATED in part, and REMANDED in part. See Order for details. (AC)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing 991
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Tanner, Carolyn)
|
April 30, 2013 |
Filing 990
First STATUS REPORT (First Quarter 2013) by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Site Status Report 1st Quarter 2013)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
April 25, 2013 |
Filing 989
Quarterly STATUS REPORT First Quarter 2013 by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 7, 2013 |
Filing 988
ORDER that #980 Motion for Correction to Judgment re #978 Judgment on Attorney Fees is DENIED at this time. FURTHER ORDERED that NDEP shall seek leave from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for this Court to correct its May 17, 2012 order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(a). Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 27, 2013 |
Filing 987
NOTICE of NDEP's Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (Doc 592) by State of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing 986
STATUS REPORT (Fourth Quarter 2013) by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing 985
STATUS REPORT FOURTH QUARTER 2012 STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANT SHAPIRO BROS. INVESTMENT CO. by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 16, 2013 |
Filing 984
REPLY to Response to #980 MOTION to Amend/Correct #978 Judgment on Attorney Fees and REPLY to Response to #982 ERRATA to Motion filed by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
January 11, 2013 |
Filing 983
RESPONSE to #982 Errata to #980 MOTION to Amend/Correct #978 Judgment on Attorney Fees filed by Defendants Bank of America, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. Replies due by 1/21/2013. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
January 7, 2013 |
Filing 982
ERRATA to #980 MOTION to Amend/Correct #978 Judgment on Attorney Fees ; filed by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
January 6, 2013 |
Filing 981
RESPONSE to #980 MOTION to Amend/Correct #978 Judgment on Attorney Fees, filed by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
December 20, 2012 |
Filing 980
MOTION to Amend/Correct #978 Judgment on Attorney Fees by Plaintiff State of Nevada. Responses due by 1/6/2013. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 19, 2012 |
Filing 979
NOTICE OF NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTIONS DOCUMENT FILING PURSUANT TO PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DOC 592) by State of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
November 27, 2012 |
Filing 978
JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. NDEP is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $217,880.00, and $1,077.94 in travel costs and $425.04 in transcription costs. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing 977
ORDER that #938 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows. NDEP is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $217,880.00, and $1,077.94 in travel costs and $425.04 in transcription costs. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 13, 2012 |
Filing 976
STATUS REPORT [Third Quarter 2012] by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Site Status Report 3rd Quarter 2012)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing 975
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #938 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
October 31, 2012 |
Filing 974
NOTICE OF NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTIONS DOCUMENT FILING PURSUANT TO #592 by State of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
October 27, 2012 |
Filing 973
Quarterly STATUS REPORT by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
October 19, 2012 |
Filing 972
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Thomas F Vandenburg on behalf of Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
October 8, 2012 |
Filing 971
STIPULATION between State of Nevada, Division of Environmental Protection, and The Co-Trustees for the Herman Kishner Trust and (Proposed) Order filed by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
October 4, 2012 |
Filing 970
NOTICE of Nevada Division of Environmental Protections Document Filing Pursuant to #592 Permanent Injunction by State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
September 14, 2012 |
Filing 969
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 9/14/2012. ORDERED that Oral Argument on #938 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, set for Tuesday, September 18, 2012, is VACATED. The court will issue a written order on the pleadings. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing 968
NOTICE of Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (Doc #592 ) filed by Plaintiff State of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
August 29, 2012 |
Filing 967
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #966 Stipulation for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/29/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 28, 2012 |
Filing 966
STIPULATED Confidentiality Order filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
August 24, 2012 |
Filing 965
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #963 Stipulation to Extend the Deadlines to Submit a Corrective Action Report pursuant to the Permanent Injunction and for Security Payment. (See Order for details). Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 6, 2012 |
Filing 964
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #938 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs held on 8/6/2012 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 1:25 - 1:32 p.m.; Las Vegas Courtroom: 4A and through video conference in Reno Courtroom: 6;Court convenes. Appearances are noted on the record. The Court inquires as to the motion at issue and hears representations of counsel in that regard. Counsel requests this matter be continued to allow the parties additional time to finalize a settlement with respect to attorney fees and costs. IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument RE: #938 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs is continued to Tuesday, 9/18/2012 01:30 PM in Reno Courtroom 6 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
August 6, 2012 |
Filing 963
STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend the Deadline to Submit a Corrective Action Report Pursuant to the #592 Permanent Injunction and for Security Payment filed by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
August 2, 2012 |
Filing 962
JOINDER to #961 STATUS REPORT [Second Quarter 2012] filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Davis, Shan)
|
July 30, 2012 |
Filing 961
STATUS REPORT [Second Quarter 2012] by Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Site Status Report 2ndQuarter 2012)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
July 27, 2012 |
Filing 960
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Second Quarter 2012 by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
July 26, 2012 |
Filing 959
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on July 25, 2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that due to a conflict with the Courts calendar ORAL ARGUMENT currently set for Monday, August 6, 2012 @ 10:00AM is RESCHEDULED IN TIME ONLY as follows:MONDAY, AUGUST 6, 2012 @ 1:30PM #938 Nevada Division of Environmental Protection Motion for Attorney Fees and Related Costs.NOTICE OF HEARING LOCATION: Parties may appear at either location.IN PERSON LAS VEGAS: Lloyd D. George U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101, COURTROOM LOCATION TO BE DETERMINED AND NOTICED AT PUBLIC ELEVATORS ON HEARING DATE.VIDEO CONFERENCE IN RENO: COURTROOM 6, Bruce R. Thompson Federal building & U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada 89501.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing 958
CERTIFICATE OF RECORD on #942 , #944 Notice of Appeal. The record on appeal, consisting of the reporter's transcripts and the United States District Court clerk's record is ready for the purpose of the appeal. This file exists in electronic format and is accessible via CM/ECF - PACER. The documents comprising the United States District Court clerk's record have been numbered in conformance with Rule 11(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. These document numbers are reflected on the United States District Court's docket sheet and should be used for reference purposes in the briefs. Appeals in Habeas Corpus and 28 USC 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence cases are treated as civil appeals in the Court of Appeals. Criminal appeals briefing schedules will be issued upon the filing of this document. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (no image attached) (ECS)
|
July 18, 2012 |
Filing 957
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC re #944 Notice of Appeal. Transcripts Required: 935 Motion Hearing. (Davis, Shan)
|
July 18, 2012 |
Filing 956
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company re #942 Notice of Appeal. Transcripts Required: 935 Motion Hearing. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
July 17, 2012 |
Filing 955
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on July 17, 2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT is set as follows:MONDAY, AUGUST 6, 2012 @ 10:00AM #938 Nevada Division of Environmental Protections Motion for Attorneys Fees and Related CostsNOTICE OF HEARING LOCATION: Parties may appear at either location.VIDEO CONFERENCE LAS VEGAS: Lloyd D. George U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101, COURTROOM LOCATION TO BE DETERMINED AND NOTICED AT PUBLIC ELEVATORS ON HEARING DATE.IN PERSON RENO: COURTROOM 6, Bruce R. Thompson Federal building & U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada 89501.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
July 2, 2012 |
Filing 954
REPLY to Response to #938 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Tanner, #2 Exhibit 2 Affidavit of Mehta)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
July 2, 2012 |
Filing 953
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #950 Stipulation for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 2, 2012 |
Filing 952
ORDER granting #951 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. The Clerk of Court shall remove the following attorneys from the CM/ECF service list: Melissa J. Roose, David F. Wood, Patrick S. Schoenburg, Matthew O. Kovacs, Alex J. Moya, and Raeann M. Todd. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Ojeda, Heidi)
|
June 29, 2012 |
Filing 951
MOTION to remove attorney(s) Melissa J. Roose, David F. Wood, Patrick S. Schoenburg, Matthew O. Kovacs, Alex J. Moya, Raeann M. Todd from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 6/29/2012. (Roose, Melissa)
|
June 26, 2012 |
Filing 950
STIPULATION for Confidentiality Order filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, and Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
June 22, 2012 |
Filing 949
RESPONSE to #938 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, and Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Replies due by 7/2/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas F. Vandenburg in Support of the Kishner Defendants Opposition to the Nevada Department of Environmental Protections Motion for Attorneys Fees and Related Costs, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaraion of Thomas F. Vandenburg)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
June 19, 2012 |
Filing 948
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #944 Notice of Appeal filed by Maryland Square LLC. USCA Case Number 12-16412. (EDS)
|
June 19, 2012 |
Filing 946
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #944 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (ECS)
|
June 18, 2012 |
Filing 947
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #942 Notice of Appeal, filed by Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. USCA Case Number 12-16409. (SLR)
|
June 18, 2012 |
Filing 945
REPRESENTATION STATEMENT by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company re #942 Notice of Appeal. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
June 18, 2012 |
Filing 944
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-2408625. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Representation Statement)(Davis, Shan)
|
June 15, 2012 |
Filing 943
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #942 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (ECS)
|
June 14, 2012 |
Filing 942
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #937 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,,, by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-2406859. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
June 11, 2012 |
Filing 941
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required for attorneys Jennifer Taylor and Alexander Robertson re: #940 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney address information listed on notice of change of address does not match CM/ECF account information. Pursuant to Local Rules (LSR 2-2), and Special Order 109, it is the responsibility of all attorneys to maintain and update their information in the case file and the CM/ECF system. It is therefore recommended that Jennifer Taylor and Alexander Robertson review and update their CM/ECF account information. (no image attached)(ASB)
|
June 11, 2012 |
Filing 940
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer L. Taylor. Alexander Robertson, IV, ROBERTSON & ASSOCIATES, LLP, 32121 Lindero Canyon Road, Suite 200, Westlake Village, CA 91361; Tel: (818) 851-3850; Fax: (818) 851-3851 (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 9, 2012 |
Filing 939
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 935 Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2012, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website
|
June 5, 2012 |
Filing 938
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Responses due by 6/22/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Mehta, #2 Exhibit 1a - Fees 1, #3 Exhibit 1b - Fees 2, #4 Exhibit 1c - Fees 3, #5 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Navarro, #6 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Tanner, #7 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Armstrong)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 17, 2012 |
Filing 937
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #833 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that #863 Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that #874 Motion to Strike is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that #923 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/17/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 14, 2012 |
Filing 936
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Counter Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Notice Of Withdrawal And Disassociation Of Counsel (for Defendants/Cross-Defendants, Melvin Shapiro, The Estate of Philip Shapiro and Shapiro Bros. Investment Corporation) (Roose, Melissa)
|
May 10, 2012 |
Filing 934
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph S. Kistler on behalf of Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Kistler, Joseph)
|
May 1, 2012 |
Filing 933
JOINDER to Defendants Bank of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC's First Status Report, First Quarter 2012 filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Davis, Shan)
|
April 30, 2012 |
Filing 932
First STATUS REPORT First Quarter 2012 by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tetra Tech EM, Inc.'s Site Status Report for 1st Quarter 2012)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
April 27, 2012 |
Filing 931
Quarterly STATUS REPORT FIRST QUARTER 2012 STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANT SHAPIRO BROS. INVESTMENT CO. by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
April 20, 2012 |
Filing 930
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
April 19, 2012 |
Filing 935
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #863 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #874 MOTION to Strike held on 4/19/2012 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 10:19 - 11:53 a.m.; Courtroom: 6C; Court convenes. Appearances are noted on the record. The Court shares preliminary thoughts and inclinations. Arguments of counsel are heard. The Court advises how he intends to rule. The Court takes the matter under advisement. Written ruling of the Court will issue. Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
April 16, 2012 |
Filing 929
STIPULATION re #912 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,, ; (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Kishner Defendants' Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction) by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
April 12, 2012 |
Filing 928
REPLY to #923 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 920 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Surreply ; NDEP's Reply in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's Minute Order Granting Shapiro's Motion for Leave to File Surreply filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
April 11, 2012 |
Filing 927
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Mark A. Hutchison on behalf of Defendants Estate of Philip Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro. (Hutchison, Mark)
|
April 10, 2012 |
Filing 926
RESPONSE to #923 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 920 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Surreply, filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Defendants Melvin Shapiro's, the Estate of Philip Shapiro's, and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co's Memorandum Opposing Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's Minute Order Granting the Shapiro Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Surreply Replies due by 4/20/2012. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
April 4, 2012 |
Filing 925
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #924 Stipulation to Shorten Time to Respond/Reply re #923 Motion for Reconsideration. Responses due by 4/10/2012. Replies due by 4/13/2012. The hearing on the Motion for Reconsideration shall commence on April 19, 2012, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones if the Court has not ruled on the Motion prior to that time. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 3, 2012 |
Filing 924
STIPULATION re #923 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 920 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Surreply ; Order Shortening Time of NDEP's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's Minute Order Granting Shapiro's Mtn for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
April 3, 2012 |
Filing 923
MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 920 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Surreply by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Responses due by 4/20/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
April 2, 2012 |
Filing 922
REPLY to #872 Response to Motion, #874 MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #871 Response to Motion, #894 Response to Motion,,,,, #873 Response to Motion, 920 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, ; Surreply of Defendants Melvin Shapiro, the Estate of Philip Shapiro, and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co to Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Stephen R. Henshaw, #2 Exhibit 1- to Supplemental Declaration of Stephen R. Henshaw)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
April 2, 2012 |
Filing 921
ORDER Granting #915 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua M. D. Segal and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Shan Davis for Maryland Square LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/2/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
April 2, 2012 |
Filing 920
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on April 2, 2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #918 Defendants Melvin Shapiros, the Estate of Philip Shapiros, and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.s Motion for Leave to File a Surreply to Nevada Division of Environmental Protections Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
March 26, 2012 |
Filing 918
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Estate of Philip Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Co., and by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 3/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Surreply of Defendants Melvin Shapiro, The Estate of Philip Shapiro, and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co, #2 Exhibit A - to Surreply of Defendants - Supplemental Dec. of Stephen R. Henshaw, #3 Exhibit 1 - to Supplemental Declaration of Stephen R. Henshaw)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 23, 2012 |
Filing 916
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #421 #500 Notices of Appeal. Appellants motion to dismiss these appeals is granted. The parties shall bear their own costs and fees on appeal. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (ECS)
|
March 19, 2012 |
Filing 915
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joshua M.D. Segal and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Shan Davis (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2308894) filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. Motion ripe 3/19/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Davis, Shan)
|
March 16, 2012 |
Filing 914
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jan A. Greben. (Greben, Jan)
|
March 14, 2012 |
Filing 913
REPLY to Response to #874 MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi ; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Filed also by The Estate of Philip Shapiro and Shapiro Bros. Investment Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Comparison Siders Declaration with Siders Supplemental Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Comparison Lovato Declaration with Amended Declaration, #3 Exhibit Roe v. Doe)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 14, 2012 |
Filing 912
ORDERED that #768 Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction is WITHDRAWN. The parties are ordered to re-file the motion before the hearing scheduled on 4/19/12. FURTHER ORDERED that #860 Motion for Clarification and/or Correction of Oversight or Omission Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(a) is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/14/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 12, 2012 |
Filing 911
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #910 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re #874 MOTION to Strike. Replies due by 3/14/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 9, 2012 |
Filing 919
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #768 Motion for Order to Show Cause; #860 Motion for Clarification and/or Correction of Oversight or Omission, held on 3/9/2012 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:08 - 9:16 a.m.; Courtroom: 6 and through video conference in Las Vegas Courtroom: 7D;Court convenes. Appearances are noted on the record. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears the representations of counsel with respect to the motions at issue. The Court advises that he will grant #860 Motion for Clarification and/or Correction of Oversight or Omission, and the parties oral request to withdraw #768 Motion to Show Cause, with leave to re-file the motion before the hearing scheduled on 4/19/2012, to the extent either side deems it appropriate. Written ruling of the Court will issue. Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
March 6, 2012 |
Filing 910
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #874 MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi, #894 Response to Motion,,,,, #881 Stipulation,,, 882 Minute Order,, ; STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED]ORDER ENLARGING UNTIL MARCH 14,2012 THE SHAPIRO DEFENDANT'S TIME TO REPLY TO NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION'S OPPOSITION TO MELVIN SHAPIRO'S, THE ESTATE OF PHILIP SHAPIRO'S AND SHAPIRO BROTHER'S INVESTMENT CO.'S MOTION TO STRIKE; DECLARATIONS OF MARY SIDERS, GREG LOVATO, AND JASMINE MEHTA by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 6, 2012 |
Filing 909
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. DOCUMENT FILING PURSUCANT TO PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DOC 592) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
March 1, 2012 |
Filing 908
REPLY to Response to #863 Cross-MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul Roberts)(SRK)
|
February 28, 2012 |
Filing 907
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #889 Amended Stipulation Between the Shapiro Defendants and Plaintiff Nevada Divison of Environmental Protection Regarding the Declarations of Mary A. Siders, Greg E. Lovato, and Stephen R. Henshaw. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 28, 2012 |
Filing 906
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #888 Stipulation Between the Shapiro Defendants and Plaintiff Nevada Divison of Environmental Protection Regarding the Declarations of Mary A. Siders, Greg E. Lovato and Stephen R. Henshaw. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 28, 2012 |
Filing 905
RESPONSE to #862 Response to Motion ; NDEP's Response to MS LLC's Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts in Support of its Opposition to Mtn for Summary Judgment & Corss-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
February 28, 2012 |
Filing 904
NOTICE of Change of Address by Shan D Davis. (Davis, Shan)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing 903
ERRATA to #902 Reply to Response to Motion ; Exhibit 2 filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing 902
REPLY to Response to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing 901
EXHIBIT(s) to Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Reply to the Kishner Defendants' Opposition to NDEP's Motion for Summary Judgment to #898 Reply to Response to Motion, ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 1-4, #5 Exhibit 1-5, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing 900
ORDER on Mandate re #890 USCA Order DISMISSING #616 Notice of Appeal, filed by Maryland Square LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/27/12. (MMM)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing 899
REPLY to Response to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. NDEP's Response to Kishner Defendant's Statement of Additional Undisputed Facts in Support of Opposition to NDEP's Motion for Summary Judgment [870-1] (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing 898
REPLY to Response to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Reply to the Kishner Defendants' Opposition to NDEP's Motion for Summary Judgment (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing 897
ORDER on Mandate re #892 USCA Order DISMISSING #624 Notice of Appeal, filed by Herman Kishner, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC,. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/27/12. (MMM) (Main Document 897 replaced on 2/27/2012) (MMM).
