Incorp Services, Inc., v. Legalzoom.com, Inc., Featured Case
Plaintiff: Incorp Services, Inc.,
Defendant: Legalzoom.com, Inc.,
Case Number: 2:2009cv00273
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Trademark Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2009 Filing 36 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Order Dismissing Case) (EDS)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice re 34 Stipulation of Dismissal. Each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 6/3/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 2, 2009 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Dismiss LegalZoom.com, Inc. with Prejudice by Plaintiff Incorp Services, Inc.,. (Kronenberger, Karl)
May 27, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc., Joint Notice That Action Has Been Resolved (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 31 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to 17 Amended Complaint. Answer due 5/27/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 5/12/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 11, 2009 Filing 31 STIPULATION re 17 Amended Complaint ; Third Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc.,. (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 29 Stipulation for Extension of time to File Response to 17 First Amended Complaint. Answer due 5/13/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 5/1/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 30, 2009 Filing 29 STIPULATION re 17 Amended Complaint ; Second Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc.,. (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
April 20, 2009 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); Declaration of Tony Young In Support Of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); Declaration of Jean-Paul Jassy with Exhibits 1-4 In Support Of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc., re 27 Declaration, 26 Declaration, 25 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
April 20, 2009 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Jean-Paul Jassy re 12 MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a); Memorandum Of POints and Authorities In Support Thereof; Affidavit of Kathryn Pellman With Exhibit A ; filed by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc.,. With Exhibits 1-4 (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
April 20, 2009 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Tony Young re 12 MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a); Memorandum Of POints and Authorities In Support Thereof; Affidavit of Kathryn Pellman With Exhibit A ; filed by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc.,. Declaration of Tony Young in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
April 20, 2009 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to 12 MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a); Memorandum Of POints and Authorities In Support Thereof; Affidavit of Kathryn Pellman With Exhibit A ; filed by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc.,. (Jassy, Jean-Paul)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Amended Complaint. Legalzoom.com, Inc., answer due 5/6/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 04/10/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
April 9, 2009 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc.,. (Bostwick, Gary)
April 6, 2009 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for First Amended Complaint of Incorp Services, Inc.; Plaintiff's Opposition to LegalZoom.com, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's Opposition to LegalZoom.com, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue; Declaration of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld in Support of Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue; and Declaration of Tennie Sedlacek in Support of Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue by Plaintiff Incorp Services, Inc., re 21 Declaration, 17 Amended Complaint, 18 Response to Motion,, 19 Response to Motion, 20 Declaration,. (Kronenberger, Karl)
April 6, 2009 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Tennie Sedlacek re 12 MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a); Memorandum Of POints and Authorities In Support Thereof; Affidavit of Kathryn Pellman With Exhibit A ; filed by Plaintiff Incorp Services, Inc.,. (DECLARATION OF TENNIE SEDLACEK IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE) (Kronenberger, Karl)
April 6, 2009 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Jeffrey M. Rosenfeld re 12 MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a); Memorandum Of POints and Authorities In Support Thereof; Affidavit of Kathryn Pellman With Exhibit A ; filed by Plaintiff Incorp Services, Inc.,. (DECLARATION OF JEFFREY M. ROSEFELD IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Exhibits A-B))(Kronenberger, Karl)
April 6, 2009 Filing 19 RESPONSE to 12 MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a); Memorandum Of POints and Authorities In Support Thereof; Affidavit of Kathryn Pellman With Exhibit A, filed by Plaintiff Incorp Services, Inc.,. (Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue) Replies due by 4/20/2009. (Kronenberger, Karl)
April 6, 2009 Filing 18 RESPONSE to 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Also To Strike Prayer For Relief Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Also To Strike Prayer For Relief Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof, filed by Plaintiff Incorp Services, Inc.,. (Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) Replies due by 4/20/2009. (Kronenberger, Karl)
April 6, 2009 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint) with Jury Demand against Legalzoom.com, Inc.,, filed by Incorp Services, Inc.,. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 8/4/2009.(Kronenberger, Karl)
March 25, 2009 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 14 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice addressed to Gary L. Bostwick. Remailed to Gary Bostwick's complete address. (ASB) (ASB)
March 25, 2009 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 13 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice addressed to Gary L. Bostwick. Remailed to Gary Bostwick's complete address. (ASB)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jean-Paul Jassy for Legalzoom.com, Inc. and Approving Attorney Will Kemp for Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 03/20/09. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK) .
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gary L. Bostwick for Legalzoom.com, Inc. and Approving Attorney Will Kemp for Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 03/20/09. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
March 19, 2009 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a); Memorandum Of POints and Authorities In Support Thereof; Affidavit of Kathryn Pellman With Exhibit A by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc.,. Responses due by 4/6/2009. (Kemp, Will)
March 19, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Also To Strike Prayer For Relief Pursuant to FRCP 12(f); Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc.,. Responses due by 4/6/2009. (Kemp, Will)
March 19, 2009 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Legalzoom.com, Inc.,.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Kemp, Will)
March 19, 2009 Filing 9 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jean-Paul Jassy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Will Kemp (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001173848) by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc.,. Motion ripe 3/19/2009. (Kemp, Will)
March 19, 2009 Filing 8 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gary L. Bostwick and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Will Kemp (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001173798) by Defendant Legalzoom.com, Inc.,. Motion ripe 3/19/2009. (Kemp, Will)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 2 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl S. Kronenberger for Incorp Services, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Dowon S. Kang for Incorp Services, Inc.,. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 3/3/2009. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
March 3, 2009 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Incorp Services, Inc.,.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Kang, Dowon)
February 11, 2009 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (DXS)
February 11, 2009 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Legalzoom.com, Inc., re 1 Complaint. (DXS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2009: # 1 Summons) (DXS). Modified on 2/11/2009 (DXS). (DS, Case number added to Summons)
February 11, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - link. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (DXS)
February 11, 2009 Case assigned to Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt. (DXS)
February 10, 2009 Filing 2 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Karl S. Kronenberger and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dowon S. Kang (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001134943) by Plaintiff INCORP SERVICES, INC., a Nevada corporation. Motion ripe 2/10/2009. (Kang, Dowon)
February 10, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against LEGALZOOM.COM, INC., a Delaware corporation (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 09780000000001134877), filed by INCORP SERVICES, INC., a Nevada corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/20/2009. Proof of service due by 6/10/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kang, Dowon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Incorp Services, Inc., v. Legalzoom.com, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legalzoom.com, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Incorp Services, Inc.,
Represented By: Karl S. Kronenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?