Trapp v. Big Poppa's, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Theodore Trapp
Defendant: Big Poppa's, LLC, Sky Top Vending, Inc., La Fuente, Inc., C.P. Food and Beverage, Inc., Deja Vu Showgirls of Las Vegas, LLC, Palomino Club, Inc., SHAC, LLC, K-Kel, Inc., D.2801 Westwood, Inc., Little Darlings Of Las Vegas, LLC, O.G. Eliades, A.D. LLC, Las Vegas Entertainment, LLC, Michael A. Saltman, Rick's Las Vegas, Frias Management, LLC, Western Cab Company, Nevada Checker Cab Corporation, Nevada Star Cab Corporation, Nevada Yellow Cab Corporation, Lucky Cab Company of Nevada, Sun Cab, Inc., CLS Nevada, LLC, On Demand Sedan Services, LLC, BLS Limousine Service of Las Vegas, Inc., Desert Cab, Inc., Bell Trans and Tony Chong
Case Number: 2:2009cv00995
Filed: June 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER re 255 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by La Fuente, Inc. The Court is satisfied that Defendant LaFuente did not intentionally disregard the court's orders [252, 253], and sacntions are not warranted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER Granting 77 , 175 , 235 , and 243 Motions to Dismiss and 221 and 236 Joinders. The complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice as to Defendants Deja Vu Showgirls of Las Vegas, LLC, Little Darlings of Las Vegas, LLC, Las Vegas Entertainment LLC, D.2801 Westwood, Inc., Big Poppa's LLC, O.G. Eliades, A.D., LLC, RCI Entertainment (Las Vegas), Inc., Shac, LLC, and K-Kel, Inc. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER STAYING CASE Until September 1, 2010. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 25, 2009 Filing 213
STIPULATION To Stay Case as Between Plaintiff and Defendant K-Kel, Inc. by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp. (Balabanian, Rafey)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212
ORDER GRANTING 211 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings until 12/29/09 Pending Outcome of Settlement Discussions as to Defendants Big Poppas LLC and O.G. Eliades AD LLC. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/9/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 30, 2009 Filing 211
STIPULATION re 157 Stipulation ; (Proposed) to Stay Proceedings Pending Outcome of Settlement Discussions(Second Request) by Defendants O.G. Eliades, A.D. LLC, Big Poppa's, LLC. (Brown, David)
October 26, 2009 Filing 210
REPLY to Response to 175 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) or for More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) ; filed by Defendant D.2801 Westwood, Inc.. (Goodman, Ross)
October 21, 2009 Filing 209
JOINDER to 208 Reply to Response to Motion, ; filed by Defendant CLS Nevada, LLC. (Kirshman, Norman)
October 20, 2009 Filing 208
REPLY to Response to 201 MOTION for Leave to File Response in Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss of Defendants Deja Vu Showgirls, Little Darlings, Las Vegas Entertainment, and D.2801 Westwood ; filed by Defendants Little Darlings Of Las Vegas, LLC, Las Vegas Entertainment, LLC, Deja Vu Showgirls of Las Vegas, LLC. (Beller, Neil)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207
ORDER GRANTING 206 Stipulation to Stay for 90 days. Proceedings are hereby stayed for 90 days through and including 1/13/2010. If the Parties are unable to resolve this matter during the 90-day stay,Defendant C.P. Food & Beverage, Inc. d/b/a Club Paradise shall have 30-days from the date ofthe expiration of the stay to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 10/15/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 15, 2009 Filing 206
STIPULATION For 90-Day Stay As Between Plaintiff and Defendant C.P. Food & Beverage, Inc. Pending Settlement Discussions by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp. (Balabanian, Rafey)
October 9, 2009 Filing 204
RESPONSE to 175 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) or for More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e), 77 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp. Replies due by 10/23/2009. (Balabanian, Rafey)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203
ORDER GRANTING Trapp's 198 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss. Complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to Desert Cab, Inc.; Frias Management, LLC; Lucky Cab Company of Nevada; Nevada Checker Cab Corporation; Nevada Star Cab Corporation; Nevada Yellow Cab Corporation; On Demand Sedan Services, LLC; Michael A. Saltman; Sun Cab, Inc.; Western Cab Company; BLS Limousine Service of Las Vegas, Inc. and Bell Trans. Parties to bear their own fees and costs. It is further ORDERED that Michael Saltman's 152 Motion to Dismiss, Frias Management LLC's 159 Motion to Dismiss, Western Cab Company's 161 Motion to Dismiss and Bell Trans' 191 Motion to Dismiss are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 10/7/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 23, 2009 Filing 200
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by La Fuente, Inc... (Curtas, John)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199
ORDER that Defendant shall file its Certificate of Interested Parties by 10/5/2009. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/21/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 14, 2009 Filing 197
REPLY to Response to filed by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp. (Balabanian, Rafey)
September 1, 2009 Filing 196
RESPONSE to filed by Defendants Western Cab Company, Lucky Cab Company of Nevada, Sun Cab, Inc., On Demand Sedan Services, LLC, BLS Limousine Service of Las Vegas, Inc., Desert Cab, Inc.. Plaintiff's Amended Motion To Enlarge Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Replies due by 9/15/2009. (Bendavid, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2009 Filing 195
JOINDER to 191 MOTION to Dismiss and Supplement to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Frias Management, LLC. (Tomlinson, D. Neal) Modified text and add document relationship on 8/31/2009 (RFJ).