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing 896
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on February 27, 2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that [888 & 889] Stipulation - Amended Stipulation Between the Shapiro Defendants and Plaintiff Nevada Division of Environmental Protection Regarding the Declarations of Mary A. Siders, Greg E. Lovato and Stephen R. Henshaw is GRANTED. FRIDAY, MARCH 9, 2012 @ 09:00AM ORAL ARGUMENTIT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT set for FRIDAY, MARCH 9, 2012 @ 09:00 AM WILL REMAIN ON CALENDAR for pending motions ONLY: #768 Kishner Defendants Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction, AND #860 Third Party Defendant So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co., D/B/A Ted Wiens Tire & Auto Centers Motion for Clarification and/or Correction of Oversight or Omission Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(a).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that NO CONTINUANCE of the Oral Argument for [768 & 860] will be granted.Parties may appear at either location.Video Conference Las Vegas: Lloyd D. George U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101, the Courtroom location will be noticed at the public elevators.In Person Reno: COURTROOM 6, Bruce R. Thompson Federal Building & U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada 89501.THURSDAY, APRIL 19, 2012 @ 10:00AM - ORAL ARGUMENT IN LAS VEGASIT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in light of the Stipulation between the parties, ORAL ARGUMENT is RESCHEDULED to Thursday, April 19, 2012 @ 10:00 AM in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM LOCATION TO BE NOTICED AT PUBLIC ELEVATORS for the following pending motions ONLY: #833 Nevada Division of Environmental protections Motion for Summary Judgment; #863 Defendant Maryland Square LLCs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, AND #874 Defendants Melvin Shapiros, The Estate of Philip Shapiros and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.s Motion to Strike the Declarations of May Siders, Greg Lovato and Jasmine Mehta. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing 895
NOTICE of Change of Address by Melissa J. Roose. Notice Of Change Of Address Re: Attorneys For Defendants And Cross-Defendants, Melvin Shapiro, The State Of Philip Shapiro And Shapiro Bros. Investment Corporation (Roose, Melissa)
|
February 22, 2012 |
Filing 894
RESPONSE to #874 MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi, filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. NDEP's Opposition to Def's SBIC's Motion to Strike Declarations of Siders, Lovato, and Mehta Replies due by 3/10/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Supplemental Dec of Mary Siders, #2 Exhibit 1-1 to Supplemental Dec of Siders, #3 Exhibit 1-2 to Supplemental Dec of Siders, #4 Exhibit 1-3 to Supplemental Dec of Siders, #5 Exhibit 1-4 to Supplemental Dec of Siders, #6 Exhibit 1-5 to Supplemental Dec of Siders, #7 Exhibit 2 Amended Dec of Lovato, #8 Exhibit 2-1 to Amended Dec of Lovato)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
February 21, 2012 |
Filing 892
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #624 Notice of Appeal. Counsel has failed to perfect the appeal. This appeal is dismissed for failure to file the opening brief on appeal in this case. Order to serve as Mandate. (ECS)
|
February 21, 2012 |
Filing 890
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #616 Notice of Appeal, filed by Maryland Square LLC. Counsel has failed to perfect the appeal. This appeal is dismissed for failure to file the opening brief on appeal in this case. Order shall serve as Mandate. (ECS)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing 889
STIPULATION re #888 Stipulation,,,, #872 Response to Motion, #874 MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #871 Response to Motion, ; Amended Stipulation Between the Shapiro Defendants and Plaintiff Nevada Divison of Environmental Protection Regarding the Declarations of Mary A. Siders, Greg E. Lovato, and Stephen R. Henshaw (Document 888) by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing 888
STIPULATION re #872 Response to Motion, #874 MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #871 Response to Motion, #873 Response to Motion, ; Stipulation Between the Shapiro Defendants and Plaintiff Nevada Divison of Environmental Protection Regarding the Declarations of Mary A. Siders, Greg E. Lovato and Stephen R. Henshaw by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 15, 2012 |
Filing 886
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #685 Notice of Appeal filed by Maryland Square LLC. USCA Case Number 11-15658. Counsel has failed to perfect the appeal. This appeal is DISMISSED for failure to file the opening brief on appeal. Order shall serve as Mandate. (ECS)
|
February 14, 2012 |
Filing 885
RESPONSE to #863 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Opposition to Maryland Square, LLC's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Replies due by 3/2/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mehta, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Siders)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
February 14, 2012 |
Filing 884
REPLY to #862 Response to Motion ; Reply to Maryland Square LLC's Opposition to NDEP's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mehta, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Siders)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
February 13, 2012 |
Filing 883
NOTICE OF HEARING LOCATION: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #768 Kishner Defendants Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction; #833 Nevada Division of Environmental Protections Motion for Summary Judgment; #860 Third Party Defendant So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co., D/B/A/ Ted Wiens Tire & Auto Centers Motion for Clarification and/or Correction of Oversight or Omission, #863 Maryland Square, LLCs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and #874 Melvin Shapiros The Estate of Philip Shapiros and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.s Motion to Strike the Declarations of Mary Siders, Greg Lovato and Jasmine Mehta set for FRIDAY, MARCH 9, 2012 @ 09:00 AM as follows: Parties may appear at either location. Video Conference Las Vegas: Lloyd D. George U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101, the Courtroom will be noticed at the public elevators.In Person Reno: COURTROOM 6, Bruce R. Thompson Federal Building & U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada 89501.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
February 13, 2012 |
Filing 882
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on February 13, 2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #876 Amended Stipulation to Extend the Deadline to Reply to and Oppose Maryland Square LLCs Opposition to NDEPs Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and #881 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline to Oppose Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Co., and Estate of Philip Shapiros Motion to Strike are GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
February 8, 2012 |
Filing 881
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #874 MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibi ; To File Opposition by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
February 7, 2012 |
Filing 880
NON-OPPOSITION to #860 MOTION to Amend/Correct #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate,. Motion for Clarification and/or Correction of Oversight or Omission MOTION to Amend/Correct #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate,. Motion for Clarification and/or Correction of Oversight or Omission ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nielson, Karl)
|
February 7, 2012 |
Filing 879
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Defendant Herman Kishner. from Scott R. Cook to Joseph P. Hardy (Hardy, Joseph)
|
February 2, 2012 |
Filing 878
JOINDER filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Davis, Shan)
|
January 30, 2012 |
Filing 877
Quarterly STATUS REPORT 4th Quarter 2011 by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tetra Tech EM, Inc.'s Site Status Report for 4th Quarter 2011)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
January 27, 2012 |
Filing 876
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #862 Response to Motion, #863 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Amended Stipulation & Order to Extend Deadline to Reply to and Oppose MSLLC's Opposition to NDEP's MSJ & Cross-MSJ by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
January 27, 2012 |
Filing 875
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Fourth Quarter 2011 Status Report of Shapiro Bros. Investment Co. as required by Document 592 by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 23, 2012 |
Filing 874
MOTION to Strike #845 Exhibit, #847 Statement, #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #839 Exhibit, #838 Exhibit, #846 Request for Judicial Notice, #837 Exhibit, #836 Exhibit, #841 Exhibit, #843 Exhibit, #835 Exhibit, #840 Exhibit, #848 Exhibit, #842 Exhibit, #844 Exhibit, #834 Exhibit, Defendants Melvin Shapiro's, The Estate of Philip Shapiro's and Shapiro Bros. Investment Co's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Mary Siders, Greg Lovato and Jasmine Mehta by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 2/9/2012. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 23, 2012 |
Filing 873
RESPONSE to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Shapiro Bros. Investment Co and Estate of Philip Shapiro Response to Plaintiff Nevada Division of Environmental Production's Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Replies due by 2/9/2012. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 23, 2012 |
Filing 872
EXHIBIT(s) C to Response to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Shapiro Bros Investment Co, Estate of Philip Shapiro, Exhibit C to Response of Shapiro Defendants (Document No. 871) Replies due by 2/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Exhibit C)(Oberman, Jeffrey) Event type corrected on 1/24/2012. (MJZ)
|
January 23, 2012 |
Filing 871
RESPONSE to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Shapiro Bros Investment Co, Estate of Philip Shapiro Replies due by 2/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order of 7/26/11, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mary Siders)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 23, 2012 |
Filing 870
RESPONSE to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. [Kishner Defendants' Opposition to Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Motion for Summary Judgment] Replies due by 2/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Kishner Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Opposition to Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration Declaration of Thomas F. Vandenburg in Support of Denial or Continuance of Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Thomas F. Vandenburg, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Thomas F. Vandenburg)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
January 20, 2012 |
Filing 869
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 1/20/2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Oral Argument RE: #768 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
January 20, 2012 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #868 Second Motion to Continue District Judge Hearing. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Jeffrey T. Oberman. CORRECTION: Entry corrected by Court to #868 Stipulation. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing 868
Second STIPULATION to Continue District Judge Hearing; filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- DKt 865)(Oberman, Jeffrey) Event type corrected on 1/20/2012. (MJZ)
|
January 18, 2012 |
Filing 867
NOTICE of Hearing LOCATION: Oral Argument RE: #768 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(LE)
|
January 11, 2012 |
Filing 866
NOTICE by Defendant Melvin Shapiro Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Patrick S. Schoenburg, Esq. and Matthew O. Kovacs, Esq. Only and Removal From CM/ECF Service List (Roose, Melissa)
|
January 11, 2012 |
Filing 865
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on January 11, 2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #860 Third Party Defendant So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co., D/B/A/ Ted Wiens Tire & Auto Centers Motion for Clarification and/or Correction of Oversight or Omission is set in conjunction; #833 Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Motion for Summary Judgment and #863 Maryland Square, LLCs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is set FRIDAY, MARCH 9, 2012 @ 09:00AM in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM TBD, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL) Modified on 1/19/2012 (CL).
|
January 10, 2012 |
Filing 864
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTIONS DOCUMENT FILING PURSUANT TO PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DOC 592) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
January 10, 2012 |
Filing 863
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. Responses due by 2/3/2012. (MJZ)
|
January 10, 2012 |
Filing 862
RESPONSE to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. Replies due by 1/27/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Maryland Square, LLC's Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Davis, Shan)
|
January 10, 2012 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #862 Response to Motion. ERROR: Document should've been filed as two separate entries by attorney Shan Davis in accordance with Special Order 109. CORRECTION: Entry refiled by Court as #863 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
January 5, 2012 |
Filing 861
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 1/5/2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #860 Third Party Defendant So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co., D/B/A/ Ted Wiens Tire & Auto Centers Motion for Clarification and/or Correction of Oversight or Omission is set in conjunction with #833 Kishner Defendants Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not Be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction on FRIDAY, MARCH 9, 2012 @ 09:00AM in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM TBD, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
January 4, 2012 |
Filing 860
MOTION to Amend/Correct #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate,. Motion for Clarification and/or Correction of Oversight or Omission Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60(a) by ThirdParty Defendant So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co.. Responses due by 1/21/2012. (Nielson, Karl)
|
December 30, 2011 |
Filing 859
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #857 Stipulation to Extend Time for Kirshner Defendants and Shapiro Defendants to File Oppositions to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/23/2012. Replies due by 2/27/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
December 30, 2011 |
Filing 858
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #856 Stipulation to Extend Time for Maryland Square, LLC to File Opposition to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/10/2012. Replies due by 1/31/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
December 16, 2011 |
Filing 857
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Kishner Defendants and Shapiro Defendants to File Their Oppositions to Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Motion For Summary Judgment) by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
December 15, 2011 |
Filing 856
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. (Davis, Shan)
|
December 13, 2011 |
Filing 855
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/13/2011, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #833 Nevada Division of Environmental Protections Motion for Summary Judgment is set for FRIDAY, MARCH 9, 2012 @ 09:00AM in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM TBD, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
December 13, 2011 |
Filing 854
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/13/2011, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #768 Kishner Defendants Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not Be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction is set on FRIDAY, JANUARY 20, 2012 @ 09:00AM in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM TBD, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
December 12, 2011 |
Filing 853
ORDER Granting #852 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Shan D Davis for Maryland Square LLC, substituted for Attorney Dominica C. Anderson and Brian A. Neighbarger. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
December 9, 2011 |
Filing 852
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. Motion ripe 12/9/2011. (Neighbarger, Brian)
|
December 9, 2011 |
Filing 851
EXHIBIT(s) 3-6, 3-7 & 3-8 missed to Mehta's Declaration to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-6, #2 Exhibit 3-7, #3 Exhibit 3-8)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 8, 2011 |
Filing 850
ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #831 Notice of Change of Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
December 8, 2011 |
Filing 849
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #831 Notice of Change of Attorney. Wrong event selected in accordance with Local Rule IA 10-6(c). Attorney Dominica Anderson advised to refile document using Stipulation event under the Other Documents category. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
December 8, 2011 |
Filing 848
EXHIBIT(s) 3-5-g; 3-5aa to 3-5hh to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-5aa, #2 Exhibit 3-5bb, #3 Exhibit 3-5cc, #4 Exhibit 3-5dd, #5 Exhibit 3-5ee, #6 Exhibit 3-5ff, #7 Exhibit 3-5gg, #8 Exhibit 3-5hh)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 847
STATEMENT of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 846
REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; by Plaintiff State Of Nevada (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3a)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 845
EXHIBIT(s) 4-7 to 4-11 to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-8, #2 Exhibit 4-9, #3 Exhibit 4-10, #4 Exhibit 4-11)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 844
EXHIBIT(s) 4-5 to 4-6b to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-6, #2 Exhibit 4-6a, #3 Exhibit 4-6b)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 843
EXHIBIT(s) 4-2d to 4-4 to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-2e, #2 Exhibit 4-3, #3 Exhibit 4-4)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 842
EXHIBIT(s) 4-2b to 4-2c to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-2c)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 841
EXHIBIT(s) 4-2 to 4-2a to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-2a)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 840
EXHIBIT(s) 3-5ii to 4-1 to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit jj, #2 Exhibit kk, #3 Exhibit ll, #4 Exhibit mm, #5 Exhibit nn, #6 Exhibit oo, #7 Exhibit pp, #8 Exhibit qq, #9 Exhibit rr, #10 Exhibit 4-1)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 839
EXHIBIT(s) 3/5k to 3/5hh to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit q, #2 Exhibit r, #3 Exhibit s, #4 Exhibit t, #5 Exhibit u, #6 Exhibit v, #7 Exhibit w, #8 Exhibit x, #9 Exhibit y, #10 Exhibit z, #11 Exhibit aa, #12 Exhibit bb, #13 Exhibit cc, #14 Exhibit dd, #15 Exhibit ee, #16 Exhibit ff, #17 Exhibit gg, #18 Exhibit hh)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 838
EXHIBIT(s) 3-5k to 3-5o to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-5l, #2 Exhibit 3-5m, #3 Exhibit 3-5n, #4 Exhibit 3-5o)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 837
EXHIBIT(s) 3-5j-b to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 836
EXHIBIT(s) 3-5j-a to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 835
EXHIBIT(s) 3-5h to 3-5j to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit i, #2 Exhibit j)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 834
EXHIBIT(s) 3-1 to 3-5g to #833 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-2, #2 Exhibit 3-3, #3 Exhibit 3-4, #4 Exhibit 3-5, #5 Exhibit 3-5a, #6 Exhibit 3-5b, #7 Exhibit 3-5c, #8 Exhibit 3-5d, #9 Exhibit 3-5e, #10 Exhibit 3-5f, #11 Exhibit 3-5g)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 833
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Responses due by 12/31/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-1, #4 Exhibit 2-2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 832
ORDER Withdrawing #752 Motion for Order to Show Cause, Denying #794 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting Third-Party Defendant Sears' Motion to Dismiss, Denying #803 Motion for an Express Determination of No Just Reason for Delay, and Continuing #768 Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not Be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction until 1/20/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
December 7, 2011 |
Filing 831
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. Substitution of Attorneys (Anderson, Dominica)
|
December 5, 2011 |
Filing 830
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. NOTICE OF NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTIONS DOCUMENT FILING PURSUANT TO PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DOC 592) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
November 15, 2011 |
Filing 827
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #685 Notice of Appeal filed by Maryland Square LLC. USCA Case Number 11-15637. Dismissed for lack of prosecution. Order to act as Mandate. (ECS)
|
November 8, 2011 |
Filing 829
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2011 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: David Oakes; Pla Counsel: Jasmine Mehta; Def Counsel: mark Ferrario, Tammy Cowden, Bradley Schrager, Thomas Vandenberg, Jeffrey Oberman, Jeremy Gilman, Neil Beller, Melissa Roose; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joan Quiros; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; Representations of counsel are heard. COURT ORDERED:denying #794 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
|
November 7, 2011 |
Filing 826
STIPULATION re #803 MOTION to Vacate #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for an Express Determ MOTION to Vacate #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for an Express Determ ; FIRST STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT SHAPIRO BROS INVESTMENT CO MOTION FOR AN EXPERSS DETERMINATION OF NO JUST REASON FOR DELAY PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 54(b) (Dkt 803) and [Proposed Order] by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
November 7, 2011 |
Filing 825
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #824 Stipulation to Continue 11/8/2011 Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 7, 2011 |
Filing 824
STIPULATION re #768 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction ; FIRST STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON KISHNER DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFEN ANT SHAPIRO BROTHERS INVESTMENT CO SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMP FOR VIOLATING PERMANET INJUNCTION (DKT #768) AND PROPOSED ORDER by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
November 4, 2011 |
Filing 822
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #817 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply to #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Responses due by 1/17/2012. Replies due by 1/24/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) Modified on 11/7/2011 link correction. (BLG).
|
November 2, 2011 |
Filing 821
NOTICE of Hearing LOCATION; ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #794 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #791 Order; #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction; #768 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction; and #803 Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for an Express Determ..., set for 11/8/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(LE)
|
November 1, 2011 |
Filing 820
STIPULATION re #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction ; FIRST STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND DEFENDANT SHAPIRO BROTHERS INVESTMENT CO. TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DOCUMENT 752) AND PROPOSED ORDER by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
October 28, 2011 |
Filing 819
STATUS REPORT THIRD QUARTER 2011 STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANT SHAPIRO BROS. INVESTMENT CO. by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
October 28, 2011 |
Filing 818
RESPONSE to #592 Permanent Injunction ; Third Quarter 2011 Status Report filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Site Status Report, 3rd Quarter, 2011)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
October 27, 2011 |
Filing 817
STIPULATION Third Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Nevadas Division of Environmental Protection's Order to Show Cause (Dkt. 752) by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
October 19, 2011 |
Filing 816
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Defendant Maryland Square LLC. and Notice of Change of Firm (Anderson, Dominica)
|
October 19, 2011 |
Filing 815
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #814 Notice (Other) by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
October 19, 2011 |
Filing 814
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Jasmine) Added corrected image #815 on 10/20/2011 (RFJ).
|
October 11, 2011 |
Filing 813
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Tanner, Carolyn)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing 812
REPLY to Response to #803 MOTION to Vacate #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for an Express Determ MOTION to Vacate #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for an Express Determ ; filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for an Express Determination of No Just Reason for Delay (Document 810) (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing 811
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. NOTICE OF NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTIONS DOCUMENT FILING PURSUANT TO PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DOC 592 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing 810
RESPONSE to #803 MOTION to Vacate #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for an Express Determ MOTION to Vacate #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for an Express Determ, filed by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Express Determination of No Just Reason for Delay Replies due by 9/30/2011. (Greben, Jan)
|
September 16, 2011 |
Filing 809
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #808 Stipulation of Dismissal Third Party Defendant Good Year Tire & Rubber Co. shall be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 15, 2011 |
Filing 808
STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Third-Party Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company Without Prejudice by Third Party Defendants Good Year Tire & Rubber Co., Good Year Tire & Rubber Co.. (Harrop, Stacy)
|
September 15, 2011 |
Filing 807
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 9/15/2011, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #752 Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction; #768 Kishner Defendants' Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction and #794 Kishner Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order (Doc 791) Granting Third-Party Defendant Sears' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 470) and #803 Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for an Express Determination of No Just Reason for Delay Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(B)currently scheduled for FRIDAY, November 18, 2011 @ 9:00 AM is VACATED AND RESCHEDULED to TUESDAY, November 8, 2011 09:00 AM in LAS VEGAS COURTHOUSE TBD before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF-CL)(Entered 09/15/2011)
|
September 8, 2011 |
Filing 806
ORDER Granting #782 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
September 8, 2011 |
Filing 805
ORDER Granting #804 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 7, 2011 |
Filing 804
MOTION to remove attorney(s) Randolph L. Howard & Joseph G. Went from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant CB Richard Ellis. Motion ripe 9/7/2011. (Howard, Randolph)
|
September 6, 2011 |
Filing 803
MOTION to Vacate #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for an Express Determination of No Just Reason for Delay Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) #682 , #698 by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Motion ripe 9/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
September 1, 2011 |
Filing 802
REPLY to Response to #794 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, ; filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
August 31, 2011 |
Filing 801
JOINDER to #798 Response to #794 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #791 Order ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co.. (Nielson, Karl) Docket entry relationship modified on 9/2/2011 (SRK).
|
August 22, 2011 |
Filing 800
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 8/22/2011, by: Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #752 Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction currently scheduled for Friday, September 30, 2011 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #752 Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction; #768 Kishner Defendants' Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction and #794 Kishner Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order (Doc 791) Granting Third-Party Defendant Sears' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 470) is set for FRIDAY, November 18, 2011 @ 09:00 AM in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM TBD before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Robert C. Jones.(no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
August 22, 2011 |
Filing 799
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 789 Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2011, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website
|
August 22, 2011 |
Filing 798
RESPONSE to #794 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate,, filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Sears' Response to Motion to Reconsider [Doc. 794] Replies due by 9/1/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cowden, Tami)
|
August 18, 2011 |
Filing 797
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. NOTICE OF DOCUMENT FILING PURSUANT TO PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DOC 592 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
August 11, 2011 |
Filing 796
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 8/11/2011. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ettinger. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument RE: #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction, currently scheduled for 9/9/2011 is RESCHEDULED to FRIDAY, 9/30/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom TBD before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
August 8, 2011 |
Filing 795
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. NOTICE OF NEVADA DIVISION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTIONS DOCUMENT FILING PURSUANT TO PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DOC 592) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
August 5, 2011 |
Filing 794
MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #791 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion to Vacate, by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Responses due by 8/22/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas F. Vandenburg in Support of the Kishner Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting Third-Party Defendant Sears' Motion to Dismiss)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
August 1, 2011 |
Filing 793
JOINDER Maryland Square, LLC's Joinder to Kishner Defendants' Second Quarter 2011 Status Report filed by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Davis, Shan)
|
July 28, 2011 |
Filing 792
Second Quarter 2011 STATUS REPORT re #592 Permanent Injunction; filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Tetra Tech EM, Inc.'s Second Quarter 2011 Status Report ))(Vandenburg, Thomas) Event type corrected on 7/29/2011. (MJZ)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing 791
ORDER Granting #470 Motion to Dismiss Sears Roebuck & Company without Leave to Amend, Denying #619 Motion for Sanctions, Denying #682 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, and Denying #698 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing 790
Second STATUS REPORT SECOND QUARTER 2011 STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANT SHAPIRO BROS. INVESTMENT CO. by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing 789
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2011 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: L. Ettinger; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 8:56 - 9:24 AM; Courtroom: 6A; Court convenes. Appearances are noted on the record. The Court shares preliminary thoughts and inclinations. Arguments of counsel are heard. The Court advises how he intends to rule with respect to the motions at issue. For reasons stated, the Court intends to grant #470 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co's Motion to Dismiss; deny #619 Motion for Sanctions Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions; deny #682 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; deny #698 Motion to Vacate Judgment; and grant the parties request to set over #752 Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction.IT IS ORDER that Oral Argument re: #752 Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction, is set over to Friday, 9/9/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom TBD before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Written ruling of the Court will issue. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing 788
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court makes an express finding that there is no just reason for delay, pursuant to Rule 54(b), for the Shapiro Defendants to appeal this Courts October 20, 2010 (#487 ) order. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: USCA - ASB)
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing 787
SUPPLEMENT to Response to #619 MOTION for Sanctions by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Howe in Support of Oppositions to Sears Roebuck & Cos Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 470) and Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions (Doc. 619), #2 Exhibit 1-Part 1 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #3 Exhibit 1-Part 2 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #4 Exhibit 1-Part 3 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #5 Exhibit 1-Part 4 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #6 Exhibit 2-Part 1 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #7 Exhibit 2-Part 2 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #8 Exhibit 2-Part 3 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #9 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #10 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #11 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #12 Exhibit 6-Part 1 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #13 Exhibit 6-Part 2 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #14 Exhibit 6-Part 3 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #15 Exhibit 6-Part 4 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #16 Exhibit 6-Part 5 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #17 Exhibit 6-Part 6 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #18 Exhibit 7-Part 1 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #19 Exhibit 7-Part 2 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #20 Exhibit 7-Part 3 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #21 Exhibit 7-Part 4 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #22 Exhibit 7-Part 5 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #23 Exhibit 8-Part 1 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #24 Exhibit 8-Part 2 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #25 Exhibit 8-Part 3 to Declaration of Robert Howe, #26 Exhibit 8-Part 4 to Declaration of Robert Howe)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing 786
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. DOCUMENT FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
July 13, 2011 |
Filing 785
RESPONSE to #777 Statement, #698 MOTION to Vacate Judgment, #784 Reply to Response to Motion, ; Plaintiffs' Response to Shapiro Brothers Investment Co's Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Recent Decision filed by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. (Greben, Jan)
|
July 12, 2011 |
Filing 784
REPLY to Response to #682 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order, #698 MOTION to Vacate Judgment ; filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Response to "Plaintiffs' Statement of Recent Decision" (Document 777, 777-1) (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
July 12, 2011 |
Filing 783
NOTICE of Hearing LOCATION: Oral Argument re: various pending motions previously scheduled for Friday, 7/15/2011 09:00 AM in LV will be held in LV Courtroom 6A before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(LE)
|
July 12, 2011 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #782 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Jeffrey T. Oberman. CORRECTION: Entry corrected by Court to #782 Motion for Leave to File. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
July 11, 2011 |
Filing 782
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply; filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Responses due by 7/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Surreply in Response to Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Order to Show Cause, #2 Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey) Event type corrected on 7/12/2011. (MJZ)
|
July 7, 2011 |
Filing 781
REPLY to Response to #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. in Support of Motion (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
July 5, 2011 |
Filing 780
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #766 Stipulation re: Nevada Division of Environmental Protections Order to Show Cause (Dkt. #752 ). Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
July 5, 2011 |
Filing 779
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #778 Stipulation re: Nevada Division of Environmental Protection's Order to Show Cause (Dkt. #752 ). Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
July 1, 2011 |
Filing 778
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction ; by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
June 30, 2011 |
Filing 777
STATEMENT of Recent Decision by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Greben, Jan)
|
June 29, 2011 |
Filing 776
JOINDER to #775 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) ; Maryland Square, LLC's Joinder to Kishner Defendants' Draft Work Plan for Mitigation of Indoor Air and Well Water filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Davis, Shan)
|
June 29, 2011 |
Filing 775
NOTICE by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC re #592 Permanent Injunction. (Kishner Defendants' Draft Work Plan for Mitigation of Indoor Air and Well Water) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
June 28, 2011 |
Filing 774
RESPONSE to #768 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction, filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Replies due by 7/8/2011. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
June 28, 2011 |
Filing 773
OBJECTION to #767 Joinder, ; NDEP's Objection to Voggenthaler's Joinder in Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants should not be held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
June 27, 2011 |
Filing 772
EXHIBIT C DECLARATION of Jeffrey T. Oberman re #771 RESPONSE; filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oberman, Jeffrey) Modified event and added correct document relationship on 6/28/2011 (RFJ).
|
June 27, 2011 |
Filing 771
RESPONSE to #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction, filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Replies due by 7/7/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
June 20, 2011 |
Filing 770
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada NDEP'S DOCUMENT FILING PURSUANT TO PERMANENT INJUNCTION (DOC 592) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
June 14, 2011 |
Filing 769
NOTICE by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC re #592 Permanent Injunction. [Kishner Defendants Corrective Action Plan for Groundwater] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrective Action Plan for Groundwater)(Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
June 14, 2011 |
Filing 768
WITHDRAWN per #912 ORDER (MMM) MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 6/14/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas F. Vandenburg in Support of)(Vandenburg, Thomas) .
