Leber et al v. Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Leber, Rick Brunton, Thomas Kelley, Sonia Nunez and John Rangel
Defendant: Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc., Eldorado Resorts Corporation, Tricom Management, Inc., Patriot Resorts Corporation, Daily Management, Inc., Starpoint Resort Group, Inc., Geoholiday Development, LLC, The Berkley Group, Inc. and Williamsburg Plantation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2008cv01752
Filed: December 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Granting 210 Joint Motion Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement for an Order Granting Preliminary Approval to Proposed Class Action Settlement, Approving Distribution of Proposed Settlement Notice and to Setting Hearing Date on Proposed Settlement. Final Approval Hearing set for 9/26/11 @ 10:00 am in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Staying All Deadlines Until 4/5/2011. Stipulation for Dismissal due by 4/15/2011. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/23/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER that a telephonic status and dispute resolution hearing is set for 8/5/10 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties may appear telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER that in the event cousel for any party concludes action should be taken by the Court regarding matters addressed in the attached letter, they shall file an appropriate motion for relief with this Court. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/12/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Dismiss Claims in First Amended Complaint.Granting 23 Motion to Dismiss by Williamsburg Plantation Inc. Granting 37 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by The Berkley Group. Amended Complaint may be filed before 9/4/2009. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/27/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leber et al v. Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Leber
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Brunton
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kelley
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Nunez
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rangel
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corporation
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricom Management, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Resorts Corporation
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daily Management, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starpoint Resort Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joan C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoholiday Development, LLC
Represented By: Joan C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Berkley Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamsburg Plantation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?