Greene v. Alan Waxler Group Charter Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert A Greene
Defendant: Alan Waxler Group Charter Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00748
Filed: April 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Order of Final Approval and Judgment 234 . The Court hereby enters judgment in this Action. Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint is hereby dismissed with prejudice according to the terms of the Settlement and this Final Order and Judgment, without costs charged to any party except as provided therein. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting 229 , 232 Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement. The Court reserves the right to continue the date of the Final Approval Hearing without further notice to Class members. The Court retains jurisdiction to consider all further applications arising out of or in connection with the Settlement. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting 216 Stipulation to continue status hearing. Status Conference reset for 2/27/2015 01:15 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying as moot 200 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Denying 185 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions re Discovery as to the portion requesting sanctions pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1927. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 06/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Denying 174 Motion decertify as a representative class and collective action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Denying in part 185 Motion for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Denying 173 Defendants' Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 06/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Granting 189 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply to 173 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 171 Order. Replies due within 14 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 06/06/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Awarding Defendants $14,450 in Attorneys' Fees and $1,766 in costs, to be paid no later than 5/5/2014 re 149 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 04/04/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 149 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions re Discovery and Denying as moot 170 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Denying 132 Defendants' Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/03/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Granting 145 Motion to Amend/Correct 29 Answer to Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants file an amended answer identical to that attached as exhibit 1 to the motion to amend (doc. # 145 , ex. 1) within 14 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 02/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Setting a Hearing on 149 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions re Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2014 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 138 Stipulation for Substitution of Attorney. Attorneys Rick Roskelley, Wendy M. Krincek, Kristina Gilmore Escamilla, and R. Calder Huntington are substituted in place and stead of Attorneys Joel Z. Schwarz, Michael N Feder, and Molly Malone Rezac. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER that 123 Objections re 121 Magistrate Judge's Order is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Approving FLSA and Class Notice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting 105 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Norman H. Kirshman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 6/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 95 Renewed Joint Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Denying without Prejudice 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Denying without Prejudice 73 MOTION to Certify Class, and Denying without Prejudice 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/20/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Denying 66 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Samuel Baum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 4/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying without prejudice 27 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/6/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that parties shall file a joint Discovery Status Report on 9/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/8/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying 31 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/18/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Alan Waxler Group Charter Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Greene
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Waxler Group Charter Services, LLC
Represented By: Suzanne L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?