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing 767
JOINDER to #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction ; filed by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jan Greben in Support of Joinder)(Greben, Jan)
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing 766
STIPULATION re #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction ; (Amended) by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing 765
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 6/13/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. IT IS ORDERED the pending #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction, is hereby set for hearing in conjunction with the other pending motions previously scheduled for 7/15/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom TBD before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
June 13, 2011 |
Filing 764
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #606 Notice of Appeal, filed by Melvin Shapiro. USCA Case Number 11-15176. The court has received and reviewed the response to the February 8, 2011 order to show cause. Although the district court certified the issues in its October 20, 2010 order for appeal purposes, it did not expressly determine that there is not just reason for delay as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b)("Rule 54(b)") in its December 3, 2010 "Minutes of Proceeding." Accordingly, this appeal is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of enabling the district court to make the express determinations required by Rule 54(b). Within 60 days after the filing date of this order or within 7 days after the district court's ruling on this matter, whichever occurs first, appellants shall file a report on the status of the district court proceedings and motion for appropriate relief. This appeal is stayed pending dispostion of the limited remand. (JAG)
|
June 3, 2011 |
Filing 763
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Scott R. Cook on behalf of Defendant Herman Kishner. (Cook, Scott)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing 762
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #753 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice against defendant Clark County School District. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing 761
STIPULATION re #752 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction ; and [Proposed] Order by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, Thomas)
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing 760
EXHIBIT(s) B to #754 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing 759
EXHIBIT(s) A8 & A9 to #754 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A9)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing 758
EXHIBIT(s) A6 & A7 to #754 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A7)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing 757
EXHIBIT(s) A4 & A5 to #754 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A5)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing 756
EXHIBIT(s) A2 & A3 to #754 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A3)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing 755
EXHIBIT(s) A & A1 to #754 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing 754
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. NDEP's First Quarter 2011 Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (Doc 592) (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 18, 2011 |
Filing 753
STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
May 13, 2011 |
Filing 752
MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should not be Held in Contempt for Violating Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Motion ripe 5/13/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 12, 2011 |
Filing 751
EXHIBIT(s) D-1, Amended filing to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 12, 2011 |
Filing 750
EXHIBIT(s) D, Amended filing to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 12, 2011 |
Filing 749
REPLY to Response to #682 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order, #698 MOTION to Vacate Judgment ; filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 748
EXHIBIT(s) Q3 & Q4 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q4)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 747
EXHIBIT(s) Q1 & Q2 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q2)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 746
EXHIBIT(s) Q to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 745
EXHIBIT(s) O11 & P to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 744
EXHIBIT(s) O9 & O10 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 743
EXHIBIT(s) O8 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 742
EXHIBIT(s) O7-a to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 741
EXHIBIT(s) O7 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 740
EXHIBIT(s) O6 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 739
EXHIBIT(s) O5 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 738
EXHIBIT(s) O4 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 737
EXHIBIT(s) O3 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 736
EXHIBIT(s) O1 & O2 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O2)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 735
EXHIBIT(s) O to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 734
EXHIBIT(s) M5 & N to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 733
EXHIBIT(s) M4 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 732
EXHIBIT(s) M1, M2 & M3 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M2, #2 Exhibit M3)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 731
EXHIBIT(s) M to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 730
EXHIBIT(s) J1, K & L to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 729
EXHIBIT(s) J to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 728
EXHIBIT(s) I1 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 727
EXHIBIT(s) I to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 726
EXHIBIT(s) H5 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 725
EXHIBIT(s) H4-a to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 724
EXHIBIT(s) H4 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 723
EXHIBIT(s) H3 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 722
EXHIBIT(s) H2-a to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 721
EXHIBIT(s) H2 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 720
EXHIBIT(s) H & H1 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H1)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 719
EXHIBIT(s) C, D, E, F & G to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 718
EXHIBIT(s) B1 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 717
EXHIBIT(s) B to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 716
EXHIBIT(s) A5 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 715
EXHIBIT(s) A2(b), A3 & A4 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 714
EXHIBIT(s) A2(a) to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 713
EXHIBIT(s) A2 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 712
EXHIBIT(s) A1-A2 to #711 Notice (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing 711
NOTICE by Plaintiff State Of Nevada re #592 Permanent Injunction. Notice of NDEP's Document Filing Pursuant to Permanent Injunction (Doc 592) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Jasmine)
|
May 3, 2011 |
Filing 710
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William J Frey on behalf of Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Notice of Appearance of Jasmine K. Mehta (Frey, William)
|
May 3, 2011 |
Filing 709
JOINDER to Response to #698 MOTION to Vacate Judgment; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Frey, William) Docket entry relationship corrected on 5/3/2011. (MJZ)
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing 708
RESPONSE to #698 MOTION to Vacate Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. In Opposition to Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for Relief from Judgment and Request for Indicative Ruling. Replies due by 5/12/2011. (Greben, Jan)
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing 707
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, appellant's opposed motion to suspend briefing schedule ending the district court's determination of apellant's motion for indicative ruling and related relief is granted as to #605 Notice of Appeal filed by Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. This case is stayed until August 15, 2011. On or before the expiratin of the stay, appellant shall file the opening brief or file an appropriate motion addressing the status of the case and requesting continuance of the stay or other relief. USCA Case Number 11-15174. (JAG)
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing 706
EXHIBIT(s) E, F & G to #705 Response - Other, ; filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E (2), #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G (1), #4 Exhibit G (2))(Frey, William)
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing 705
RESPONSE to #677 Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion for More Definite Statement, ; NDEP's Document Filing Pursuant to Court Order (Doc #77) dated February 28, 2011 filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Frey, William)
|
April 29, 2011 |
Filing 704
JOINDER to #703 Status Report ; Maryland Square, LLC's Joinder to Kishner Defendants' First Quarter 2011 Status Report filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Davis, Shan)
|
April 29, 2011 |
Filing 703
Quarterly STATUS REPORT First Quarter 2011 Status Report by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
April 28, 2011 |
Filing 702
STATUS REPORT FIRST QUARTER 2011 by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey) .
|
April 19, 2011 |
Filing 701
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Robert C. Jones, United States District Judge on April 19, 2011, by: Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #470 Motion to Dismiss; #619 Motion for Sanctions; #682 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order and #698 Motion to Vacate Judgment is set for FRIDAY, 07/15/2011 at 09:00 AM in Las Vegas Courtroom, TBD before Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
April 18, 2011 |
Filing 700
JOINDER to #698 MOTION to Vacate Judgment ; Kishner Defendants Joinder to Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.s Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Civ. R. 60(B)(4) and Request for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Civ. R. 62.1 filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
April 18, 2011 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #698 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Jeffrey T. Oberman. CORRECTION: Entry corrected by Court to #698 MOTION to Vacate. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
April 14, 2011 |
Filing 699
JOINDER to #698 MOTION to Vacate Judgment; filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Davis, Shan)
|
April 14, 2011 |
Filing 698
MOTION to Vacate Judgment by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Responses due by 5/1/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey) Event type corrected on 4/18/2011. (MJZ)
|
March 31, 2011 |
Filing 697
REPLY to Response to #682 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order ; filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion for Reconsideration for Relief from Judgment (Document 695) (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 24, 2011 |
Filing 696
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #685 Notice of Appeal filed by Maryland Square LLC, #691 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Barbara Montero, Kristian Meier, Roger Ellsworth, Verna Walker, Aiko Berge, Honore Gauthier, William Montero, Jane Gauthier, Mirha Elias, Ofelia Yencheck, Brenda C. Chaffin, Daniel Soldini, Arthur Bodendorfer, Charles Walker, Hermann Rosner, Dragan Kurajica, James Luehmann, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Victor Becerra, Richard Falen, Jack Yencheck, Eliza Acosta, Marcus Rothkranz, Clifford Rogers, Jason Cowles, Sharon Rogers, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Michael J. Solmi, Jacqueline Luehmann, Richard Malm, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Nikolas Konstantinou, Ruth Mannheimer. USCA Case Number 11-15657, 11-15658. (JAG)
|
March 22, 2011 |
Filing 695
RESPONSE to #682 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. Replies due by 4/1/2011. (Greben, Jan) Docket text corrected on 3/23/2011. (MJZ)
|
March 21, 2011 |
Filing 694
NOTICE by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC re #677 Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, Order on Motion for More Definite Statement,. (Kishner Defendants Notice of Intent to Conduct Soil Gas Testing Pursuant to Court Order (Doc. #677) Dated February 28, 2011) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Work Plan for Passive Soil Gas Investigation])(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
March 18, 2011 |
Filing 693
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #691 Notice of Appeal,,,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
|
March 18, 2011 |
Filing 692
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1922207 re #691 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Barbara Montero, Kristian Meier, Roger Ellsworth, Verna Walker, Aiko Berge, Honore Gauthier, William Montero, Jane Gauthier, Mirha Elias, Ofelia Yencheck, Brenda C. Chaffin, Daniel Soldini, Arthur Bodendorfer, Charles Walker, Hermann Rosner, Dragan Kurajica, James Luehmann, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Victor Becerra, Richard Falen, Jack Yencheck, Eliza Acosta, Marcus Rothkranz, Clifford Rogers, Jason Cowles, Sharon Rogers, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Michael J. Solmi, Jacqueline Luehmann, Richard Malm, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Nikolas Konstantinou, Ruth Mannheimer. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing 691
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #671 Judgment,, by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1922207. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing 690
ORDER Granting #674 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David F. Wood and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Melissa J. Roose for Melvin Shapiro, the Estate of Philip Shapiro and Shapiro Bros. Investment Corporation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/17/11. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing 689
ORDER granting #675 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew O. Kovacs and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Melissa J. Roose for Melvin Shapiro, the Estate of Philip Shapiro and Shapiro Bros. Investment Corporation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/17/11. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/17/11. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing 688
ORDER Granting #676 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick S. Schoenburg and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Melissa J. Roose for Melvin Shapiro, the Estate of Philip Shapiro and Shapiro Bros. Investment Corporation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/17/11. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing 687
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #685 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing 686
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1919304 re #685 Notice of Appeal filed by Maryland Square LLC. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing 685
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #671 Judgment,, by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1919304. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Davis, Shan)
|
March 9, 2011 |
Filing 684
JOINDER to #682 MOTION to Consider Anticipated Motion to Vacate Permanent Injunction ; [Kishner Defendants Joinder to Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.s Motion Asking This Court to Consider Its Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Civ.R. 60(b)(4)] filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
March 8, 2011 |
Filing 683
JOINDER to #682 MOTION DEFENDANT SHAPIRO BROTHERS INVESTMENT CO.'S MOTION ASKING THIS COURT TO CONSIDER ITS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIV. R. 60(b)(4) re #592 Permanent Injunction, #641 Order on Motion to Dismiss MOTION DEFENDANT SHAPIRO BROTHERS INVESTMENT CO.'S MOTION ASKING THIS COURT TO CONSIDER ITS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIV. R. 60(b)(4) re #592 Permanent Injunction, #641 Order on Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Davis, Shan)
|
March 8, 2011 |
Filing 682
MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order; filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Responses due by 3/25/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey) Event type corrected on 3/23/2011. (MJZ)
|
March 3, 2011 |
Filing 681
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #624 Notice of Appeal, by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC [Revised Notice of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeal for the Ninth Circuit (Ninth Circuit Case No. 11-15261)]. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
March 1, 2011 |
Filing 680
JOINDER to #679 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) ; Maryland Square, LLC's Joinder to Kishner Defendants' Community Relations Plan, Work Plan for Mitigation of Indoor Air and Well Water, and Draft Corrective Action Plan for Ground Water filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Shan)
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing 679
NOTICE by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC re #592 Permanent Injunction. [Kishner Defendants Community Relations Plan, Work Plan for Mitigation of Indoor Air and Well Water, and Draft Corrective Action Plan for Groundwater] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Community Relations Plan, #2 Exhibit B - Draft Work Plan for Mitigation of Indoor Air and Well Water, #3 Exhibit C - Draft Corrective Action Plan for Groundwater, Maryland Square PCE Site)(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing 678
REPLY to Response to #619 MOTION for Sanctions Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ferrario, Mark) Modified text on 3/1/2011 (SRK).
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing 677
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #622 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, Granting in Part and Denying in Part #633 Objection to Order Granting Motion to Compel, and Granting in Part and Denying in Part #665 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 676
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Patrick S. Schoenburg and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Melissa J. Roose (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1899410) filed by Defendants Estate of Philip Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Cross Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Motion ripe 2/25/2011. (Roose, Melissa)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 675
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew O. Kovacs and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Melissa J. Roose (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1899396) filed by Defendants Estate of Philip Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Counter Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Motion ripe 2/25/2011. (Roose, Melissa)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 674
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David F. Wood and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Melissa J. Roose (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1899355) filed by Defendants Estate of Philip Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Counter Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Motion ripe 2/25/2011. (Roose, Melissa)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 673
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Melissa J. Roose on behalf of Defendants Estate of Philip Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Counter Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Amended Notice of Association of Counsel (Roose, Melissa)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 672
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Defendants Al Phillips The Cleaner, Inc., Estate of Philip Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Counter Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Roose, Melissa)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 671
AMENDED JUDGMENT on Attorney's Fees against Defendants Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, the Herman Kishner Trust d/b/a Maryland Square Shopping Center, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, and Bank of America, as Trustees for The Herman Kishner Trust, and Maryland Square LLC is entered in favor of the law firm of Robertson & Vick in the amount of $247,147.50 and the law firm of Greben & Associates in the amount of $130,890.00. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 2/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 670
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #666 Stipulation to Withdraw and Vacate #597 Judgment and to Sbustitute the Amended Judgment on Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 669
DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC re #624 Notice of Appeal,. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 668
NOTICE by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company re #592 Permanent Injunction. of Report of Defendant Shapiro Bros. Investment Co on the Community Relations Plan and the Work Plan for Mitigation of Indoor Air and Well Water (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 23, 2011 |
Filing 667
CERTIFICATE OF RECORD on #606 Notice of Appeal. The record on appeal, consisting of the reporter's transcripts and the United States District Court clerk's record is ready for the purpose of the appeal. This file exists in electronic format and is accessible via CM/ECF - PACER. The documents comprising the United States District Court clerk's record have been numbered in conformance with Rule 11(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. These document numbers are reflected on the United States District Court's docket sheet and should be used for reference purposes in the briefs. Appeals in Habeas Corpus and 28 USC 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence cases are treated as civil appeals in the Court of Appeals. Criminal appeals briefing schedules will be issued upon the filing of this document. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (no image attached) (JAG)
|
February 18, 2011 |
Filing 666
STIPULATION re #597 Judgment on Attorney Fees ; (Stipulation and Order to Withdraw and Vacate Judgment (Doc. 597) and to Substitute the [Proposed] Amended Judgment on Attorneys Fees) by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Amended Judgment on Attorneys Fees)(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
February 18, 2011 |
Filing 665
Emergency MOTION for More Definite Statement (Kishner Defendants Emergency Motion for Clarification of Order (Doc. 603) Granting Motion to Compel and Subsequent Oral Modifications) by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner. Responses due by 3/7/2011. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
February 18, 2011 |
Filing 664
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Counter Defendant Melvin Shapiro re #606 Notice of Appeal, 467 Motion Hearing,,, 444 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,, 590 Order on Motion,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 411 Miscellaneous Hearing,,,,,, 384 Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 649 Motion Hearing,,,,,. Transcript Designation by Counter Defendant Shapiro Bros. Investment Corp (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 18, 2011 |
Filing 663
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Counter Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company re #605 Notice of Appeal, 467 Motion Hearing,,, 444 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,,,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,, 590 Order on Motion,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 411 Miscellaneous Hearing,,,,,, 384 Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, 649 Motion Hearing,,,,,. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 17, 2011 |
Filing 662
ORDER Granting #629 Motion to Extend Trial Date and Related Trial Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/17/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
February 15, 2011 |
Filing 661
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shan D Davis on behalf of ThirdParty Plaintiff Clark County School District, Cross Defendants Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Cross Claimant Clark County School District, ThirdParty Defendant Clark County School District, Counter Claimant Clark County School District, Counter Defendant Clark County School District, Defendant Clark County School District. (Davis, Shan)
|
February 15, 2011 |
Filing 660
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2011 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Kris Schulke; Pla Counsel: Jennifer L. Taylor (by phone), Jan A. Greben (by phone); Def Counsel: Karl L. Nielson, Randolph Howard (by phone), Jeffrey T. Oberman, Tami D. Cowden, Keith Kaufman, Stacy D. Harrop, Thomas F. Vandenburg (by phone),; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:34:40 - 9:50:20 ; Time of Hearing: 9:30am; Courtroom: 3A; Representation by counsel is heard regarding Emergency Motion to Extend Trial Date and related deadlines (Third Request) (#629). For the reasons stated, IT IS ORDERED that the discovery is stayed and the trial date is vacated. A written order will issue. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing 659
REPLY to #647 Response to Motion ; BOULEVARD MALL, LLCS SURREPLY TO THE KISHNER DEFENDANTS REPLY TO BOULEVARD MALL, LLCS OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATES ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. # 647) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Boulevard Mall. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit Ex. A (part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit Ex. A (part 2 of 2))(Schellerup, Mark)
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing 658
CERTIFICATE OF RECORD on #624 Notice of Appeal. The record on appeal, consisting of the reporter's transcripts and the United States District Court clerk's record is ready for the purpose of the appeal. This file exists in electronic format and is accessible via CM/ECF - PACER. The documents comprising the United States District Court clerk's record have been numbered in conformance with Rule 11(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. These document numbers are reflected on the United States District Court's docket sheet and should be used for reference purposes in the briefs. Appeals in Habeas Corpus and 28 USC 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence cases are treated as civil appeals in the Court of Appeals. Criminal appeals briefing schedules will be issued upon the filing of this document. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (no image attached) (ECS)
|
February 11, 2011 |
Filing 657
RESPONSE to #619 MOTION for Sanctions Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions ; filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Vandenburg, THomas) Modified text on 2/14/2011 (SRK).
|
February 11, 2011 |
Filing 656
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION re #616 Notice of Appeal, 467 Motion Hearing, 384 Motion Hearing, #545 Transcript, #387 Transcript; filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC . (Davis, Shan) Modified text on 2/14/2011 (SRK).