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194
ORDER GRANTING 190 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Outcome of Settlement Discussions. Proceedings stayed 90 days between Plaintiff and K-Kel, Inc. If the parties are unable to resolve this matter during the 90 day stay, K-Kel Inc shall file answer to complaint within 30 days from expiration of stay. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/26/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 25, 2009 Filing 193
SUPPLEMENT to 184 Joinder ; by Defendant CLS Nevada, LLC. (Kirshman, Norman)
August 24, 2009 Filing 191
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Bell Trans. Responses due by 9/11/2009. (Trafton, Mark)
August 21, 2009 Filing 187
Amended MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (Plaintiff's Amended Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Motions to Dismiss of Defendants Little Darlings of Las Vegas,LLC, Deja Vu Showgirls of Las Vegas, LLC, Las Vegas Entertainment, LLC, Nevada Checker Cab Corporation, Nevada Star Cab Corporation, Nevada Yellow Cab Corporation, Western Cab Company, Lucky Cab Company of Nevada, Sun Cab, Inc., Desert Cab, Inc., on Demand Sedan Services, LLC, BLS Limousine Service of Las Vegas, Inc., Frias Management, LLC, CLS Nevada, LLC, D.2801 Westwood, INC.) re 77 MOTION to Dismiss, 184 Joinder, 185 Joinder, 175 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) or for More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e), 159 MOTION to Dismiss, 161 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp. Motion ripe 8/21/2009. (Smyth, James) M
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 182 Motion to Extend Deadline. Responses due by 8/31/2009 re Defendant Michael A. Saltman's 77 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/20/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 19, 2009 Filing 184
JOINDER to 159 MOTION to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant CLS Nevada, LLC. (Kirshman, Norman)
August 17, 2009 Filing 182
MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Motion of Defendant Michael A. Saltman for Dismissal of the Complaint re 152 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp. Motion ripe 8/17/2009. (Smyth, James)
August 14, 2009 Filing 181
JOINDER to 178 Joinder, 179 Joinder ; Joinder to Frias Management, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Motion of Defendants Deja Vu Showgirls of Las Vegas, LLC, Little Darlings of Las Vegas, LLC and Las Vegas Entertainment, LLC for Dismissal of the Complaint and for Leave to File a Consolidated Response in Opposition to Any Current and Future Motions to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendant D.2801 Westwood, Inc.. (Goodman, Ross)
August 13, 2009 Filing 179
JOINDER to Response to 151 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter; filed by Defendant Frias Management, LLC. (Tomlinson, D. Neal) Docket entry relationship added on 8/13/09. (MJZ)
August 12, 2009 Filing 176
RESPONSE to 151 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter; filed by Defendants Little Darlings Of Las Vegas, LLC, Las Vegas Entertainment, LLC, Deja Vu Showgirls of Las Vegas, LLC. Replies due by 8/26/2009. (Beller, Neil)
August 10, 2009 Filing 175
MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) or for More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) by Defendant D.2801 Westwood, Inc.. Responses due by 8/28/2009. (Goodman, Ross)
August 6, 2009 Filing 174
SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 500.00 posted by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp on behalf of Defendant La Fuente, Inc. Receipt # 55301. (ASB) Modified bond type on 8/10/2009. (ASB)
August 5, 2009 Filing 168
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John H. Weston and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel William H. Brown (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001322651) filed by Defendant K-Kel, Inc.. Motion ripe 8/5/2009. (Garrou, G.)
August 3, 2009 Filing 162
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Date to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Bell Trans. (Trafton, Mark)
July 31, 2009 Filing 161
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 9(b) and 12(b)(6) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) by Defendants Western Cab Company, Lucky Cab Company of Nevada, Sun Cab, Inc., On Demand Sedan Services, LLC, BLS Limousine Service of Las Vegas, Inc., Desert Cab, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2009. (Bendavid, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2009 Filing 158
STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, ; To Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant CLS Nevada, LLC. (Kirshman, Norman)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154
ORDER granting 147 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Wayne Robert Gross for Frias Management, LLC and approving Attorney Neal Tomlinson as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/29/09.
Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov
(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 28, 2009 Filing 148
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Sun Cab, Inc.. Motion ripe 7/28/2009. (Bendavid, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2009 Filing 145
SURETY BOND # LSM0131394 in the amount of $ 500.00 posted by Karla Jean Dunsmoor, agent of RLI Insurance Co. Bond posted as cash surety by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp on behalf of Defendant Las Vegas Entertainment. (ECS)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Defendant La Fuente, Inc.. (Curtas, John)
July 22, 2009 Filing 126
STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, ; To Extend Date for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Defendant CLS Nevada, LLC. (Kirshman, Norman)
July 21, 2009 Filing 134
SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 500 posted; Receipt # 55285, Bond # LSM0129769. (AXM)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 111 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Responses and Replies to 77 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/29/2009. Replies due by 8/12/2009. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/17/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117
ORDER granting On Demand Sedan Services, LLC's 96 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Kimberly Maxson-Rushton terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/15/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 16, 2009 Filing 114
MOTION for Demand for Security of Costs by Defendant Bell Trans. Responses due by 8/3/2009. (Trafton, Mark)
July 15, 2009 Filing 111
STIPULATION re 77 MOTION to Dismiss ; (TO ENLARGE TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS) by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp. (Smyth, James)
July 14, 2009 Filing 110
Summons Issued as to Tony Chong re 1 Complaint. (ECS)
July 10, 2009 Filing 108
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by BLS Limousine Service of Las Vegas, Inc... There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Bendavid, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2009 Filing 105
STIPULATION and Order to Continue Deadline to file Answer (Second Request) by Defendants O.G. Eliades, A.D. LLC, Big Poppa's, LLC. (Brown, David)
July 8, 2009 Filing 104
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Lucky Cab Company of Nevada. Motion ripe 7/8/2009. (Bendavid, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2009 Filing 99
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Rick's Las Vegas, filed by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp. (Smyth, James)
July 6, 2009 Filing 92
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, SHAC, LLC's Answer to Class Action Complaint filed by SHAC, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/16/2009. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/20/2009.(Roos, Brandon)
July 2, 2009 Filing 91
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendant SHAC, LLC Stipulation and order between Theodore Trapp and Shca, llc dba Sapphire to Extend the Deadline to File and Serve Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. (Ferrario, Mark)
July 1, 2009 Filing 90
STIPULATION to Substitute Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant CLS Nevada, LLC. Motion ripe 7/1/2009. (Kirshman, Norman) Event modified on 7/6/2009 (RFJ).
June 30, 2009 Filing 86
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by K-Kel, Inc... There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Garrou, G.)
June 29, 2009 Filing 79
MOTION for Demand for Security of Costs by Defendants Little Darlings Of Las Vegas, LLC, Las Vegas Entertainment, LLC, Deja Vu Showgirls of Las Vegas, LLC. Responses due by 7/17/2009. (Beller, Neil)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71
ORDER GRANTING 64 Stipulation to Extend Deadline., Little Darlings Of Las Vegas, LLC; Las Vegas Entertainment, LLC; and Deja Vu Showgirls of Las Vegas, LLC answers due 6/29/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/26/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 25, 2009 Filing 69
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jay Edelson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James E. Smyth, II (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001277679) by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp. Motion ripe 6/25/2009. (Smyth, James)
June 24, 2009 Filing 59
STIPULATION Proposed Stipulation and Order Between Plaintiff and Defendant D.2801 Westwood, Inc. d/b/a Treasures to Extend the Deadline to File and Serve Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant D.2801 Westwood, Inc.. (Goodman, Ross)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54
ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to Clerk of Court for random reassignmen to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/23/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS; cc:QC for reassignment)
June 22, 2009 Filing 53
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Will Kemp on behalf of Defendant Frias Management, LLC. (Kemp, Will)
June 19, 2009 Filing 52
NOTICE by Defendant Frias Management, LLC DEMAND FOR SECURITY OF COSTS (Tomlinson, D. Neal)
June 18, 2009 Filing 50
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theodore Trapp re 1 Complaint,. Western Cab Company served on 6/8/2009, answer due 6/28/2009. (Smyth, James)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33
ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff shall have a period of 10 calendar days from the filing date of this order within which to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/26/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/16/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 10, 2009 Filing 31
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theodore Trapp re 1 Complaint,. Little Darlings Of Las Vegas, LLC served on 6/5/2009, answer due 6/25/2009. (Smyth, James)
June 3, 2009 Filing 9
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Palimono Club, Inc. dba Palomino Club, filed by Plaintiff Theodore Trapp. (Smyth, James)
June 2, 2009 Filing 1
COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 09780000000001251374), filed by Theodore Trapp. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/12/2009. Proof of service due by 9/30/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smyth, James)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trapp v. Big Poppa's, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Trapp
Represented By: James E Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Poppa's, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Top Vending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Fuente, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.P. Food and Beverage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deja Vu Showgirls of Las Vegas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palomino Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Kel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.2801 Westwood, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Darlings Of Las Vegas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.G. Eliades, A.D. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Saltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick's Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frias Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Cab Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Checker Cab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Star Cab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Yellow Cab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Cab Company of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Cab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLS Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Demand Sedan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLS Limousine Service of Las Vegas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Cab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Trans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?