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing 655
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Joel D. Odou on behalf of Defendants Al Phillips The Cleaner, Inc., Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Cross Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Odou, Joel)
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing 654
REPLY to #633 Objection to Document, ; Kishner Defendants Reply to Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.s Objection to Magistrates Order Granting Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert A. Howe)(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
February 9, 2011 |
Filing 653
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 2/9/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Julia Wright. Granting #650 , #651 , and #652 Motions for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the 2/15/2011 Hearing. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
February 9, 2011 |
Filing 652
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Attorney: Alexander Robertson, IV. by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Motion ripe 2/9/2011. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
February 9, 2011 |
Filing 651
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. at February 15, 2011 hearing before the Honorable George Foley JR. Attorney: Jan Greben. by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. Motion ripe 2/9/2011. (Greben, Jan)
|
February 9, 2011 |
Filing 650
Proposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. at February 15, 2011, hearing before the Honorable George Foley Jr. Attorney: William J Frey. by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Motion ripe 2/9/2011. (Frey, William)
|
February 8, 2011 |
Filing 648
ORDER Granting #646 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the February 15, 2011 Hearing by the Kishner Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing 647
RESPONSE to #622 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider #603 Order, filed by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Replies due by 2/17/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Howe)(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing 646
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically. (At the Hearing set for February 15, 2011) Attorney: Thomas F. Vandenburg. by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 2/7/2011. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
February 6, 2011 |
Filing 645
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, held on 1/21/2011, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website
|
February 6, 2011 |
Filing 644
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 590 Order on Motion, Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2010, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing 643
ORDER Granting #639 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Franklin H. Levy and approving Designation of Local Counsel Shan D. Davis for Maryland Square LLC. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/4/11. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing 642
ORDER Granting #332 Hoyt's Motion to Dismiss, #472 Supplement to Motion to Dismiss, and #463 and #473 Bowe Permac, Inc.'s Joinders. Hoyt and Bowe are terminated as parties to this litigation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing 641
ORDER Denying without Prejudice #471 Sears' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing 640
Interim STATUS REPORT Fourth Quarter 2010 by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 3, 2011 |
Filing 639
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Franklin H. Levy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Shan D. Davis (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1875354) filed by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. Motion ripe 2/3/2011. (Davis, Shan) Filer corrected on 2/3/2011. (MJZ)
|
February 2, 2011 |
Filing 638
JOINDER to #629 Emergency MOTION to Continue District Judge Hearing (EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXTEND TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES (THIRD REQUEST) )Emergency MOTION to Continue District Judge Hearing (EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXTEND TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES (THIRD REQUEST) ) ; filed by Shapiro Bros. Investment Co., and filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 1, 2011 |
Filing 637
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #624 Notice of Appeal, filed by Herman Kishner, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. USCA Case Number 11-15261. (JAG)
|
February 1, 2011 |
Filing 636
ORDER that Hoyt Corporation, Bowe Permac Inc, So Nev TBA Supply Co, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, and Sears' Motions #623 #625 #626 #630 #631 for exception from attendance at the 2/15/11 settlement conference are MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/1/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
February 1, 2011 |
Filing 635
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 2/1/2011. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. RE: #629 EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXTEND TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES (THIRD REQUEST) : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, February 15, 2011, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
February 1, 2011 |
Filing 634
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 2/1/2011. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. The Court vacates the settlement conference currently set for February 15, 2011 and will reschedule the settlement conference at an appropriate time after close of discovery.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
January 31, 2011 |
Filing 633
OBJECTION Objection to Magistrate's Order Granting Motion to Compel filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - part 1, #2 Exhibit A - part 2, #3 Exhibit A - part 3, #4 Exhibit B - part 1, #5 Exhibit B - part 2, #6 Exhibit B - part 3, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D - part 1, #9 Exhibit D - part 2, #10 Exhibit D - part 3, #11 Exhibit D - part 4)(Cowden, Tami)
|
January 31, 2011 |
Filing 632
Quarterly STATUS REPORT Fourth Quarter 2010 by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
January 31, 2011 |
Filing 631
MOTION for Exception from Mediation; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co. (Cowden, Tami) Event type corrected on 2/1/2011. (MJZ)
|
January 31, 2011 |
Filing 630
MOTION for Exception from Attendance at Settlement Conference; filed by Third Party Defendants Good Year Tire & Rubber Co., Good Year Tire & Rubber Co. (Harrop, Stacy) Event type corrected on 2/1/2011. (MJZ)
|
January 31, 2011 |
Filing 629
Emergency MOTION to Continue District Judge Hearing (EMERGENCY MOTION TO EXTEND TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES (THIRD REQUEST) ) by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 1/31/2011. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
January 31, 2011 |
Filing 628
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #624 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
|
January 31, 2011 |
Filing 627
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1868149 re #624 Notice of Appeal, filed by Herman Kishner, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
|
January 28, 2011 |
Filing 626
MOTION for Exception to Attend Settlement Conference by ThirdParty Defendant So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co.(Nielson, Karl) Event type corrected on 1/31/2011. (MJZ)
|
January 28, 2011 |
Filing 625
MOTION for Exception to Attend Settlement Conference by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc. (Weyand, Alexander) Event type corrected on 1/31/2011. (MJZ)
|
January 28, 2011 |
Filing 624
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #596 Order, #597 Judgment on Attorney Fees by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1868149. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
January 28, 2011 |
Filing 623
MOTION for Exception to Attend Settlement Conference by ThirdParty Defendant Hoyt Corporation. (Phinney, Brian) Event type corrected on 1/31/2011. (MJZ)
|
January 28, 2011 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #622 OBJECTION. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Mark B. Schellerup. CORRECTION: Entry corrected by Court to #622 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider #603 Order. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
January 27, 2011 |
Filing 622
MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider #603 Order ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Boulevard Mall. (Schellerup, Mark) Event type corrected on 1/28/2011. (MJZ)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing 621
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #616 Notice of Appeal, filed by Maryland Square LLC. USCA Case Number 11-15198. (JAG)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing 620
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1861180 re #616 Notice of Appeal, filed by Maryland Square LLC. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing 619
MOTION for Sanctions Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Responses due by 2/11/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - part 1, #2 Exhibit A - part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Cowden, Tami)
|
January 24, 2011 |
Filing 618
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #616 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (ECS)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing 649
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #332 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint; #367 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; #470 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss; #471 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Voggenthaler Complaint; and #482 Disassociation of Counsel, held on 1/21/2011 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: L Ettinger; Appearance of Counsel are noted : Richard Baron, Tami Cowden, Mark Ferraro, Stacy Harrop, Christopher Newmann, Jeffrey Oberman, Candice Renke, Jennifer Taylor, Thomas Vandenburg and Bradley Schrager; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:58 - 10:31 am; Courtroom: 3D; The Court shares preliminary inclinations, then invites arguments of counsel with respect to the motions at issue. With respect to #471 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Voggenthaler Complaint, the parties stipulated to submit on the briefs. For the reasons discussed, the Court advises that it intends to grant the motions at issue as set forth on the record. Written ruling of the Court will issue. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing 617
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #606 Notice of Appeal, filed by Melvin Shapiro. USCA Case Number 11-15176. (ECS)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing 616
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #592 Permanent Injunction, #597 Judgment on Attorney Fees by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1861180. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Davis, Shan)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing 615
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #605 Notice of Appeal filed by Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. USCA Case Number 11-15174. (JAG)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing 614
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #606 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing 613
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1858223 re #606 Notice of Appeal, filed by Melvin Shapiro. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing 612
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #605 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing 611
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1858202 re #605 Notice of Appeal filed by Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
|
January 20, 2011 |
Filing 610
STIPULATION re #471 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Voggenthaler Complaint ; by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 20, 2011 |
Filing 609
NOTICE of Hearing Location: Oral argument on various pending motions previously set for 1/21/2011 09:00 AM will be held in LV Courtroom 3D before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(LE)
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing 608
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #421 Notice of Appeal, filed by Herman Kishner, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, #502 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Maryland Square LLC, #500 Notice of Appeal, filed by Herman Kishner, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. The court sua sponte consolidates appeal Nos. 10-16860, 10-17517, and 10-17520. The district court entered a permanent injunction on December 27, 2010. Accordingly, this court's September 3, 2010 and November 5, 2010 orders to show cause are discharged. The briefing schedule is reset (see order for schedule). (JAG)
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing 607
APPENDIX Representation Statement to #605 Notice of Appeal ; filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing 606
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 590 Order on Motion,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, #487 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Add and Terminate Parties, by Counter Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1858223. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Representation Statement)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing 605
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #592 Permanent Injunction by Counter Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1858202. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 14, 2011 |
Filing 604
ORDER Denying #569 Motion to Amend/Correct #543 Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
January 13, 2011 |
Filing 603
ORDER Granting #476 Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
January 5, 2011 |
Filing 602
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #421 Notice of Appeal, by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC (Ninth Circuit Case No. 10-16860). E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
January 5, 2011 |
Filing 601
NOTICE by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Name (Hernandez, Cindie)
|
January 3, 2011 |
Filing 600
ORDER Granting #503 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/3/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: USCA - ASB)
|
December 29, 2010 |
Filing 599
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #502 Notice of Appeal,, by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Davis, Shan)
|
December 29, 2010 |
Filing 598
(1st Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Joshua N. Levine, Paul D. Rasmussen, and Paul P. DeAngelis is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (MJZ)
|
December 29, 2010 |
Filing 597
JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees entered in the amount of $463,882.31 to Robertson & Vick and $139,097.83 to Greben & Associates. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 12/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) VACATED on 2/25/11 per #670 Order. (ASB)
|
December 29, 2010 |
Filing 596
ORDER Granting Attorneys Fees and Costs in the amount of $463,882.31 to Robertson & Vick and $139,097.83 to Greben & Associates. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
December 29, 2010 |
Filing 595
ORDER Granting #575 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul P. DeAngelis and approving Attorney Cindie D. Hernandez as Designation of Local Counsel for Bowe Permac, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/28/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
December 29, 2010 |
Filing 594
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shan D Davis on behalf of Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Davis, Shan)
|
December 28, 2010 |
Filing 593
ORDER IN THE CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/28/2010 granting #464 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Third Party Complaint. The Court having reviewed the #464 Motion for Extension of Time, and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the #464 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/28/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LC)
|
December 27, 2010 |
Filing 592
PERMANENT INJUNCTION Governing the Clean Up of Hazardous Substances at and Emanating from Maryland Square Shopping Center. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/27/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
December 21, 2010 |
Filing 591
ORDER Granting #547 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Maryland Square, LLC. William A. Levy and Candice Renka withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
December 20, 2010 |
Filing 589
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing on Maryland Maryland Defendants' Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena #476 held on 12/20/2010 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Jennifer Taylor; Telephonically: Jan Greben, Alexander Robertson; Def Counsel: Candice Renka, Stacy Harrop, Mark Ferrario, Christopher Neumann, Tami Cowden, Keith Kaufman, Cindie Hernandez, Thomas Vandenburg, Karl Nielson; Telephonically: Jeff Diver, Jeffrey Oberman, Alexander Wegand, Brian Phinney; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:43-11:43; Courtroom: 3A; The court makes preliminary statements. Representations of Counsel heard. Defendants' #476 Motion to Compel stands submitted. The Court will issue a written decision. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
|
December 14, 2010 |
Filing 588
ORDER Granting #586 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at December 20, 2010 Hearing, filed by Bowe Permac, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/14/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 14, 2010 |
Filing 587
ORDER Granting #580 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at 12/20/10 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/13/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) Docket entry relationship corrected on 12/115/2010. (MJZ)
|
December 13, 2010 |
Filing 586
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at December 20, 2011, Hearing Before Honorable Judge Robert Jones. Attorney: Alexander M. Weyand. by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. Motion ripe 12/13/2010. (Weyand, Alexander)
|
December 13, 2010 |
Filing 585
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 12/13/2010 RE: Hearing set on Monday, December 20, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel appearing telephonically must make their own arrangements to participate in a conference call. The parties should arrange to meet on a single conference call. Once all parties are present, the conference call should telephone the Courts Meet Me Line (702-868-4910) and enter the password 123456" so that the conference call is connected to the Court. Parties participating telephonically must utilize a land line and may not use a speaker phone or a cellular telephone. (entered 12/13/10 - REO).(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF)
|
December 10, 2010 |
Filing 584
ORDER Granting #578 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Attorney Jan A. Greben at the 12/20/10 Hearing before the Honorable George Foley, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/10/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 10, 2010 |
Filing 583
ORDER Granting #577 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Attorney Jeffrey T. Oberman at 12/20/10 Hearing before the Honorable George Foley, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/10/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 10, 2010 |
Filing 582
ORDER Granting #576 Motion to Appear Telephonically at 12/20/10 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/10/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Docket entry relationship corrected on 12/13/2010. (MJZ)
|
December 10, 2010 |
Filing 581
REPLY to Response to #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Surreply in Opposition to Motion to Compel and Joinder to Surreply Filed by Third Party Defendant Boulevard Mall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cowden, Tami)
|
December 10, 2010 |
Filing 580
MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Dec. 20, 2010 Hearing by Third Party Defendants Hoyt Corporation, Hoyt Corporation. Responses due by 12/27/2010. (Phinney, Brian)
|
December 9, 2010 |
Filing 579
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #500 Notice of Appeal, by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC (Revised Notice of Appeal to The United States Court of Appeal for the Ninth Circuit (Ninth Circuit Case No. 10-17517)). E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
December 8, 2010 |
Filing 578
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically. At December 20, 2010 Hearing Before Honorable Judge George Foley, Jr. Attorney: Jan A. Greben. by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Motion ripe 12/8/2010. (Greben, Jan)
|
December 8, 2010 |
Filing 577
MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on December 20, 2010. Attorney: Jeffrey T. Oberman. by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 12/8/2010. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
December 7, 2010 |
Filing 576
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at 12-20-10 Hearing. Attorney: Alexander Robertson, IV, Esq.. by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Motion ripe 12/7/2010. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 7, 2010 |
Filing 575
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Paul P. DeAngelis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Cindie D. Hernandez (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1815140) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. Motion ripe 12/7/2010. (Hernandez, Cindie)
|
December 7, 2010 |
Filing 574
ORDER. Granting #560 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the December 20, 2010 Hearing before the Honorable George Foley, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/7/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing 590
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #460 Proposed Order Submission for Permanet Injunction, #468 Proposed Order Submission for Permanet Injunction, and #526 Motion Defendants Melvin Shapiro's and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment and for an Express Determination of No Just Reason for Delay, and (2) to Modify, Alter or Amend Judgment by Defendant Melvin Shapiro , held on 12/3/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Counsel appearing in the courtroom: William Frey, Jeffrey Oberman, Candice Renka, Alexander Robertson, Paul Rasmussen, and Bradley Schrager. Counsel appearing telephonically: Tami Cowden, Jan Greben, and Brian Phinney; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 11:29 - 11:49 am; Courtroom: 3D; The Court shares preliminary inclinations, then hears arguments of counsel as to their respective positions regarding the subject motions. Having heard from the parties and for reasons set forth on the record, the Court will include the "Shapiro Brothers" as defendants in the Permanent Injunction. The Kishner defendants' request to revise the Proposed Permanent Injunction to 270 days to complete the Corrective Action Report is DENIED. The Court will review #468 Proposed Order for Permanent Injunction. Order will issue. With respect to #526 Motion Defendants Melvin Shapiro's and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment and for an Express Determination of No Just Reason for Delay, and (2) to Modify, Alter or Amend Judgment by Defendant Melvin Shapiro , the Court DENIES IN PART AND GRANTS IN PART. DENIED with respect to Direct entry of Final Judgment: GRANTED with respect to Modify, Alter or Amend #487 Order. The Court further states that, for appeal purposes, the Court will grant certification to the issues determined in #487 Order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing 573
JOINDER to #566 Response to Motion, ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. (Renka, Candice)
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing 572
REPLY to Response to #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Boulevard Mall. (Surreply To The Kishner Defendants Reply (Doc. # 548) To BMLLC's Opposition To Kishners Motion To Compel Compliance With Subpoena) (Schellerup, Mark)
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing 571
ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/3/2010, by Laura Clark Judicial Assistant denying #452 Motion to Strike Paragraphs 2 Through 10 of the Declaration of Jerry Engel. The Court having reviewed #452 Motion to Strike and good cause appearing, IT IS SO ORDERED #452 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/3/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LC)
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing 570
ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/3/2010, by Laura Clark Judicial Assistant. The Court having reviewed #367 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs' Motion #367 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/3/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LC)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing 569
MOTION to Amend/Correct #543 Judgment on Attorney Fees, #546 Clerk's Judgment. by Defendant Shapiro Bros. Investment Corp by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 12/19/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket 543 Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Docket 546)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing 568
REPLY to Response to #535 MOTION for Permanent Injunction ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO THE KISHNER DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DIRECT ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR ATTORNEYS FEES (#535) (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing 567
ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/2/2010, by Laura Clark Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #563 Motion to Appear Telephonically is GRANTED. The following instructions are given in that regard: Counsel approved to appear telephonically shall dial into the meet-me-line number (1-702-868-4925) five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. The password for the meet-me-line is 123456. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is PROHIBITED. The call must be made using a land line. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/2/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LC)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing 566
RESPONSE to #535 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Kishner Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Direct Entry of Final Judgment for Attorneys Fees) Replies due by 12/12/2010. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing 565
ORDER Granting #485 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul D. Rasmussen for Bank Of America for Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael C. Hetey. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/1/2010. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing 563
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Attorney: Mark E. Ferrario. by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Motion ripe 12/2/2010. (Ferrario, Mark)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing 562
JOINDER to #559 Response - Other,,, ; Maryland Square LLC's Joinder to the Kishner Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Direct Entry of Final Permanent Injunction (531); for Permanent Injunction (535); Proposed Permanent Injunction (468); and NDEP's Proposed Permanent Injunction (460) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. (Renka, Candice)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing 561
ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/2/2010, by Laura Clark Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #556 Motion to Appear Telephonically and #557 Motion to Appear Telephonically are GRANTED. The following instructions are given in that regard: Counsel approved to appear telephonically shall dial into the meet-me-line number (1-702-868-4925) five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. The password for the meet-me-line is 123456. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is PROHIBITED. The call must be made using a land line. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/2/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LC)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing 560
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Attorney: Jeffrey R. Diver, Esq.. by ThirdParty Defendant Boulevard Mall. Motion ripe 12/2/2010. (Schellerup, Mark)
|
December 1, 2010 |
Filing 564
ORDER Granting #484 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua N. Levine for Bank Of America for Jerry Engel,Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael C. Hetey. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/1/2010. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
December 1, 2010 |
Filing 559
RESPONSE to #535 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #468 Proposed Order Submission,,, #460 Proposed Order Submission, #531 MOTION for Judgment (Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment for Attorneys Fees and (2) to Direct Entry of Final Permanent Injunction) MOTION for Judgment (Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment for Attorneys Fees and (2) to Direct Entry of Final Permanent Injunction) MOTION for Judgment (Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment for Attorneys Fees and (2) to Direct Entry of Final Permanent Injunction) MOTION for Judgment (Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment for Attorneys Fees and (2) to Direct Entry of Final Permanent Injunction) ; filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
December 1, 2010 |
Filing 558
REPLY to Response to #535 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #531 MOTION for Judgment (Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment for Attorneys Fees and (2) to Direct Entry of Final Permanent Injunction) MOTION for Judgment (Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment for Attorneys Fees and (2) to Direct Entry of Final Permanent Injunction) MOTION for Judgment (Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment for Attorneys Fees and (2) to Direct Entry of Final Permanent Injunction) MOTION for Judgment (Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment for Attorneys Fees and (2) to Direct Entry of Final Permanent Injunction) ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Alexander Robertson, IV, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 1, 2010 |
Filing 557
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically. At December 3, 2010 hearing before Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones Attorney: Jan Greben. by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Motion ripe 12/1/2010. (Greben, Jan)
|
December 1, 2010 |
Filing 556
MOTION Leave to Appear Telephonically re 555 Minute Order Setting Hearing, by Third Party Defendants Hoyt Corporation, Hoyt Corporation. Responses due by 12/18/2010. (Phinney, Brian)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing 555
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 11/30/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger.ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #460 Proposed Order on Permanent Injunction and #468 Proposed Order on Permanent Injunction is scheduled for Friday, 12/3/2010 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing 554
NOTICE of Hearing on #476 Defendants' MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena : Motion Hearing set for Monday, December 20, 2010, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing 553
ORDER Granting #530 & #532 Motions for Leave to Appear Telephonically at 11/29/2010 Hearing before Honorable George Foley, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing 552
ORDER Denying #527 Renewed Request that Presentation of Testimonial Evidence be Permitted at Hearing of Motion to Compel filed by Sears Roebuck & Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing 551
ORDER that Plaintiff State of Nevada Division of Environmental Protections Motion to Appear Telephonically at 11/29/10 Hearing Before Honorable George Foley, Jr. #539 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing 550
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 444 Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2010, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joy Garner, 702-384-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/21/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2011. (ABB)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing 549
REPLY to Response to #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena ; filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (as to the Opposition filed by Sears Roebuck & Co.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, pages 1-14, #2 Exhibit A, pages 15-23, #3 Exhibit A, pages 24-38)(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing 548
REPLY to Response to #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena ; filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (as to the Opposition filed by Boulevard Mall, LLC) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, pages 1-14, #2 Exhibit A, pages 15-23, #3 Exhibit A, pages 24-38)(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing 547
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for MSLLC and CCSD by Candice E. Renka, Esq.. by Third Party Plaintiffs Clark County School District, Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimants Clark County School District, Maryland Square LLC, Third Party Defendants Clark County School District, Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimants Clark County School District, Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendants Clark County School District, Maryland Square LLC, Defendants Clark County School District, Maryland Square LLC. Motion ripe 11/29/2010. (Renka, Candice)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing 546
AMENDED JUDGMENT on Costs in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants in the amount of $224,932.64. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing 545
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 467 Motion Hearing held on 9/16/2010, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 544
REPLY to #527 Notice (Other) ; Kishner Defendants Reply to Sears Roebuck & Co.s Renewed Request That Presentation of Testimonial Evidence Be Permitted at Hearing of Motion to Compel filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 543
JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants in the amount of $224,932.64. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/24/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 542
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC re #502 Notice of Appeal,, 384 Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,. (Second Designation) (Renka, Candice)
|
November 23, 2010 |
Filing 540
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC re #502 Notice of Appeal,, 467 Motion Hearing,,,. (Renka, Candice)
|
November 22, 2010 |
Filing 539
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Plaintiff, State of Nevada's Motion to Appear Telephonically at November 29, 2010, Hearing before Honorable George Foley Jr., Attorney: William Frey. by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Motion ripe 11/22/2010. (Frey, William)
|
November 22, 2010 |
Filing 538
(1st Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Cherie Harpell is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (MJZ)
|
November 22, 2010 |
Filing 537
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #529 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply to #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena. Replies due by 11/29/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/22/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 22, 2010 |
Filing 536
RESPONSE to #535 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. and Shapiro Bros Investment Co Replies due by 12/2/2010. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
November 22, 2010 |
Filing 534
RESPONSE to #531 MOTION for Judgment, filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Replies due by 12/2/2010. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
November 22, 2010 |
Filing 533
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 11/22/2010. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. RE: #476 Defendants' MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena The hearing currently set for Defendants' motion on November 29, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. is vacated and will be rescheduled by order of the court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
November 22, 2010 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #531 MOTION for Judgment. ERROR: Document should've been filed as two separate entries by attorney Jennifer Taylor. CORRECTION: Entry refiled by Court as #535 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing 535
MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Responses due by 12/6/2010. (MJZ)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing 532
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically. At the November 29, 2010 Hearing Before Honorable Judge George Foley, Jr. Attorney: Jan A. Greben. by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Motion ripe 11/19/2010. (Greben, Jan)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing 531
MOTION for Judgment (Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment for Attorneys Fees and (2) to Direct Entry of Final Permanent Injunction) by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Responses due by 12/6/2010. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing 530
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Attorney: Alexander Robertson, IV. by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Motion ripe 11/19/2010. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing 529
STIPULATION re #521 Response to Motion, #522 Response to Motion,,, ; Stipulation and Order for Third Party Plaintiffs The Kishner Defendants to Reply to Third Party Defendants Boulevard Mall, LLC And Sears Roebuck & Co.s Oppositions to The Kishner Defendants Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing 528
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 11/19/2010. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. RE: #527 Renewed Request that Presentation of Testimonial Evidence be Permitted at Hearing on Motion to CompelIT IS ORDERED that a response to this request is due no later than Wednesday, November 24, 2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
November 18, 2010 |
Filing 527
NOTICE by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co. re #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena. Renewed Request that Presentation of Testimonial Evidence Be Permitted at Hearing of Motion to Compel (Cowden, Tami)
|
November 17, 2010 |
Filing 526
MOTION re #487 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Add and Terminate Parties, Defendants Melvin Shapiro's and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.'s Motion (1) to Direct Entry of Final Judgment and for an Express Determination of No Just Reason for Delay, and (2) to Modify, Alter or Amend Judgment by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 12/4/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order [Document 487)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
November 17, 2010 |
Filing 525
ADDENDUM to #521 Response to Motion, ; by ThirdParty Defendant Boulevard Mall. (Schellerup, Mark)
|
November 16, 2010 |
Filing 524
JOINDER to #492 Reply to Response to Motion, ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co.. (Nielson, Karl)
|
November 15, 2010 |
Filing 523
ERRATA to #522 Response to Motion,,, ; Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Errata to Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliancewith Subpoena and Joinder to Opposition Filed by Boulevard Mall filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Expert Report - part 1, #2 Expert Report - part 2)(Cowden, Tami)
|
November 12, 2010 |
Filing 522
RESPONSE to #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena, filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena and Joinder to Opposition Filed by Boulevard Mall Replies due by 11/22/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Expert Report to Exh A, #3 Attach 1 to Exh A, #4 Attach 2 to Exh A, #5 Attach 3 to Exh A, #6 Attach 4 - part 1 to Exh A, #7 Attach 4 - part 2 to Exh A, #8 Attach 4 - part 3 to Exh A, #9 Attach 4 - part 4 to Exh A, #10 Attach 5 to Exh A, #11 Attach 6 to Exh A, #12 Attach 7 to Exh A, #13 Attach 8 to Exh A, #14 Attach 9 to Exh A, #15 Attach 10 - part 1 to Exh A, #16 Attach 10 - part 2 to Exh A, #17 Attach 10 - part 3 to Exh A, #18 Attach 11 - part 1 to Exh A, #19 Attach 11 - part 2 to Exh A, #20 Exhibit B, #21 Exhibit C, #22 Exhibit D, #23 Exhibit E, #24 Exhibit F)(Cowden, Tami)
|
November 12, 2010 |
Filing 521
RESPONSE to #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena, filed by ThirdParty Defendant Boulevard Mall. Replies due by 11/22/2010. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Schellerup, Mark)
|
November 12, 2010 |
Filing 520
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. (Weyand, Alexander)
|
November 10, 2010 |
Filing 519
ORDER Denying #514 Request that Presentation of Testimonial Evidence be Permitted at Hearing of Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/10/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 10, 2010 |
Filing 518
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC re #500 Notice of Appeal, 467 Motion Hearing,,,. [Court of Appeals Case No. 10-17517] (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
November 10, 2010 |
Filing 517
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC re #421 Notice of Appeal, 384 Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, #387 Transcript,,. [Court of Appeals Case No. 10-16860] (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
November 9, 2010 |
Filing 516
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #503 Emergency MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal (FRCP 62(d)) ; filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
November 9, 2010 |
Filing 515
REPLY to #510 Objection to Document ; Plaintiffs Proposed Order Regarding Attorneys Fees #498 filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Declaration)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 8, 2010 |
Filing 514
MEMORANDUM filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co. re #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena. Request that Presentation of Testimonial Evidence Be Permitted at Hearing of Motion to Compel (Cowden, Tami)
|
November 8, 2010 |
Filing 511
JOINDER to #510 Objection to Document ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. (Renka, Candice)
|
November 5, 2010 |
Filing 541
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - TELEPHONIC - Motion Hearing RE: #503 Emergency MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal (FRCP 62(d)), held on 11/5/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Counsel appearing telephonically: Tami Cowden, Jeremy Gilman, Jan Greben, William Levy, Karl Nielson, Jeffrey Oberman, Candice Renka, Alexander Robertson, Jennifer Taylor, Thomas Vandenburg; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 1:15 - 1:24 PM; Courtroom: 7C; The Court makes preliminary comments with respect to the subject motion, then hears arguments of counsel. Having heard from counsel, the Court makes the following ruling:The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for costs in favor of plaintiffs' and against defendants' in the amount of $224,932.64, in accordance with this Courts #486 Order. Defendants' shall then post a supersedeas bond in the amount of $226,000.00. Upon the posting of the supersedeas bond, the Court will grant defendants' #503 Emergency Motion For Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal and issue a stay of execution of the judgment entered for costs. Counsel shall prepare, circulate and submit a proposed order in accordance with the Court's ruling. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
November 5, 2010 |
Filing 510
OBJECTION to #498 Proposed Order Submission,,,,,, ; filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
November 5, 2010 |
Filing 509
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 11/5/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. Telephonic Oral Argument RE: #503 Emergency MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal (FRCP 62(d)) is scheduled for 11/5/2010 12:30 PM in before Judge Robert C. Jones.Counsel appearing telephonically shall call Debbin McCune at 702-464-5660 for further instructions. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
November 4, 2010 |
Filing 513
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #502 Notice of Appeal, filed by Maryland Square LLC. USCA Case Number 10-17520. (ECS)
|
November 4, 2010 |
Filing 512
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #500 Notice of Appeal, filed by Herman Kishner, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. USCA Case Number 10-17517. (ECS)
|
November 4, 2010 |
Filing 508
JOINDER to #503 Emergency MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal (FRCP 62(d)) ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. (Levy, William)
|
November 4, 2010 |
Filing 507
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #502 Notice of Appeal,,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
|
November 4, 2010 |
Filing 506
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #500 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
|
November 4, 2010 |
Filing 505
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1784750 re #500 Notice of Appeal, filed by Herman Kishner, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
|
November 4, 2010 |
Filing 504
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1785057 re #502 Notice of Appeal, filed by Maryland Square LLC. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
|
November 3, 2010 |
Filing 503
Emergency MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal (FRCP 62(d)) by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 11/3/2010. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
November 3, 2010 |
Filing 502
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #486 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, #488 Order on Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1785057. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Levy, William)
|
November 3, 2010 |
Filing 501
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 2/15/2011 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/3/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
November 3, 2010 |
Filing 500
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #486 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1784750. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Vandenburg, THomas)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing 499
ORDER Granting #494 Notice of Change of Attorney filed by Herman Kishner, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Attorney William A. Levy and Albert G. Marquis terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/2/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing 498
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #486 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck Plaintiffs' (Proposed) Order Regarding Attorneys Fees & Costs in Compliance with Order No. 486. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Proposed Order Regarding Attorney Fees & Costs in Compliance with Order No. 486, #2 Declaration of Alexander Robertson, IV, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Order Re: Attorneys Fees & Costs in Compliance with Order #486, #3 Exhibit A - Part 1 to Declaration of Robertson, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2 to Declaration of Robertson, #5 Declaration of Jan A. Greben in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Order Regarding Attorneys Fees & Costs in Compliance with Order No. 486, #6 Exhibit A - Part 1 to Declaration of Jan Greben, #7 Exhibit A - Part 2 to Declaration of Jan Greben, #8 Exhibit A - Part 3 to Declaration of Jan Greben, #9 Exhibit A - Part 4 to Declaration of Jan Greben, #10 Exhibit A - Part 5 to Declaration of Jan Greben, #11 Exhibit A - Part 6 to Declaration of Jan Greben, #12 Exhibit A - Part 7 to Declaration of Jan Greben)(Greben, Jan)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing 497
MOTION to Appear Telephonically at January 21, 2011 Hearing before The Honorable Judge Robert Jones re 496 Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. Responses due by 11/13/2010. (Weyand, Alexander)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing 496
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 10/27/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #332 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint; #367 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (20 pages) Purusant to Local Rule 7-4; #470 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss; #471 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Voggenthaler Complaint; and #482 DISASSOCIATION of Counsel, is scheduled for Friday, 1/21/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom TBD before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing 495
REPLY to Response to #471 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Voggenthaler Complaint ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Voggenthaler Complaint (Cowden, Tami)
|
October 22, 2010 |
Filing 494
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Amended Disassociation of Counsel (Gerber, Jason)
|
October 22, 2010 |
Filing 493
ORDER Granting #491 Motion to Extend Time to #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena. Responses due by 11/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/22/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing 492
REPLY to Response to #471 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Voggenthaler Complaint ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Third Party Complaint (Cowden, Tami)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 491
MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter re #476 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by ThirdParty Defendant Boulevard Mall. Motion ripe 10/20/2010. (Schellerup, Mark)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 490
ORDER Granting #483 Motion for Continuance and Extension of Time to Oppose Motion to Compel Compliance. (Responses due by 11/12/2010; and Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2010 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr..) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/20/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 489
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 10/20/2010. The language of #482 Disassociation of Counsel is vague. It is unclear to the Court whether Marquis & Aurbach's attorneys are requesting leave to withdraw from representation of several defendants or whether Marquis & Aurbach is stating that Dongell Lawrence Finney LLP has withdrawn from representation of the defendants. Jason Gerber and the law firm of Marquis & Aurbach shall file an additional notice or motion clarifying what relief they are requesting, or alternatively, clarifying what information they are attempting to communicate to the Court. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - REO)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 488
ORDER Denying #412 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider #390 Order on #164 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 487
ORDER Granting #410 Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendants' Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Bank Of America and Jerry Engel terminated. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 486
ORDER Granting #400 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 485
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Paul D. Rasmussen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Hetey (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1770824) by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 10/20/2010. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 484
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joshua N. Levine and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Hetey (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1770771) by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 10/20/2010. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing 483
First MOTION to Continue Magistrate Judge Hearing Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion for Continuance and Extension of Time to Oppose Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena (First Request) by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Motion ripe 10/19/2010. (Cowden, Tami)
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing 482
DISASSOCIATION of Counsel; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason) Event type corrected on 10/18/2010. (MJZ)
|
October 14, 2010 |
Filing 481
RESPONSE to #471 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Voggenthaler Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Sears Roebuck and Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Voggenthaler Complaint Replies due by 10/24/2010. (Greben, Jan)
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing 480
NOTICE of Hearing on #476 Defendants' MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena : Motion Hearing set for Thursday, November 4, 2010, at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
|
October 11, 2010 |
Filing 479
RESPONSE to #470 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Third Party Plaintiffs' Opposition to Third Party Defendant Sears & Roebuck Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Replies due by 10/21/2010. (Vandenburg, THomas)
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing 478
JOINDER to #470 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co.. (Nielson, Karl)
|
October 7, 2010 |
Filing 477
ANSWER to #447 Third Party Complaint,, (First Amended TPC) filed by Boulevard Mall.(Schellerup, Mark)
|
October 5, 2010 |
Filing 476
MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Responses due by 10/22/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Gerber, Jason)
|
October 2, 2010 |
Filing 475
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Estate of Philip Shapiro. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
October 1, 2010 |
Filing 474
Third Party Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's ANSWER to #447 Third Party Complaint,, filed by Good Year Tire & Rubber Co..(Harrop, Stacy)
|
October 1, 2010 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #472 MOTION to Dismiss. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Brian H. Phinney; CORRECTION: Entry corrected by Court to #472 SUPPLEMENT. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing 473
JOINDER to Supplement to #332 MOTION to Dismiss ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc. (Weyand, Alexander) Docket entry relationship corrected on 10/1/2010. (MJZ)
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing 472
SUPPLEMENT to #332 MOTION to Dismiss by Third Party Defendants Hoyt Corporation, Hoyt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Phinney, Brian) Event type corrected on 10/1/2010. (MJZ)
|
September 27, 2010 |
Filing 471
MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Voggenthaler Complaint by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Responses due by 10/14/2010. (Cowden, Tami)
|
September 27, 2010 |
Filing 470
MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Responses due by 10/14/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cowden, Tami)
|
September 24, 2010 |
Filing 469
OBJECTION to #468 Proposed Order Submission,,, ; DEFENDANT SHAPIRO BROTHERS INVESTMENT CO.S OBJECTION TO THE [PROPOSED] PERMANENT INJUNCTION GOVERNING THE CLEAN UP OF HAZARDOUS SUBSTANCES AT AND EMANATING FROM MARYLAND SQUARE SHOPPING CENTER (DOCUMENT 468), SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS ON SEPTEMBER 24, 2010 filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
September 24, 2010 |
Filing 468
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck PERMANENT INJUNCTION GOVERNING THE CLEAN UP OF HAZARDOUS SUBSTANCES AT AND EMANATING FROM MARYLAND SQUARE SHOPPING CENTER. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
September 23, 2010 |
Filing 466
ANSWER to #447 Third Party Complaint,, filed by So. Nev. T.B.A. Supply Co. (Nielson, Karl) Modified to correct filer on 9/24/2010. (ASB)
|
September 23, 2010 |
Filing 465
ANSWER to #447 Third Party Complaint with Jury Demand; filed by Melvin Shapiro. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/3/2010. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/7/2010.(Oberman, Jeffrey) Docket entry relationship modified on 9/24/2010 (SRK).
|
September 22, 2010 |
Filing 464
MOTION to Extend Time to respond re #447 Third Party Complaint, filed by ThirdParty Defendant General Growth Management, Inc.. Motion ripe 9/22/2010. (Schellerup, Mark) Modified to remove duplicate wording and caps on 9/23/2010 (RFJ).
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing 463
JOINDER to #332 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. (Harpell, Cherie)
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing 462
ANSWER to #447 Third Party Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Bowe Permac, Inc..(Harpell, Cherie)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing 467
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs, #410 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #412 MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment held on 9/16/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Counsel appearing in Las Vagas are: Jason Greber, Jeremy Gilman, Jan Greben, Stacy Harrop, William Levy, Jeffrey Oberman, Candice Renka, Alexander Robertson, Thomas Vandenburg. Counsel appearing telephonically are: Cheri Harpell, Christopher Newmann, Brian Phinney; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griner; Time of Hearing: 10:12 AM; Courtroom: 6D; The Court gives preliminary thoughts and inclinations with respect to the motions at issue, then invites arguments of counsel. Motions stand submitted. Written ruling of the Court will issue. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing 461
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 411 Miscellaneous Hearing held on 8/13/2010, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing 460
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. [Proposed] Permanent Injunction Governing the Cleanup of Hazardous Substances at and Emanating from Maryland Square Shopping Center (Frey, William)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing 459
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Proposed Permanent Injunction (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing 458
*AMENDED* - MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 9/14/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. IT IS ORDERED that the Oral Argument RE: #400 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; #410 Motion for Summary Judgment; and #412 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order #390 , scheduled for Thursday, 9/26/2010 9/16/2010 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas will be conducted in Courtroom 6D before Robert C. Jones.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #446 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at September 16, 2010 Hearing Before the Honorable Judge Robert Jones; #448 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Plaintiff State of Nevada's Motion to Appear Telephonically at the September 16, 2010 10:00 AM hearing before the Honorable Robert J. Jones by Attorney: William Frey., ; #450 MOTION Telephonic Appearance,; and #453 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Appear Telephonically at September 16, 2010 Hearing Attorney: Christopher J. Neumann are APPROVED. The following instructions are given in that regard: Counsel approved to appear telephonically shall dial into the meet-me-line number (1-702-464-5625) five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is PROHIBITED. The call must be made using a land line.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE) Modified to correct hearing date on 9/15/2010 (LE).
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing 457
JOINDER to Surreply re #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC.(Gerber, Jason) Event type corrected on 9/16/2010. (MJZ)
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing 456
REPLY to Response to #410 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6)(Gerber, Jason)
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing 455
REPLY to Response to #412 MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. (Renka, Candice)
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing 454
REPLY to Response to #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs ; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table 1, #2 Exhibit Table 2, #3 Exhibit Table 3, #4 Exhibit Table 4, #5 Exhibit Table 5, #6 Exhibit Table 6, #7 Exhibit Table 7)(Gerber, Jason)
|
September 13, 2010 |
Filing 453
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Appear Telephonically at September 16, 2010 Hearing Attorney: Christopher J. Neumann. by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Motion ripe 9/13/2010. (Cowden, Tami)
|
September 13, 2010 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #452 RESPONSE to Motion. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Jeffrey T. Oberman; CORRECTION: Entry corrected by Court to #452 MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 2 through 10 of Declaration of Jerry Engel. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
September 10, 2010 |
Filing 452
MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 2 through 10 of Declaration of Jerry Engel, filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey) Event type corrected on 9/13/2010. (MJZ)
|
September 10, 2010 |
Filing 451
RESPONSE to #410 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. and Shapiro Bros. Investment Co Replies due by 9/27/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Goe v. Physicians, #2 Declaration Melvin Shapiro)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing 450
MOTION Telephonic Appearance by Third Party Defendants Hoyt Corporation, Hoyt Corporation. Responses due by 9/26/2010. (Phinney, Brian)
|
September 8, 2010 |
Filing 449
RESPONSE to #412 MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Opposition to Maryland Square, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration Replies due by 9/18/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jan A. Greben, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Maryland Square, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibits A - C to Declaration of Jan Greben)(Greben, Jan)
|
September 7, 2010 |
Filing 448
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Plaintiff State of Nevada's Motion to Appear Telephonically at the September 16, 2010 10:00 AM hearing before the Honorable Robert J. Jones by Attorney: William Frey. by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Motion ripe 9/7/2010. (Frey, William)
|
September 3, 2010 |
Filing 447
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, The Herman Kishner Trust dba Maryland Square Shopping Center, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, and Bank of America, as Trustees for the Herman Kishner Trust's First Amended Third Party Complaint against 1195 E. Desert Inn Road, LLC, Boulevard Mall, Bowe Permac, Inc., Har Teo Chye, Dr. Clean Management, Inc., Estate of Philip Shapiro, Good Year Tire & Rubber Co., Goss-Jewett & Co., Hoyt Corporation, Sears Roebuck & Co., Superior Tire, Inc., Wiens Properties LLC, filed by Bank Of America(Trustee), Irwin Kishner, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Jerry Engel. Adds and removes parties. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/13/2010.(Gerber, Jason)
|
September 2, 2010 |
Filing 446
MOTION to Appear Telephonically at September 16, 2010 Hearing Before the Honorable Judge Robert Jones re 445 Notice of Hearing on Motion, by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. Responses due by 9/19/2010. (Harpell, Cherie)
|
September 2, 2010 |
Filing 445
NOTICE of Hearing on #410 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #412 MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Order #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs: Motion Hearing currently set for 12/3/2010 is ADVANCED to 9/16/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(MAJ)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing 443
REPLY to Response to #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing 442
DECLARATION of ALEXANDER ROBERTSON, IV re #416 Response - Other,,,, ; by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing 441
DECLARATION of JENNIFER L. TAYLOR IN VERIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL BILL OF COSTS by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing 440
ERRATA to #438 Declaration,,, ; of Jan A. Greben, Esq. filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing 439
DECLARATION of Dennis L. Kennedy, Esq. re #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing 438
DECLARATION of Jan Greben, Esq. re #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1 of 5, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2 of 5, #4 Exhibit B, Part 3 of 5, #5 Exhibit B, Part 4 of 5, #6 Exhibit B, Part 5 of 5)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing 437
DECLARATION re #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Affidavit of Alexander Robertson, IV, Esq.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit A, Part 3 of 3)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing 436
REPLY to Response to #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
August 27, 2010 |
Filing 435
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
August 26, 2010 |
Filing 444
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Melissa Jaime; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joy Garner; Time of Hearing: 12:00 p.m.; Courtroom: 6B; Counsel: Alex Robertson; William Frey; Thomas Vandenburg; Jason Gerber; Candice Renka; Appearing Telephonically; Jan Greben and Jeffrey Oberman. The Court makes preliminary remarks with respect to #433 Revised Proposed Permanent Injunction and hears representations of counsel. Following discussion between the Court and counsel, the Court directs counsel to redraft a final proposed permanent injunction in accordance with today's hearing.Discussions are held between the Court and Ms. Renka re #412 MOTION to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgments. The matter is currently set for hearing on 12/3/2010. At the request of counsel the hearing will be advanced to 9/16/2010 at 10:00 a.m.. Responses due on 9/10/2010; Replies due on 9/14/2010. The Court then hears representation by Mr. Oberman with respect to #393 Motion to Amend. There being no objections. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Motion #393 to Amend is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that all Motions currently set for 12/3/2010 are advanced to 9/16/2010 at 10:00 a.m.. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
|
August 26, 2010 |
Filing 434
SUPPLEMENT to #430 Status Report,, ; by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing 433
Proposed MOTION order for Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff State Of Nevada. Responses due by 9/11/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frey, William) Modified on 12/7/2010 to reflect proposed order. (BLG).
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing 432
ORDER IN THE CHAMBERS of the Honorable Robert C. Jones, United States District Judge on 08/25/2010, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #431 Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Appear Telephonically at August 26, 2010 Hearing is GRANTED. Counsel shall dial (702)464-5625 approximately five minutes prior to the time set for the hearing and remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing 431
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic. Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Appear Telephonically at August 26, 2010 Hearing Attorney: Mark E. Ferrario; Christopher J. Neumann. by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Motion ripe 8/25/2010. (Cowden, Tami)
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing 430
STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing 429
ORDER Granting #420 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Injunction filed by Melvin Shapiro. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/24/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing 428
ORDER Granting #419 MOTION to Appear Telephonically filed by Hoyt Corporation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/24/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing 427
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #421 Notice of Appeal, filed by Herman Kishner, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. USCA Case Number 10-16860. (JAG)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing 426
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 8/24/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs, #410 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and #412 MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, is scheduled for Friday, 12/3/2010 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom TBD before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing 425
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 8/24/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. IT IS ORDERED that oral argument RE: Injunction and #393 Motion to Amend/Correct #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, scheduled for Thursday, 8/26/2010 12:00 PM in LV will be conducted in Courtroom 6B before Judge Robert C. Jones.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #413 Motion to Appear Telephonically, Hoyt Corporation's #419 Motion to Appear Telephonically, and Defendants Melvin Shapiro and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. #420 Motion to Appear Telephonically are GRANTED. Counsel shall dial (702)464-5625 approximately five minutes prior to the time set for the hearing and remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing 424
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #421 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing 423
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1714233 re #421 Notice of Appeal, filed by Herman Kishner, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
|
August 23, 2010 |
Filing 422
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC Stipulation and ORder to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Terrible Herbst, Inc., only with Prejudice. (Gerber, Jason)
|
August 23, 2010 |
Filing 421
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1714233. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Gerber, Jason)
|
August 21, 2010 |
Filing 420
MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Injunction; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 9/7/2010. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing 419
MOTION to Appear Telephonically by ThirdParty Defendant Hoyt Corporation. Responses due by 9/5/2010. (Phinney, Brian)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing 418
JOINDER to #416 Response - Other,,,, ; Maryland Square LLC's Joinder to the Kishner Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs filed by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. (Levy, William)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing 417
JOINDER to #414 Response to Motion,,,, ; Maryland Square LLC's Joinder to the Kishner Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees filed by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. (Levy, William)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing 416
RESPONSE to #400 Motion for Attorney Fees and Related Costs; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gerber, Jason) Docket entry relationship added on 8/24/2010. (MJZ)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing 415
DECLARATION of Jason M. Gerber re #414 Response to Motion,,,, ; by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gerber, Jason)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing 414
RESPONSE to #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs, filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Replies due by 9/5/2010. (Gerber, Jason)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing 413
MOTION Appear Telephonically at the Injunction and Motion to Amend/Correct Order of Motion for Summary Judgment Hearings Before Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones re #393 MOTION to Amend/Correct #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company and MOTION to Amend/Correct #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company and, #376 Proposed Order Submission,, by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Responses due by 9/5/2010. (Greben, Jan)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing 412
MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order re #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. Responses due by 9/5/2010. (Renka, Candice)
|
August 13, 2010 |
Filing 411
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS Re: The Scope of the Injunction, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Appearance of counsel are as follows: Jan Greben, Alex Robertson, Jennifer Taylor, Jason Gerber, Thomas Vondenburg, Candice Renka, Bill Frey, Jeffrey Oberman, Craig Parton, Karl Nielson, Tami Cowden, Chris Newman, and Richard Baron. Appearing Telephonically is Cheri Harpell Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 11:27 AM - 12:12 PM; Courtroom: 6A; The Court makes comments and suggestions with respect to counsels' [407-6] Revised Proposed Permanent Injunction, then solicits input from counsel. Representations of counsel are heard. Following discussion between the Court and counsel, the Court directs counsel to redraft a revised proposed permanent injunction in accordance with today's hearing.IT IS ORDERED that the hearing to determine the scope of the Injunction is continued to Thursday, 8/26/2010 at 12:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6B before Judge Robert C. Jones.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument re: #393 Motion to Amend/Correct #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, is scheduled for Thursday, 8/26/2010 12:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Counsel shall note the change in hearing location from that given in open Court. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE) Modified on 8/17/2010 to note appearances of counsel (LE).
|
August 12, 2010 |
Filing 410
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Responses due by 9/5/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gerber, Jason)
|
August 12, 2010 |
Filing 409
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary) of Shapiro Defendants by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, State Of Nevada, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
August 12, 2010 |
Filing 408
STATUS REPORT re Form of Injunction by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gerber, Jason)
|
August 10, 2010 |
Filing 407
STATEMENT of Status Regarding Hearing on Form of Injunction re #376 Proposed Order Submission,, ; by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - i, #3 Exhibit B - ii, #4 Exhibit C - i, #5 Exhibit C - ii, #6 Exhibit D)(Greben, Jan)
|
August 10, 2010 |
Filing 406
ORDER GRANTING #397 Third Party defendant Bowe Permac Inc.'s Motion to Appear Telephonically at August 13, 2010 Hearing Before the Honorable Judge Robert Jones. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall contact the courtroom administrator, Lesa Ettinger, at (775) 686-5833 not later than 1:00 PM on Wednesday, 8/11/2010, for instructions on how to connect telephonically. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 08/10/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing 405
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 8/9/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. The hearing scheduled for 8/13/2010 10:00 AM in LV will be conducted in Courtroom 6A before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
August 6, 2010 |
Filing 404
ERRATA to #400 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Greben, Jan)
|
August 5, 2010 |
Filing 403
ORDER re #399 Notice of Change of Attorney. Attorney Candice Renka substituted in place of Attorney Thomas F. Vandenburg as attorney of record for Clark County School District. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/5/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
August 5, 2010 |
Filing 402
ORDER re #398 Notice of Change of Attorney. Attorney Candice E. Renka substituted in place of Attorney Thomas F. Vandenburg as attorney of record for Maryland Square LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/5/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
August 5, 2010 |
Filing 401
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC Stipulation and Order Regarding Amending Third Party Complaint. (Gerber, Jason)
|
August 5, 2010 |
Filing 400
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Related Costs by Plaintiffs Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Responses due by 8/22/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alexander Robertson, IV, Esq. in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Related Costs, #2 Exhibits A - B to Affidavit of Robertson, #3 Affidavit of Jan A. Greben, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees and Related Costs, #4 Exhibits A - C of Affidavit of Greben, #5 Bill of Costs, #6 Attachment 2A to Bill of Costs, #7 Attachment 2B -i to Bill of Costs, #8 Attachment 2B-ii to Bill of Costs, #9 Attachment 2C to Bill of Costs, #10 Attachment 2D to Bill of Costs, #11 Attachment 2E to Bill of Costs, #12 Attachment 2F to Bill of Costs, #13 Attachment 2G to Bill of Costs, #14 Attachment 2H to Bill of Costs, #15 Attachment 2I to Bill of Costs)(Greben, Jan)
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing 399
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of ThirdParty Plaintiff Clark County School District, Cross Defendants Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Cross Claimant Clark County School District, ThirdParty Defendant Clark County School District, Counter Claimant Clark County School District, Counter Defendant Clark County School District, Defendant Clark County School District. Substitution of Attorneys (Levy, William)
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing 398
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of ThirdParty Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimant Maryland Square LLC, Counter Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Defendant Maryland Square LLC, ThirdParty Plaintiff Maryland Square LLC, Cross Claimant Maryland Square LLC. Substitution of Attorneys (Levy, William)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing 397
MOTION to Appear Telephonically at August 13, 2010 Hearing before Judge Robert Jones by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weyand, Alexander)
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 396
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Discovery Hearing held on 8/2/2010 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Jennifer Taylor; Def Counsel: Thomas Vandenburg, Michael Hetey, Jason Gerber, Jeffrey Oberman, Mark Ferrario, Stacy Harrop, Keith Kaufman, Karl Nielson, Craig Parton, telephonic: Brian Phinney and Cherie Harpell; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:33-9:48; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears the representations of counsel. As stated on the record, the Court extends the amendment to pleadings deadline until September 3, 2010. The parties are directed to submit a Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by September 3, 2010. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 395
ORDER Granting #394 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Cindie D Hernandez substituted for Attorney John H. Cotton for Bowe Permac, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/28/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
July 27, 2010 |
Filing 394
MOTION to Substitute Attorney John H. Cotton by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. Motion ripe 7/27/2010. (Weyand, Alexander)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 393
MOTION to Amend/Correct #390 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company and by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 8/12/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit "B" Transcript, #3 Exhibit "C" Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit "D" Comparison, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 392
ORDER ON #75 STIPULATION filed in Case No. 3:09-cv-00231 : Each of the Third-Party Defendants named herein ( Boulevard Mall, LLC; and, General Growth Management )must file their response to the Third Party Complaint in the instant action within 20 days of the service of the Amended Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/26/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 391
ORDER that #249 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint is GRANTED. #292 Motion for More Definite Statement is GRANTED. #310 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Equitable indemnity claim against Sears is DISMISSED. #335 Motion to Consolidate Cases with case 3:09-cv-00231 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/22/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 390
ORDER granting #164 Motion for Summary Judgment. Further hearing will be conducted on the precise terms of injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/22/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing 389
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 7/21/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Julia Wright. The Court vacates the settlement conference currently set for August 16, 2010 and will reschedule the settlement conference at an appropriate time after the close of discovery. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing 388
ORDER Granting #385 Motion to Appear Telephonically for the August 2, 2010 Discovery Hearing by Third Party Defendant Hoyt Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing 387
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 384 Motion Hearing held on 7/6/2010, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing 386
NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark B Schellerup. for Jeffrey R. Diver, Esq. (Schellerup, Mark)
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing 385
MOTION to Appear Telephonically at 8/2/10 Discovery Hearing by ThirdParty Defendant Hoyt Corporation. Responses due by 8/5/2010. (Phinney, Brian)
|
July 6, 2010 |
Filing 384
AMENDED MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #249 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint, #292 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Third Party Defendant Boulvevard Mall, LLC and, #310 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint, and #335 Motion to Consolidate, held on 7/6/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Alexander Robertson, Jan Greben and Jennifer Taylor; Def Counsel: Thomas Vandenburg, Jason Gerber, Jeffery Oberman, Mark Ferraro, Chris Neuman. Appearing telephonically is Cheri Harpell; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 11:50 AM - 1:48 PM; Courtroom: 3D; The Court gives preliminary thoughts and inclinations with respect to the motions at issue, then invites arguments of counsel. The Court continues and advises of its concerns with counsels' #376 Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order, and declines to approve it as presented. The Court then distributes copies of same Propsed Preliminary Injunction with the Court's comments and suggestions to counsel for review. Discussion between the Court and counsel ensues. Having heard from the parties and for reasons set forth on the record, the Court makes the following rulings: #164 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; #249 Motion for Leave to File a Third Party Complaint is GRANTED; #292 Motion for More Definite Statement is GRANTED; #310 Sears Roebuck & Company's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; #335 Motion to Consolidate in Case No. 2:08-cv-1618-RCJ-GWF and #46 Motion to consolidate in Case No. 3:09-cv-231-RCJ-VPC are GRANTED;IT IS ORDERED that the hearing to determine the scope of the Preliminary Injunction is scheduled for Friday, 8/13/2010 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom TBD before Judge Robert C. Jones. Written ruling of the Court will issue.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE) Modified on 7/13/2010 to reflect the correct docket number for the motion to consolidate in case number 3:09-cv-231-RCJ-VPC (LE).
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing 383
ANSWER to #222 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,, Counterclaim,,, Shapiro Defendants Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Maryland Square Counter Cross-Claim filed by Melvin Shapiro.(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
July 2, 2010 |
Filing 382
RESPONSE to #374 Reply to Response to Motion,,, ; Declaration of Robert Howe filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 381
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 7/1/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. IT IS ORDERED that oral argument RE: #249 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint, #251 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve, #292 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Third Party Defendant Boulvevard Mall, LLC and, and #310 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint, currently scheduled for Tuesday, 7/6/2010 at 10:00 in Las Vegas, before Judge Robert C. Jones, is hereby VACATED and will be rescheduled at a later date.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument RE: #164 Motion for Summary Judgment and #335 Emergency Motion to Consolidate Cases, shall remain as previously scheduled for Tuesday, 7/6/2010 at 11:00 AM in Las Vegas Courtroom 3D, before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 380
ERRATA to #358 Reply to Response to Motion ; to Consolidate Related Actions filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
July 1, 2010 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #374 REPLY to Response to Motion. ERROR: Wrong event selected by Attorney Jennifer L. Taylor; CORRECTION: Entry corrected by Court to #374 OBJECTION to Document. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing 379
ERRATA to Declaration to Reply to Response to #164 Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9-18)(Taylor, Jennifer) Event type corrected on 7/1/2010. (MJZ)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing 378
ORDER granting Third Party Defendant Bowe Permac Inc's #363 Motion to Appear Telephonically for the 8/2/10 Discovery Hearing. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing 377
REPLY to Response to #332 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Hoyt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief in Hinds Investment on behalf of Kirrberg/Multimatic)(Phinney, Brian)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing 376
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck [PROPOSED] RCRA INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 375
DECLARATION of Jan A. Greben, Esq. and Exhibits A-E re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (OBJECTION TO HOWE DECLARATION) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit A4, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C-E)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 374
OBJECTION to Declaration to Response to #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Taylor, Jennifer) Event type corrected on 7/1/2010. (MZJ)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 373
DECLARATION of Alexander Robertson, IV, Esq. (Exhibit 28 of 31) re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28a, #2 Exhibit 28b, #3 Exhibit 28c, #4 Exhibit 28d)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 372
DECLARATION of Alexander Robertson, IV, Esq. (Exhibtis 29-31 of 31) re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 371
DECLARATION of Alexander Robertson, IV, Esq. (Exhibits 25-27 of 31) re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 370
DECLARATION of Alexander Robertson, IV, Esq. (Exhibits 19-24 of 31) re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21-22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 369
DECLARATION of Alexander Robertson, IV, Esq. (Exhibits 1 - 18 of 31) re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 368
DECLARATION of Alexander Robertson, IV, Esq. In Support of MSJ re #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, ThirdParty Defendant Superior Tire, Inc.. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 367
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (20 pages) Purusant to Local Rule 7-4 by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Motion ripe 6/29/2010. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 366
REPLY to Response to #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 365
ORDER Granting #322 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher J. Neumann and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Mark Ferrario for Sears Roebuck & Co. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/28/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 364
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC to Amend Third Party Complaint. (Gerber, Jason)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 363
MOTION to Appear Telephonically re 341 Notice of Hearing by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. Responses due by 7/16/2010. (Attachments: #1 Order Regarding Third Party Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.'s Motion to Appear Telephonicall for the August 2, 2010 Discovery Hearing)(Harpell, Cherie) Docket text corrected on 7/1/2010. (MJZ)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 362
ORDER Granting #323 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory R. Tan for Sears Roebuck & Co. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mark E Ferrario. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/28/2010. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 361
ORDER Granting #330 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Cherie L. Harpell and approving Designation of Local Counsel John H. Cotton. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/28/2010. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 360
ORDER Granting #331 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexander M Weyand for Bowe Permac, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel John H. Cotton. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/28/2010. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
June 29, 2010 |
Filing 359
ORDER Granting #337 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. Terry Schwartz for Terrible Herbst Inc and approving Designation of Local Counsel Sean T. Higgins. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/28/2010. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing 358
REPLY to Response to #335 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Shapiro Bros Investment Co, a dissolved Nevada corporation, and ; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing 357
JOINDER to #335 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Shapiro Bros Investment Co, a dissolved Nevada corporation, and ; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing 356
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 336 Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, held on 6/1/2010, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website &a href=http://www.nvd.uscourts.gov target=_blank&www.nvd.uscourts.gov&/a& before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2010. (MG)
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing 355
EXHIBIT(s) to #348 Declaration,,,, ; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L)(Gerber, Jason)
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing 354
EXHIBIT(s) re Declaration to Response to #164 Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-1, #2 Exhibit I-2, #3 Exhibit I-3, #4 Exhibit I-4, #5 Exhibit I-5, #6 Exhibit I-6, #7 Exhibit I-7, #8 Exhibit I-8, #9 Exhibit I-9, #10 Exhibit I-10, #11 Exhibit I-11, #12 Exhibit I-12, #13 Exhibit I-13, #14 Exhibit I-14, #15 Exhibit I-15, #16 Exhibit I-16, #17 Exhibit I-17, #18 Exhibit I-18)(Gerber, Jason) Docket entry relationship added on 6/23/2010. (MJZ)
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing 353
EXHIBIT(s) re Declaration to Response to #164 Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H-1, #2 Exhibit H-2, #3 Exhibit H-3, #4 Exhibit H-4, #5 Exhibit H-5, #6 Exhibit H-6, #7 Exhibit H-7, #8 Exhibit H-8, #9 Exhibit H-9, #10 Exhibit H-10, #11 Exhibit H-11)(Gerber, Jason) Docket entry relationship added on 6/23/2010. (MJZ)
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing 352
EXHIBIT(s) re Declaration to Response to #164 Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C10-1, #2 Exhibit C10-2, #3 Exhibit C10-3, #4 Exhibit C10-4, #5 Exhibit C10-5, #6 Exhibit C10-6, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G)(Gerber, Jason) Docket entry relationship added on 6/23/2010. (MJZ)
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing 351
EXHIBIT(s) re Declaration to Response to #164 Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Plaintiff Dragan Kurajica. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C7-1, #2 Exhibit C7-2, #3 Exhibit C8-1, #4 Exhibit C8-2, #5 Exhibit C8-2, #6 Exhibit C9-1, #7 Exhibit C9-2, #8 Exhibit C9-3, #9 Exhibit C9-4, #10 Exhibit C9-5, #11 Exhibit C9-6, #12 Exhibit C9-7, #13 Exhibit C9-8, #14 Exhibit C9-9, #15 Exhibit C9-10, #16 Exhibit C9-11)(Gerber, Jason) Docket entry relationship added on 6/23/2010. (MJZ)
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing 350
WITHDRAWAL of Motion re #251 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve ; by Defendant Melvin Shapiro Stipulation and Order Thereon. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 349
STIPULATION re #252 Memorandum,, #251 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve ; Stipulation for Withdrawal of the Shapiro Defendants Motions to Dismiss Defendant Maryland Square Answer and Counter Cross Claim by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 348
DECLARATION of Robert A. Howe re Response to #164 Motion for Summary Judgment; by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit C-2, #6 Exhibit C-3-1, #7 Exhibit C3-2, #8 Exhibit C4, #9 Exhibit C5, #10 Exhibit C6)(Gerber, Jason) Docket entry relationship added on 6/23/2010. (MJZ)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 347
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #345 Declaration,,,,,, by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Gerber, Jason)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 346
RESPONSE to #335 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Shapiro Bros Investment Co, a dissolved Nevada corporation, and, filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Replies due by 7/2/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 345
DECLARATION of Steven Geyer re #343 Response to Motion; by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Gerber, Jason) #347 Corrected image filed on 6/23/2010. (MJZ)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 344
DECLARATION of Jason M. Gerber, Esq. re #343 Response to Motion,,,,,, ; Supplemental by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 343
RESPONSE to #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Replies due by 7/9/2010. (Gerber, Jason)
|
June 21, 2010 |
Filing 342
RESPONSE to #332 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint, filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Replies due by 7/1/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gerber, Jason)
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing 341
AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for Monday August 2, 2010, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing 340
NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for Friday, June 25, 2010, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing 339
JOINDER to #327 Reply to Response to Motion ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Wiens Properties LLC. (Nielson, Karl)
|
June 15, 2010 |
Filing 338
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 6/15/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument RE: #335 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Shapiro Bros Investment Co, a dissolved Nevada corporation, is scheduled for Tuesday, 7/6/2010 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom TBD before Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Oppositions to Motion to Consolidate Cases are due not later than 5:00 PM 6/22/2010; Replies are due not later than 5:00 PM 6/28/2010. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
June 10, 2010 |
Filing 337
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by J. Terry Schwartz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Sean Higgins (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1639765) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Terrible Herbst Inc.. Motion ripe 6/10/2010. (Parton, Craig)
|
June 7, 2010 |
Filing 335
Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Shapiro Bros Investment Co, a dissolved Nevada corporation, and by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 6/24/2010. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Jeffrey T. Oberman in Support of Motion, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order in Support of Motion for Consolidation, #4 Declaration Application for Order Shortening Time, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Shortening Time, #6 Exhibit to Proofs of Service)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing 334
NOTICE by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC State Report Regarding Service of Third Party Complaint (Gerber, Jason)
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing 333
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Hoyt Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Phinney, Brian)
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing 332
MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint by ThirdParty Defendant Hoyt Corporation. Responses due by 6/19/2010. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1 - Order in Case No. 07-00703 (E.D. Cal.))(Phinney, Brian)
|
June 1, 2010 |
Filing 336
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #307 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #303 Order on Motion to Extend Time regarding Discovery/Non Dispositive matter, held on 6/1/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Alex Robertson and Jan Greben; Def Counsel: Thomas Vandenburg, Jason Berber, Michael Hetey, Jeffery Oberman, Mark Ferrario, Stacy Harrop, Karl Nielson and appearing telephonically is Cherie Harpell; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 10:05 - 10:45 AM; Courtroom: 3C; The Court shares preliminary inclinations, then hears arguments of counsel as to their respective positions regarding the subject motion. Mr. Oberman advises the Court of his intent to file a motion for consolidation of related actions. Having heard from the parties, the Court confirms #303 Magistrate Judges Order; Plaintiffs #307 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #303 Order on Motion to Extend Time regarding Discovery/Non Dispositive matter, is denied. Oral Argument RE: #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment, is scheduled for Tuesday, 7/6/2010 11:00 AM in Las Vegas Courtroom to be determined before Judge Robert C. Jones, Brief due by 6/22/2010, Reply due by 6/29/2010. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
June 1, 2010 |
Filing 331
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alexander M. Weyand and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John H. Cotton (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1628264) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. Motion ripe 6/1/2010. (Cotton, John)
|
June 1, 2010 |
Filing 330
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Cherie L. Harpell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John H. Cotton (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1628230) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Bowe Permac, Inc.. Motion ripe 6/1/2010. (Cotton, John)
|
May 28, 2010 |
Filing 329
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 5/28/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #307 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order is set for 6/1/2010 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing 328
ORDER IN THE CHAMBERS of the Honorable Robert C. Jones, United States District Judge on May 27, 2010, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #326 Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing on the Shapiro Defendants Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as follows: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #307 Plaintiffs Objections to Order Docket No. 303 is set for TUESDAY, JUNE 1, 2010, 10:00 A.M. in LAS VEGAS Courtroom 7D, before Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #164 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, #249 Motion of Defendant Melvin Shapiro for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint, #251 Defendants Melvin Shapiro and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co. Motion to (1) Strike Defendants Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, the Herman Kishner Trust DBA Maryland Square Shopping Center, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank of America, as Trustees for the Herman Kishner Trust, Maryland Square, LLC and the Clark County School Districts (Collectively, the Maryland Square Defendants) Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co.s Cross-Claim, and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square Defendants Counter-Crossclaims Against Defendant Melvin Shapiro and Shapiro Brothers Investment Co., #292 General Growth Management, Inc.s and Boulevard Mall, LLCs Motion for More Definite Statement, #310 Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Companys Motion to Dismiss are RESCHEDULED to TUESDAY, JULY 6, 2010, 10:00 A.M. in LAS VEGAS Courtroom to be determined, before Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing 327
REPLY to Response to #310 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Company's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Cowden, Tami)
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing 326
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing on Shapiro Brothers' Motion to Dismiss. (Gerber, Jason)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 325
ORDER Granting #315 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian H. Phinney and approving Attorney Eron Cannon as Designation of Local Counsel for Hoyt Corporation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/18/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 324
ORDER Granting #314 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Richard S. Barton and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eron Cannon for Hoyt Corporation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/18/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
May 19, 2010 |
Filing 323
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gregory R. Tan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark Ferrario (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1615707) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Motion ripe 5/19/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Verified Petition)(Ferrario, Mark)
|
May 19, 2010 |
Filing 322
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher J. Neumann and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark Ferrario (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1615684) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Motion ripe 5/19/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Verified Petition)(Ferrario, Mark)
|
May 18, 2010 |
Filing 321
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Superior Tire, Inc. re #320 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Against Superior Tire, Inc.. (ECS)
|
May 17, 2010 |
Filing 320
MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Against Superior Tire, Inc. by Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 5/17/2010. (Gerber, Jason)
|
May 17, 2010 |
Filing 319
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Superior Tire, Inc. served on 2/15/2010, answer due 3/8/2010. (Gerber, Jason)
|
May 17, 2010 |
Filing 318
RESPONSE to #310 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint, filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Replies due by 5/27/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gerber, Jason)
|
May 17, 2010 |
Filing 317
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Discovery Conference held on 5/17/2010 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Jennifer Taylor, Appearing Telephonically: Alex Robertson, Jan Greban; Def Counsel: Jeffrey Oberman, Jason Gerber, Karl Nielson, Stacy Harrop, Keith Kaufman, Jared Green, Craig Parton, Thomas Vandenburg, Michael Hetey, Mark Ferrario, Appearing Telephonically: Brian Phinney, Richard Baron, Alex Weyand; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:08:33-10:30:19; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court and counsel confer regarding case and discovery status and the representations of counsel are heard. Defendants shall file a Status Report regarding the status of service upon thirdparty defendants Superior Tire Store and Dr. Clean on or before Monday, June 7, 2010. This Court will have its law clerk contact the Honorable Robert C. Jones' law clerk to request Judge Jones entertain and decide the Objection #307 to this Court's Order #303 . This Court will set further discovery confernce, if necessary in mid to late June, after Judge Jones' ruling on the Objection #307 . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing 316
JOINDER to #310 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint ; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Wiens Properties LLC. (Nielson, Karl)
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing 315
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brian H. Phinney and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eron Z. Cannon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1606204) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Hoyt Corporation. Motion ripe 5/12/2010. (Cannon, Eron)
|
May 12, 2010 |
Filing 314
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard S. Baron and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eron Z. Cannon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1606177) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Hoyt Corporation. Motion ripe 5/12/2010. (Cannon, Eron)
|
May 6, 2010 |
Filing 313
REPLY to Response to #307 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing 312
ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Bowe Permac, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/15/2010. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/19/2010.(Harpell, Cherie)
|
May 5, 2010 |
Filing 311
RESPONSE to #307 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Replies due by 5/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gerber, Jason)
|
April 30, 2010 |
Filing 310
MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Responses due by 5/17/2010. (Cowden, Tami)
|
April 26, 2010 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #307 OBJECTION to Document : ERROR: Wrong event selected by Attorney Jennifer L. Taylor; CORRECTION: Entry corrected by Court to #307 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order. (no image attached)(MJZ)
|
April 22, 2010 |
Filing 309
ORDER Granting #302 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice only as to CB Richard Ellis, each party to bear own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
April 21, 2010 |
Filing 308
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 4/21/2010. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. The Motion for Extension of time to respond to third party complaint (#281) was granted on March 25, 2010 (Order #288) by Judge Jones. The hearing set for April 22, 2010 is therefore vacated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
April 21, 2010 |
Filing 307
MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider #303 Order; filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Taylor, Jennifer) Event type corrected on 4/26/2010. (MJZ)
|
April 21, 2010 |
Filing 306
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 293 Motion to Extend Time regarding Discovery/Non Dispositive matter Hearing held on 3/30/2010, before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2010. (ABB)
|
April 16, 2010 |
Filing 305
RESPONSE to #292 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Third Party Defendant Boulvevard Mall, LLC and, filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Replies due by 4/26/2010. (Gerber, Jason)
|
April 16, 2010 |
Filing 304
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 4/16/2010. By Deputy Clerk: K. Johnson. Based upon the extension of discovery which was requested and approved, IT IS ORDERED the oral argument RE: #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment is hereby RESCHEDULED from 6/1/2010, to 11/29/2010, at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KXJ)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing 303
ORDER Granting #248 Motion to Extend Time. Denying Motion #270 to Bifurcate. Discovery due by 11/1/2010. Motions due by 11/3/2010. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/3/2010. Calendar Call reset for 3/9/2011 08:30 AM before Judge Robert C. Jones. Trial reset for 3/15/2011 08:30 AM before Judge Robert C. Jones. Discovery Hearing set for 5/17/2010 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing 302
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of CB Richard Ellis Only by Defendant CB Richard Ellis. (Howard, Randolph)
|
April 12, 2010 |
Filing 301
ANSWER to #280 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Bank Of America(Trustee), Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC.(Gerber, Jason)
|
April 12, 2010 |
Filing 300
ORDER Granting #274 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Bryan M. Garrie withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/12/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing 299
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bank Of America(Trustee), Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC re #230 Summons Issued,. Hoyt Corporation waiver sent on 4/5/2010, answer due 6/4/2010. (Gerber, Jason)
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing 298
NOTICE of Hearing on #292 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Third Party Defendant Boulvevard Mall, LLC and : Oral argument is hereby scheduled for 6/1/2010, at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(KXG)
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing 297
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Terrible Herbst Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Parton, Craig)
|
April 5, 2010 |
Filing 296
ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Terrible Herbst shall have a period of 10 calendar days from the filing date of this order within which to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/5/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing 295
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #285 Stipulation to Dismiss without Prejudice Crossclaim re: CB Richard Ellis, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/31/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing 294
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 8/16/2010 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Settlement conference statements to be delivered directly to chambers by 8/9/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/31/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
March 30, 2010 |
Filing 293
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing on Defendant Maryland Square's Motion to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines #248 held on 3/30/2010 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Jan Greben, Alexander Robertson, Jennifer Taylor; Def Counsel: Jeffrey Oberman, Thomas Vandenberg, Jason Gerber, Michael Hetey, Karl Nielson, Mark Ferrario; Court Reporter/FTR #: 1:33:01-2:06:29; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears the representations of counsel. The Court takes Defendant Maryland Square's #248 Emergency MOTION to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines under submission and will issue a written decision. The Court advises the parties that if the Court grants bifurcation the Court will establish a separate scheduling order in regard to the third party complaint and third party claims. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
|
March 30, 2010 |
Filing 292
MOTION for More Definite Statement by Third Party Defendant Boulvevard Mall, LLC and by ThirdParty Defendant General Growth Management, Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2010. (Schellerup, Mark)
|
March 29, 2010 |
Filing 291
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Sears Roebuck & Co.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case Third Party Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.'s Disclosure and Certificate as to Interested Parties Pursuant to Fed. R. Civil Procedure 7.1 and Civil Local Rule 7.1-1. (Cowden, Tami)
|
March 29, 2010 |
Filing 290
REPLY to Response to #251 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve ; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. and Shapiro Bros Investment Corp (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing 289
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Wiens Properties LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Nielson, Karl)
|
March 25, 2010 |
Filing 288
ORDER Granting #281 Motion for time to respond to Third Party Complaint. Answer/Response due 4/30/10. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 25, 2010 |
Filing 287
ORDER granting #279 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Sean Higgins as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 24, 2010 |
Filing 286
Amended NOTICE of Hearing on #249 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint; #251 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve; and continued hearing from 1/22/2010 re #164 Motion for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2010, 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(MAJ) Modified to add link to #164 and time of hrng on 3/24/2010 (MAJ).
|
March 23, 2010 |
Filing 285
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation to Dismiss without Prejudice CB Richard Ellis, Inc., and Order thereon by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 4/9/2010. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 23, 2010 |
Filing 284
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #278 Stipulation for time to responde to pleadings. Third-Party Defendats Boulevard Mall,General Growth Properties response due by 3/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 23, 2010 |
Filing 283
NOTICE of Hearing on #281 Sears' MOTION Extension of Time to Respond to Third Party Complaint : Motion Hearing set for Thursday, April 22, 2010, at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
|
March 23, 2010 |
Filing 282
REPLY to Response to #248 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request) ; filed by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Defendants Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Bifurcation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H)(Gerber, Jason)
|
March 22, 2010 |
Filing 281
MOTION Extension of Time to Respond to Third Party Complaint by ThirdParty Defendant Sears Roebuck & Co.. Responses due by 4/8/2010. (Cowden, Tami)
|
March 22, 2010 |
Filing 280
ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/1/2010., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/6/2010.), COUNTERCLAIM against Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Melvin Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company filed by Terrible Herbst Inc..(Higgins, Sean)
|
March 22, 2010 |
Filing 279
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Craig A. Parton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Sean T. Higgins, Esq. (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1555339) by ThirdParty Defendant Terrible Herbst Inc.. Motion ripe 3/22/2010. (Higgins, Sean)
|
March 22, 2010 |
Filing 278
STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER by Third Party Defendant Boulevard Mall LLC and by ThirdParty Defendant General Growth Management, Inc.. (Schellerup, Mark)
|
March 18, 2010 |
Filing 277
RESPONSE to #251 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve, filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Replies due by 3/28/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J)(Gerber, Jason)
|
March 18, 2010 |
Filing 276
ORDER granting #275 Motion to to Deem its' Opposition #270 with all Exhibits #271 timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/18/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
March 17, 2010 |
Filing 275
MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Oppostion with Exhibits 1-4 (270) to Deem all Exhibits filed with (271) to Be Timely Filed with Plaintiffs' Opposition (270) by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Responses due by 4/3/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
March 16, 2010 |
Filing 274
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bryan M. Garrie. by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 3/16/2010. (Gerber, Jason)
|
March 16, 2010 |
Filing 273
ANSWER to Complaint Third-Party Defendant Wiens Properties, LLC's Answer to Third-Party Complaint filed by Wiens Properties LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/26/2010. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/30/2010.(Nielson, Karl)
|
March 16, 2010 |
Filing 272
NON-OPPOSITION to #248 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request) ; filed by Defendant CB Richard Ellis. (Howard, Randolph)
|
March 16, 2010 |
Filing 271
EXHIBIT(s) to #270 Response to Motion,,,,,, ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
March 15, 2010 |
Filing 270
RESPONSE to #248 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request), filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Replies due by 3/25/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
March 15, 2010 |
Filing 269
NON-OPPOSITION to #248 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request)Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request) ; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. and Shapiro Bros. Investment Co. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 12, 2010 |
Filing 268
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #267 To Extend Hearing set on #248 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter. Motion Hearing reset for 3/30/2010 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing 267
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO EXTEND TRIAL AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
March 9, 2010 |
Filing 266
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #264 Stipulation for Extension of time for Third-Party Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings. Third-Party Defendants must filed their responsive pleadings on or before 3/213/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing 265
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing 264
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Oder by Third-Party Defendant Boulevard Mall, LLC and by ThirdParty Defendant General Growth Management, Inc.. (Schellerup, Mark)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing 263
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Mark B Schellerup on behalf of ThirdParty Defendant General Growth Management, Inc.. and Boulevard Mall, LLC (Schellerup, Mark)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing 262
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Good Year Tire & Rubber Co.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Walch, Gregory)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing 261
ANSWER to Complaint Third Party Complaint filed by Good Year Tire & Rubber Co.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/18/2010. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/22/2010.(Walch, Gregory)
|
March 8, 2010 |
Filing 260
ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Third Party Complaint filed by Good Year Tire & Rubber Co.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/18/2010. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/22/2010.(Walch, Gregory)
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing 259
NOTICE of Hearing on #251 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve: Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2010, 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(MAJ)
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing 258
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #254 Stipulation for time. Wiens Properties LLC answer/response due 3/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 2, 2010 |
Filing 257
NOTICE of Hearing on #248 Defendant Maryland Square's Emergency MOTION to to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request): Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, March 30, 2010, at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
|
March 2, 2010 |
Filing 256
ORDER Denying #216 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/2/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 2, 2010 |
Filing 255
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 3/2/2010. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. RE: #216 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents The hearing set for March 2, 2010 regarding this motion is vacated. The court will decide the motion on the pleadings. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
March 2, 2010 |
Filing 254
STIPULATION and Order for Third Party Defendant Wiens Properties, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Third Party Plaintiffs' Complaint by ThirdParty Defendant Wiens Properties LLC. (Nielson, Karl)
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing 253
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 3/1/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Julia Wright. RE: #248 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request). The court finds that the motion does not constitute an emergency. Accordingly,IT IS ORDERED that the motion will be briefed in the ordinary course.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing 252
MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro re #251 MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Inve. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeffrey T. Oberman)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing 251
MOTION to Dismiss (1) Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, et. al., Answer to Defendant Melvin Shapiro, et. al., Cross-Claim and (2) Dismiss Maryland Square, LLC, et. al., Counter-Cross Claim against Defendant Melvin Shapior and Shapiro Bros. Investment Co. by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 3/18/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 250
MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro re #249 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeffrey T. Oberman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Proposed Third Party Complaint)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 249
MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 2/26/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 26, 2010 |
Filing 248
Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter to Extend Trial and Discovery Deadlines (Second Request) by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 2/26/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Gerber, Jason)
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing 247
ORDER granting #242 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing 246
ORDER granting #241 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing 245
ORDER Granting #240 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Michael Hetey as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/25/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
February 23, 2010 |
Filing 244
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Michael C. Hetey on behalf of Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Hetey, Michael)
|
February 22, 2010 |
Filing 243
REPLY to Response to #216 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents ; filed by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Documents (Greben, Jan)
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing 242
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas F. Vandenburg and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Hetey (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1526189) filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 2/19/2010. (Hetey, Michael)
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing 241
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard A. Dongell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Hetey (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1526164) filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 2/19/2010. (Hetey, Michael)
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing 240
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Gallagher and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Hetey (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1526131) filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 2/19/2010. (Hetey, Michael)
|
February 17, 2010 |
Filing 239
ORDER Denying as moot #219 Motion for leave. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
February 16, 2010 |
Filing 238
ORDER Granting #231 Motion to Extend Time. Parties have until 2/26/10 to request leave to add parties or amend pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing 237
RESPONSE to #216 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Replies due by 2/22/2010. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing 236
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #234 Stipulation, to extend hearing on #216 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2010 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing 235
RESPONSE to #231 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter Motion for Enlargement of Time to Amend Pleadings and Join additional Parties, filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Opposition of Plaintiffs to Shapiro's Motion to Enlarge Time to Add Claims and Parties Replies due by 2/21/2010. (Greben, Jan)
|
February 10, 2010 |
Filing 234
STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
February 8, 2010 |
Filing 233
NOTICE of Hearing on #216 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for Thursday, February 25, 2010, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
|
February 8, 2010 |
Filing 232
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 2/8/2010. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. RE: #231 Defendants Shapiro's MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Amend Pleadings and Join additional Parties The parties have until 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, February 11, 2009 to file an objection to this motion. If no objection is filed, the court will grant Defendants' motion. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
February 5, 2010 |
Filing 231
MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter Motion for Enlargement of Time to Amend Pleadings and Join additional Parties by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 2/5/2010. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Jeffrey T. Oberman in Support of Motion, #3 Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
February 4, 2010 |
Filing 230
3rd Party Summons Issued as to Boulevard Mall, Bowe Permac, Inc., Dr. Clean Management, Inc., General Growth Management, Inc., Good Year Tire & Rubber Co., Goss-Jewett & Co., Hoyt Corporation, Sears Roebuck & Co., Superior Tire, Inc., Terrible Herbst Inc., Wiens Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(AXM)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 229
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Gerber, Jason)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 228
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Good Year Tire & Rubber Co., filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 227
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Sears Roebuck & Co., filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 226
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Boulevard Mall LLC, filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 225
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued General Growth Management, Inc., filed by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Third Party Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Counter Claimants Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 224
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bank Of America, Boulevard Associates, Boulevard Mall, Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, CB Richard Ellis, Clark County School District, Construction Developers, Inc., Delia's Cleaners of Arizona, Inc., Jerry Engel, Federated Western Department Stores, General Growth Management, Inc., General Growth Properties, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Pacific Employers Insurance Company, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Melvin Shapiro, filed by Bank Of America(Trustee), Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Adds new parties. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/13/2010.(Gerber, Jason)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 222
MARYLAND SQUARE SHOPPING CENTER, LLC, THE HERMAN KISHNER TRUST DBA MARYLAND SQUARE SHOPPING CENTER, IRWIN KISHNER, JERRY ENGEL, BANK OF AMERICA, AS TRUSTEES FOR THE HERMAN KISHNER TRUST, MARYLAND SQUARE, LLC AND THE CLARK COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICTS ANSWER TO DEFENDANT MELVIN SHAPIRO AND SHAPIRO BROTHERS INVESTMENT CO.S CROSS-CLAIM AND COUNTER-CROSSCLAIMS ANSWER to #188 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,, CROSSCLAIM against Melvin Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Melvin Shapiro, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company filed by Bank Of America(Trustee), Clark County School District, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC.(Gerber, Jason)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 221
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 220 Motion Hearing, held on 01/22/10, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/24/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2010. (LG)
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing 223
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order #190 and Defendant's Motion to Compel #205 held on 2/2/2010 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Jennifer Taylor, Telephonic: Jan Greben; Def Counsel: Jeffery Oberman, Jason Gerber; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:32:27-10:36:19; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court hears the representations of counsel. Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order #190 is granted without prejudice as follows: the Court grants the Motion in regard to the taking of Individual Plaintiff's depositions. The Court notes that Defendants can probably obtain the requisite information through contention interrogatories addressed to Plaintiffs, as well as taking the depositions of other relevant witnesses and expert witnesses after their reports have been produced. If, at the conclusion of that written discovery and/or based upon the depositions or the expert witnesses' written reports, Defendants still believe there is a need or basis to take the depositions of Individual Plaintiffs then Defendants should file an Application with the Court. Defendant's #205 Motion to Compel is granted as to Interrogatories 6 and 8 and Request for Production 8. It is ordered that Plaintiffs shall fully respond to Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Production. As to Request for Production 22, the Motion #205 is granted to the extent that Plaintiffs have such documents that are not privileged and that have not previously been produced in response to other discovery requests. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
|
January 29, 2010 |
Filing 219
MOTION DEFENDANTS MELVIN SHAPIROS AND SHAPIRO BROTHERS INVESTMENT CO.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY, INSTANTER, IN RESPONSE TO DOCUMENT NUMBER 217 TO ADDRESS THE TIMELINESS OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER re #217 Reply to Response to Motion,, by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 2/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 28, 2010 |
Filing 218
REPLY to Response to #205 MOTION to Compel, #207 MOTION to Compel ; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeffrey T. Oberman)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 28, 2010 |
Filing 217
REPLY to Response to #190 MOTION for Protective Order ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 28, 2010 |
Filing 216
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler. Responses due by 2/14/2010. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents, #2 Declaration of Jan Greben in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents, #3 Exhibits A - M to Declaration of Jan Greben, #4 Proposed Order on Plaintiff Peter J. Voggenthaler's Motion to Compel Production of Documents)(Greben, Jan)
|
January 27, 2010 |
Filing 215
REPLY to Response to #190 MOTION for Protective Order ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing 214
RESPONSE to #205 MOTION to Compel, filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Replies due by 2/4/2010. (Greben, Jan)
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing 220
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #164 MOTION for Summary Judgme held on 1/22/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Jan Greben and appearing telephonically is Alex Robertson; Def Counsel: Jason Gerber, Brian Garrie, Jeffrey Oberman and appearing telephonically is Randolph Howard; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 10:41; Courtroom: 6; Upon inquiry by the Court, counsel argue the facts and merits of the subject motion. The Court Grants Rule 56(f) request and continues this matter to Tuesday, 6/1/2010 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing 213
NOTICE of Hearing on #205 MOTION to Compel, #190 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, February 2, 2010, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
|
January 21, 2010 |
Filing 212
RESPONSE to #190 Motion for Protective Order; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Replies due by 1/31/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey) Docket entry relatiosnhip added on 1/22/10. (MJZ)
|
January 21, 2010 |
Filing 211
NOTICE of Hearing on #205 Defendants Shapiro's MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for Monday, February 8, 2010, at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBW)
|
January 20, 2010 |
Filing 210
RESPONSE to filed by Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Opposition to Motion for Protective Order Replies due by 1/30/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gerber, Jason)
|
January 13, 2010 |
Filing 209
ORDER Granting #208 Motion to Withdraw Motion #206 . Order withdrawing #206 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/12/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
January 10, 2010 |
Filing 208
MOTION to Withdraw #206 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 1/10/2010. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 10, 2010 |
Filing 207
MEMORANDUM re #205 Motion to Compel; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 1/27/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeffrey T. Oberman, #2 Exhibit A (A-1,A-2, and A-3), #3 Exhibit B (B-1 and, B-2), #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E (E-1 and E-2), #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L (L-1 and L-2))(Oberman, Jeffrey) Event type corrected on 1/21/10. (MJZ)
|
January 10, 2010 |
Filing 206
WITHDRAWN PER #209 ORDER - MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 1/10/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A (A1,A2,A3), #3 Exhibit B (B1 and B2), #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E (E1 and E2), #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L (L1 and L2))(Oberman, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/13/2010 (AXM).
|
January 10, 2010 |
Filing 205
MOTION to Compel by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 1/27/2010. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing 204
ORDER granting #187 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Marquis and Aurbach as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/6/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 203
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Robert C. Jones, U.S. District Judge on January 5, 2010, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion Hearing RE: #164 Motion for Summary Judgment set for 1/4/2010, 09:00 A.M. in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones has been RESCHEDULED to FRIDAY, 01/22/10 @ 10:00 A.M. in RENO Courtroom 6 before Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Robert C. Jones, U.S. District Judge. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 202
EXHIBIT(s) EXH 4 to 191 Notice of Hearing on Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 201
EXHIBIT(s) EXH 3 to 191 Notice of Hearing on Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 200
EXHIBIT(s) EXH 2 to 191 Notice of Hearing on Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 199
EXHIBIT(s) EXH 1 Part 6 to 191 Notice of Hearing on Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 198
EXHIBIT(s) EXH 1 Part 5 to 191 Notice of Hearing on Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 197
Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Confidentiality of Documents. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/5/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 196
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 195
EXHIBIT(s) EXH 1 Part 4 to 191 Notice of Hearing on Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 194
EXHIBIT(s) EXH 1 Part 3 to 191 Notice of Hearing on Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 193
EXHIBIT(s) EXH 1 Part 2 to 191 Notice of Hearing on Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 192
EXHIBIT(s) EXH 1 - Part 1 to 191 Notice of Hearing on Motion ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing 191
NOTICE of Hearing on #190 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, February 2, 2010, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBH)
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing 190
MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. Motion ripe 1/4/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 29, 2009 |
Filing 189
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro and Plaintiffs, Agreed Protective Order. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
December 28, 2009 |
Filing 188
First Amended ANSWER to #80 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, (Docket 160, 186), First Amended ANSWER to #80 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, (Docket 160,186), CROSSCLAIM against Maryland Square LLC filed by Melvin Shapiro.(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing 187
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bryan M. Garrie and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jason M. Gerber (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1474759) by Cross Defendants Bank Of America, Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Defendants Bank Of America, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 12/22/2009. (Gerber, Jason)
|
December 17, 2009 |
Filing 186
ORDER Granting #160 Motion to Amend #79 & #80 Answers to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/17/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
|
December 14, 2009 |
Filing 185
REPLY to Response to #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Evidence, #2 Declaration of Christian Blasbichler in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Christian Blasbichler, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Christian Blasbichler, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Christian Blasbichler, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Christian Blasbichler, #7 Exhibit 5 to Delcaration of Christian Blasbichler)(Greben, Jan)
|
December 8, 2009 |
Filing 184
AMENDED MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Hearing re: DiscvoeryConference held on 12/8/2009 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Jennifer Taylor, appearing telephonically: Jane Greben; Def Counsel: Jeffrey Oberma, Jason Gerber; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:29:26-9:48:14`; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears the representations of counsel regarding the status of discovery. Plaintiffs shall file a Motion for Protective Order regarding the Taking of Plaintiffs' Depositions by January 4, 2010. Defendants represent they will be filing a Motion to Compel. The Court advises the parties that his judicial assistant will set a tentative hearing date on the Motions based upon a January 4, 2010 filing date. The Court encourages the parties to further meet and confer. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES) Modified on 12/29/2009 - to reflect tentative hearing date shall be based on January 4, 2010 date. (DES).
|
December 8, 2009 |
Filing 183
MEMORANDUM Concerning Discovery Meet and Confer Required by Docket #173 filed by Defendants Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Defendants Jerry Engel, Jerry Engel, Herman Kishner, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing 182
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/7/2009. RE: #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The hearing set for 12/14/2009 has been VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 1/4/2010, 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing 181
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/7/2009. RE: #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Due to scheduling needs of the Court, the Motion hearing set for 12/21/2009 has been ADVANCED to 12/14/2009, 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
|
December 7, 2009 |
Filing 180
MEMORANDUM CONCERNING DISCOVERY MEET AND CONFER REQUIRED BY DOCKET NO. 173 filed by Plaintiffs Eliza Acosta, Victor Becerra, Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Jason Cowles, Mirha Elias, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Roger Ellsworth, Richard Falen, Honore Gauthier, Jane Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Peter Learned, Kenneth Lowther, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Malm, Ruth Mannheimer, Kristian Meier, Barbara Montero, William Montero, Clifford Rogers, Sharon Rogers, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Daniel Soldini, Michael J. Solmi, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Charles Walker, Verna Walker, Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 6, 2009 |
Filing 179
Interim STATUS REPORT Concerning Discovery Meet and Confer Required by Docket No. 173 by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing 178
JOINDER to Response to #164 Motion for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant CB Richard Ellis (Howard, Randolph) Docket entry relationship added on 12/1/09. (MJZ)
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing 177
JOINDER to Response to #164 Motion for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant CB Richard Ellis (Howard, Randolph) Docket entry relationship added on 12/1/09. (MJZ)
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing 176
STATEMENT re #164 Motion for Summary Judgment; by Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America. (Gerber, Jason) Docket entry relationship added on 12/1/09. (MJZ)
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing 175
RESPONSE to #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America. Replies due by 12/7/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Gerber, Jason)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 174
ORDER Granting #165 & #166 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. John F. Cermak, Jr. and Sonja A. Inglin withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/13/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 6, 2009 |
Filing 173
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2009 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Melissa Jaime; Pla Counsel: Jennifer Taylor; Def Counsel: Jeffrey Oberman; Jason Gerber; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:52-10:14; Time of Hearing: 9:30 am; Courtroom: 3A; The Court shares its inclination to grant the motion #159 to modify discovery, then hears arguments of counsel. The Court advises that a written order will follow forthwith. Status hearing set for December 8, 2009. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
|
November 6, 2009 |
Filing 172
ORDER Granting #159 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter ( Discovery due by 5/5/2010., Motions due by 6/4/2010., Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/5/2010.), ( Calendar Call set for 9/15/2010 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones., Jury Trial set for 9/21/2010 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones., Status Conference set for 12/8/2009 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/6/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing 171
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #170 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. ( Opposition due by 11/23/2009., Reply due by 12/14/2009.) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/3/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
|
October 30, 2009 |
Filing 170
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Deadlines by Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District. (Gerber, Jason)
|
October 29, 2009 |
Filing 169
REPLY to Response to #159 First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter ; filed by Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Gerber, Jason)
|
October 29, 2009 |
Filing 168
REPLY to Response to #159 First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter ; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. and Shapiro Bros. Investment Co, a dissolved Nevada corporation, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A")(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing 167
NOTICE of Hearing on #164 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Oral argument is scheduled for Monday, 12/21/2009, at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(KXG)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing 166
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw as Co-Counsel by Sonja A. Inglin. by Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District. Motion ripe 10/22/2009. (Inglin, Sonja) .
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing 165
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw as Co-Counsel by John F. Cermak Jr.. by Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District. Motion ripe 10/22/2009. (Inglin, Sonja)
|
October 20, 2009 |
Filing 164
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. Responses due by 11/7/2009. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibits A - B for Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibits B - F for Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Declaration of Jan Greben in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibits A - G for Declaration of Jan Greben, #8 Declaration of Peter Krasnoff in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #9 Exhibits A - B for Declaration of Peter Krasnoff, #10 Proposed Order)(Greben, Jan)
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing 163
RESPONSE to #159 First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. Opposition of Plaintiffs to Motion to Modify Current Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and to Continue the Trial Date Replies due by 10/29/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greben, Jan)
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing 162
JOINDER to #159 First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter ; filed by Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gerber, Jason)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 161
NOTICE of Hearing on #159 Defendants Shapiro's First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter : Motion Hearing set for Friday, November 6, 2009, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.(JBH)
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing 160
MOTION to Amend/Correct by Defendant Shapiro Bros. Investment Co., a dissolved Nevada corp, and by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Responses due by 10/16/2009. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing 159
First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 9/28/2009. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order Orswe)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 158
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Maryland Square LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America. (Clayton, Shane)
|
August 17, 2009 |
Filing 157
ORDER Granting #148 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Defendants Shapiro Bros. Investment Co.,and Melvin Shapiro's Cross Claim is hereby Dismissed in its entirety, without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/13/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
|
August 14, 2009 |
Filing 156
ORDER Granting #152 Motion for Extension of Time to Add Parties and/or Amend the Pleadings. The parties shall have until September 28, 2009 to add parties and/or amend the pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 08/14/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing 155
Interim STATUS REPORT by Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District. (Gerber, Jason)
|
July 31, 2009 |
Filing 154
REPLY to Response to #152 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter ; filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. & Defendant Shapiro Bros Invest (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
July 17, 2009 |
Filing 153
RESPONSE to #152 MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to Add Parties and/or Amend the Pleadings Replies due by 7/31/2009. (Greben, Jan)
|
June 30, 2009 |
Filing 152
MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 6/30/2009. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
June 12, 2009 |
Filing 151
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 6/12/2009. By Deputy Clerk: K. Goetsch. IT IS ORDERED this case is scheduled for Jury Trial on the stacked calendar of 7/13/2010, at 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones; Calendar Call will be held on 7/7/2010, at 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED this case shall be referred to the U. S. Magistrate Judge for scheduling of a settlement conference. The deadline to set a Settlement Conference is 3/31/2010.To the extent the parties seek to extend discovery and/or related deadlines which would effect the trial date, any such request shall include a request to continue the hearings set by this minute order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KXG)
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing 150
ORDER Granting #145 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Cermak, Jr. as to Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Albert G. Marquis. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/1/2009. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing 149
ORDER Granting #144 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sonja A. Inglin as to Maryland Square, LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center, LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America, Clark County School District, and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Albert G. Marquis. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/1/2009. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS) Modified on 5/4/2009 (DXS).
|
May 1, 2009 |
Filing 148
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. of Boulevard Co Defendants, et. al. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
April 20, 2009 |
Filing 147
ORDER Granting #126 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Third Party Claim of Defendants Shapiro Brothers Investment Corp. and Melvin Shapiro, against Third Party Defendant Pacific Employees Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 04/20/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
|
April 20, 2009 |
Filing 146
ORDER Granting #133 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/20/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
April 20, 2009 |
Filing 145
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John F. Cermak and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Albert G. Marquis (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001205625) by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 4/20/2009. (Gerber, Jason)
|
April 20, 2009 |
Filing 144
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sonja A. Inglin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Albert G. Marquis (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001205566) by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. Motion ripe 4/20/2009. (Gerber, Jason)
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing 143
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Hearing re: Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (127) held on 4/17/2009 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Smith; Pla Counsel: Jennifer Taylor; Def Counsel: Jeffrey Oberman, Randolph Howard, Jason Gerber, Debra Spinelli; Court Reporter/FTR #: 2:32:19-2:57:28; Time of Hearing: 2:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 3A;The Court and counsel confer regarding case status and the proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. The Court approves the Discovery Plan (127) as drafted. The Court grants Mr. Howard's request for an extension of time re: the disclosures of CB Richard Ellis as stated on the record. In their July 2009 Status Report, Counsel are directed to apprise the Court of any problems or issues that are causing discovery delays and if additional time may be needed to complete discovery. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing 142
ORDER Granting #127 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/1/2010. Motions due by 4/1/2010. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/3/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 4/17/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing 141
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #137 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Cross-Claim. Clark County School District answer due 5/14/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 04/17/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing 140
ORDER ON STIPULATION re #136 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Cross-Claim. Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC answer due 5/14/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 04/17/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing 139
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #135 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Cross-Claim. Maryland Square LLC answer due 5/14/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 04/17/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK) Modified text to reflect correct party on 4/17/2009 (SRK).
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing 138
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #134 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Cross-Claim. Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall, Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc., Federated Western Department Stores, and General Growth Properties answer due 5/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 04/17/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
|
April 14, 2009 |
Filing 137
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Cross-Claim by Defendant Clark County School District. (Gerber, Jason)
|
April 14, 2009 |
Filing 136
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Cross-Claim by Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
April 14, 2009 |
Filing 135
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Cross-Claim by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
April 13, 2009 |
Filing 134
STIPULATION re #80 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, by Defendants Boulevard Associates, Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc., General Growth Properties. (Spinelli, Debra)
|
April 10, 2009 |
Parties Terminated re: #133 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Party Boulevard Mall I LLC., Boulevard Mall II LLC., Construction Developers, Inc., Federated Western Department Stores, General Growth Management, Inc., General Growth Properties, Macy's Department Stores, Inc., and Boulevard Associates and Boulevard Mall terminated. (EDS)
|
April 10, 2009 |
Filing 133
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants (Greben, Jan)
|
April 9, 2009 |
Filing 132
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr, on 4/9/2009. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Hill. RE: #127 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order -- Status Conference set for Friday, April 17, 2009, at 2:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George W Foley Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBH)
|
April 9, 2009 |
Filing 131
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #129 Stipulation, for time to respond to cross-claims. Response to cross-claim due 4/10/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
April 9, 2009 |
Filing 130
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #128 Stipulation, to extend time to respond. Response due 4/10/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
April 3, 2009 |
Filing 129
STIPULATION re #80 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, ; STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO CROSS-CLAIM (Fourth Request) by Defendants Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc., General Growth Properties. (Spinelli, Debra)
|
April 3, 2009 |
Filing 128
STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, ; STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (Fifth Request) by Defendants Boulevard Associates, Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc., General Growth Properties. (Spinelli, Debra)
|
April 3, 2009 |
Filing 127
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
April 1, 2009 |
Party Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company and Melvin Shapiro terminated re: #126 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (EDS)
|
April 1, 2009 |
Filing 126
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ThirdParty Plaintiff Melvin Shapiro. and Shapiro Bros. Investment Co., a dissolved Nevada corporation, of Third Party Defendant Pacific Employers Insurance Company (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
March 23, 2009 |
Filing 125
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #124 Stipulation to extend deadline to file Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order; due 4/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 20, 2009 |
Filing 124
STIPULATION and Order to Extend the Deadline to File the Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order in Compliance with LR 26-1(e) by Defendant Irwin Kishner. (Gerber, Jason)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing 123
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #121 Stipulation, to file responsive pleading to complaint. Boulevard Associates, Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall, Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc., General Growth Properties answer due 4/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing 122
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #120 Stipulation, to extend time to file response to Counter Claim. Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall, Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc.: response to Counter Claim due 4/3/2009;. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 13, 2009 |
Filing 121
STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, ; STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (Fourth Request) by Defendants Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc.. (Spinelli, Debra)
|
March 13, 2009 |
Filing 120
STIPULATION re #80 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, ; STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO CROSS-CLAIM (Third Request) by Defendants Boulevard Associates, Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc., General Growth Properties. (Spinelli, Debra)
|
March 10, 2009 |
Filing 119
ORDER - Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 6, 2009 |
Filing 118
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #112 Stipulation, to extend time to respond. "Boulevard Mall defendants" to respond by 3/13/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 5, 2009 |
Filing 117
ORDER granting #23 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jan A. Greben for Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker and Verna Walker and approving Alexander Robertson as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 5, 2009 |
Filing 115
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #109 Stipulation to extend time to respond to Cross Claim: Clark County School District response due 4/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 4, 2009 |
Filing 116
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #110 Stipulation for time to respond to Cross Claims: Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC ; Herman Kishner ; Irwin Kishner ; Jerry Engel ; Bank Of America(Trustee) - response due 4/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 4, 2009 |
Filing 114
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #108 Stipulation to extend time to respond to Cross-Claim: Maryland Square LLC response due 4/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
March 4, 2009 |
Filing 113
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Defendant Bank Of America. (Clayton, Shane)
|
March 4, 2009 |
Filing 112
STIPULATION re #79 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #80 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, ; STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (Third Request) by Defendants Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc.. (Spinelli, Debra)
|
March 3, 2009 |
Filing 111
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #107 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to #79 , #80 Cross-Claim. Boulevard Associates ; General Growth Management, Inc. ; Macy's Department Stores, Inc. ; Boulevard Mall ; Boulevard Mall I LLC ; Boulevard Mall II LLC ; Construction Developers, Inc. ; Federated Western Department Stores ; and General Growth Properties answer due 3/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 03/03/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
|
March 2, 2009 |
Filing 110
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Cross-Claim by Cross Defendant Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
March 2, 2009 |
Filing 109
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Cross-Claim by Cross Defendant Clark County School District. (Gerber, Jason)
|
March 2, 2009 |
Filing 108
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Cross-Claim by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
February 27, 2009 |
Filing 107
STIPULATION re #80 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, ; STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO CROSS-CLAIM (Second Request) by Defendants Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc.. (Spinelli, Debra)
|
February 6, 2009 |
Filing 106
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #103 Stipulation for time to respond to Cross-Claim before 3/3/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
February 6, 2009 |
Filing 105
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #102 Stipulation, for time to respond to Cross-Claim before 3/3/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
February 6, 2009 |
Filing 104
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #101 Stipulation for time to respond to Cross-Claim by 3/3/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing 103
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO CROSS-CLAIM by Cross Defendant Clark County School District. (Gerber, Jason)
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing 102
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO CROSS-CLAIM BY CROSS DEFENDANTS IRWIN KISHNER, JERRY ENGEL, BANK OF AMERICAN, AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HERMAN KISHNER TRUST AND by Cross Defendants Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing 101
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO CROSS-CLAIM by Defendant Maryland Square LLC, Cross Defendants Maryland Square LLC, Maryland Square LLC. (Gerber, Jason)
|
February 4, 2009 |
Filing 100
ORDER GRANTING #99 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Cross-Defendants to file their responsive pleading to the Cross-Complaint by 2/27/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 2/4/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
|
February 3, 2009 |
Filing 99
STIPULATION re #79 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #80 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, ; STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (First Request) by Defendant Boulevard Mall I LLC, Cross Defendants Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc.. (Spinelli, Debra)
|
January 26, 2009 |
Filing 98
Summons Issued as to Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (AXM)
|
January 24, 2009 |
Filing 97
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Corrected Summons against Pacific Employers Insurance Company, filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 23, 2009 |
Filing 96
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued PACIFIC EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by Defendant Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 23, 2009 |
Filing 95
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT SHAPIRO BROS. INVESTMENT CO, MELVIN SHAPIRO against Pacific Employers Insurance Company, filed by Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Adds new parties. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/2/2009.(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing 94
ORDER granting #78 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey R. Diver for Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy', s Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy', s Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc., Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy', s Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall, Boulevard Mall II LLC and Construction Developers, Inc. and approving Jim Pisanelli as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
January 22, 2009 |
Filing 93
ORDER granting #75 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeremy Gilman for Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company, Melvin Shapiro and Shapiro Brothers Investment Company and approving Neil Bellier as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
January 21, 2009 |
Filing 92
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #83 Stipulation for time to file responsive pleading. Answer/responsive pleading due 2/10/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 91
ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/30/2009. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/6/2009.(Gerber, Jason)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 90
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by CB Richard Ellis.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Went, Joseph)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 89
ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by CB Richard Ellis. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/30/2009. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/6/2009.(Went, Joseph)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 88
ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Maryland Square LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/30/2009. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/6/2009.(Gerber, Jason)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 87
ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Clark County School District. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/30/2009. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/6/2009.(Gerber, Jason)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 86
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC, Herman Kishner, Irwin Kishner, Jerry Engel, Bank Of America.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Gerber, Jason)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 85
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Maryland Square LLC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Gerber, Jason)
|
January 20, 2009 |
Filing 84
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Clark County School District.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Gerber, Jason)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 83
STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #61 Stipulation, ; STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (SECOND REQUEST) by Defendant General Growth Management, Inc.. (Pisanelli, James)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 82
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. . There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 81
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Melvin Shapiro. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 80
ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Defendant Shapiro Bros Investment Co. ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/26/2009., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/2/2009.), CROSSCLAIM against all defendants filed by Shapiro Brothers Investment Company.(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 16, 2009 |
Filing 79
ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Defendant Melvin Shapiro ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/26/2009., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/2/2009.), CROSSCLAIM against all defendants filed by Melvin Shapiro.(Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
January 15, 2009 |
Filing 78
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey R. Diver and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001106611) filed by Defendants General Growth Management, Inc., Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc.. Motion ripe 1/15/2009. (Pisanelli, James)
|
January 12, 2009 |
Filing 77
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #76 Stipulation for time to file responsive pleading by CB Richard Ellis before 1/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 1/12/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
January 9, 2009 |
Filing 76
STIPULATION (Second) and Order to Extend Time for Defendant CB Richard Ellis to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant CB Richard Ellis. (Went, Joseph)
|
January 8, 2009 |
Filing 75
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy Gilman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Neil J. Beller (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001098852) filed by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 1/8/2009. (Beller, Neil)
|
January 6, 2009 |
Filing 74
ORDER granting #67 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey T. Oberman for Melvin Shapiro and Shapiro Brothers Investment Company and approving Neil Beller as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/5/08. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
January 5, 2009 |
Filing 73
ORDER Granting #70 Motion to Extend Time. Melvin Shapiro and Shapiro Brothers Investment Company responsive pleading due 1/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
January 5, 2009 |
Filing 72
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #68 Stipulation to extend time to file responsive pleading. Responsive pleading due 1/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
January 5, 2009 |
Filing 71
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Delia's Cleaners of Arizona, Inc. served on 12/16/2008, answer due 1/20/2009. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 30, 2008 |
Filing 70
First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/non dispositive matter stipulation and order to extend time to respond to complaint to January 16, 2008 by Defendant Melvin Shapiro. Motion ripe 12/30/2008. (Oberman, Jeffrey)
|
December 29, 2008 |
Filing 69
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #68 Stipulation by Defendant CB Richard Ellis. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Went, Joseph)
|
December 29, 2008 |
Filing 68
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time for Defendant CB Richard Ellis to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant CB Richard Ellis. (Went, Joseph) #69 Notice of Corrected Image/Document filed on 12/30/08. (MJZ)
|
December 24, 2008 |
Filing 67
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey T. Oberman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Neil J. Beller (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001089192) filed by Defendants Melvin Shapiro, Shapiro Brothers Investment Company. Motion ripe 12/24/2008. (Beller, Neil)
|
December 16, 2008 |
Filing 66
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #60 Stipulation for time to file answer. Maryland Square LLC answer due 12/17/2008 before 5:00pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
December 16, 2008 |
Filing 65
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #62 Stipulation for defendants to file responsive pleadings before 1/20/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
December 16, 2008 |
Filing 64
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Shapiro Brothers Investment Company served on 12/10/2008, answer due 12/30/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 16, 2008 |
Filing 63
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Melvin Shapiro served on 12/10/2008, answer due 12/30/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 15, 2008 |
Filing 62
STIPULATION and Order by Defendant Bank Of America. (Clayton, Shane)
|
December 15, 2008 |
Filing 61
STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, ; STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by Defendants Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy's Department Stores, Inc., Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc.. (Pisanelli, James)
|
December 12, 2008 |
Filing 60
STIPULATION To Extend Deadline for Filing Answer by Defendant Maryland Square LLC. (Brown, Kevin)
|
December 12, 2008 |
Filing 59
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James J. Pisanelli on behalf of Defendants Boulevard Mall I LLC, Boulevard Mall II LLC, Construction Developers, Inc.. Boulevard Associates, General Growth Management, Inc., Macy's Department Stores, Inc. (Pisanelli, James)
|
December 5, 2008 |
Filing 58
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. Identifying Corporate Parent Kristine Pagaduan, Other Affiliate Mathilda Atwell, Other Affiliate Michael Katz, Other Affiliate Donna Kennedy, Other Affiliate Charles Bennett, Other Affiliate Faramarz Fayeghi, Other Affiliate Shellie Shan, Other Affiliate Wayde Harrington for Aiko Berge, Arthur Bodendorfer, Barbara Montero, Brenda C. Chaffin, Charles Walker, Clifford Rogers, Dragan Kurajica, Eliza Acosta, Hermann Rosner, Honore Gauthier, Jack Yencheck, Jacqueline Luehmann, James Luehmann, Jane Gauthier, Jason Cowles, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Kenneth Lowther, Kristian Meier, Marcus Rothkranz, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Michael J. Solmi, Mirha Elias, Nikolas Konstantinou, Ofelia Yencheck, Patricia Mahoney, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Peter Learned, Richard Falen, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Ruth Mannheimer, Sharon Rogers, Verna Walker, Victor Becerra, William Montero. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 5, 2008 |
Filing 57
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. General Growth Properties served on 12/1/2008, answer due 12/21/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 5, 2008 |
Filing 56
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Boulevard Mall served on 12/1/2008, answer due 12/21/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 55
ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiffs shall have a period of 10 calendar days from the filing date of this order within which to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/11/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 12/2/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 54
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Bank Of America served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/14/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 53
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. CB Richard Ellis served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/14/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 52
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. General Growth Properties served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/14/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 51
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Construction Developers, Inc. served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/14/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 50
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Federated Western Department Stores served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/14/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 49
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Boulevard Mall I LLC served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/14/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 48
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Boulevard Mall II LLC served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/14/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 47
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Irwin Kishner served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/14/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 46
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Clark County School District served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/14/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 45
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Jerry Engel served on 11/23/2008, answer due 12/13/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 44
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt, on 12/1/2008. By Deputy Clerk: Michael Zadina. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings as district judge. Judge Lloyd D. George no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:08-cv-01618-RCJ-GWF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 43
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker re #1 Complaint,. Maryland Square LLC served on 11/24/2008, answer due 12/14/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 26, 2008 |
Filing 42
ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt for reassignment. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/25/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 41
Summons Issued as to Shapiro Brothers Investment Company re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 40
Summons Issued as to Melvin Shapiro re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 39
Summons Issued as to Maryland Square LLC re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 38
Summons Issued as to Maryland Square Shopping Center LLC re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 37
Summons Issued as to Boulevard Mall II LLC re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 36
Summons Issued as to Boulevard Mall I LLC re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 35
Summons Issued as to Boulevard Mall re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 34
Summons Issued as to Federated Western Department Stores re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 33
Summons Issued as to Irwin Kishner re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 32
Summons Issued as to Herman Kishner re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 31
Summons Issued as to General Growth Properties re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 30
Summons Issued as to General Growth Properties re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 29
Summons Issued as to Jerry Engel re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 28
Summons Issued as to Delia's Cleaners of Arizona, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 27
Summons Issued as to Construction Developers, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 26
Summons Issued as to Clark County School District re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 25
Summons Issued as to CB Richard Ellis re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing 24
Summons Issued as to Bank Of America re #1 Complaint. (DXS)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 23
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jan Adam Greben and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Alexander Robertson (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001056980) filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. Motion ripe 11/19/2008. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 22
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 21
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 20
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 19
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 18
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 17
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 16
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 15
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 14
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 13
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 12
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 11
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 10
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 9
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 8
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 7
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 6
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 5
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Jack Yencheck, Ofelia Yencheck, Richard Malm, Roger Ellsworth, Jo Ann Ellsworth, Margaret Rudelich-Hoppe, Patricia Mahoney, Richard Falen, Peter Learned, Kristian Meier, William Montero, Eliza Acosta, Mirha Elias, Aiko Berge, Peter J. Voggenthaler, Victor Becerra, Barbara Montero, Arthur Bodendorfer, Brenda C. Chaffin, Michael J. Solmi, Jason Cowles, Jane Gauthier, Clifford Rogers, Honore Gauthier, Nikolas Konstantinou, Dragan Kurajica, Kenneth Lowther, James Luehmann, Sharon Rogers, Jacqueline Luehmann, Ruth Mannheimer, Hermann Rosner, Marcus Rothkranz, Daniel Soldini, Charles Walker, Verna Walker. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 4
(1st Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Jan Adam Greben is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select CM/ECF Info, to register the Attorney(s). (no image attached) (RFJ)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 3
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Jan Adam Greben Alexander Robertson, IV to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #link. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 12/20/2008.(no image attached) (AXM) Modified Counsel that is required to file verified Petition on 11/19/2008 (RFJ).
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 2
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs. (Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 09780000000001056220), filed by Plaintiffs. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/29/2008. Proof of service due by 3/19/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Taylor, Jennifer)
|
November 19, 2008 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #1 Complaint: ERROR: Summons not issued; Summons should have been filed as a separate document.CORRECTION: Attorney Jennifer L. Taylor advised to download and complete updated "AO 44(Rev.4/08 ) Summons in a Civil Action" form from Court's Website www.nvd.uscourts.gov and refile properly formatted summons as a separate event using "Proposed Summons to be Issued" event. (no image attached)(RFJ)
|
November 19, 2008 |
Case assigned to Judge Lloyd D. George and Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (AXM)
|
November 19, 2008 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to 3 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP: ERROR: Attorney Alexander Robertson, IV listed incorrectly to file Verified Petition, by court. CORRECTION: Attorney Jan Adam Greben is required to file Verified Petition. Verified Petition due by 12/20/2008 (no image attached)(RFJ)
|