Kabins Family Limited Partnership et al v. Chain Consortium et al
Plaintiff: Kabins Family Limited Partnership and Lori C. Kabins
Defendant: Chain Consortium, 3900, LLC, 99th & Indian School, LLC, 99th & Indian School Management, LLC, Benessere, LLC, Todd W. Bergman, Buckeye Canamex 77 One, LLC, Buckeye 80 West Three, LLC, Capri I, LLC, Capri II, LLC, Jeff Chain, Linda Chain, Cipriani, LLC, Cipriani Management, LLC, Cottonwood Retail, LLC, GEIII, LLC, Gila Bend 384, LLC, Edward Gutzman, III, Innovative Assets, LLC, J. Matthew Kammeyer, KAN Investments, LLC, Gabriel Martinez, Millennium Construction, Inc., Millennium Commercial Properties, LLC, Michael's Plaza, LLC, Modern Management, Inc., Millennium Properties & Development, Inc., Phoenix 83rd, LLC, Allyn F. Povilaitis, RCRE, LLC and T.W.B. Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01125
Filed: June 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER Granting 575 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/29/2012. Any and all entry(ies) of default and/or default judgments (including, but not limited to, the Default Judgment entered in this Action on or about June 22, 2001 against Millennium Construction, Inc. 370 be vacated and set aside and thereupon dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys fees and costs. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 418 Motion to Compel. The deposition of Deponent Corbo must be completed on or before October 26, 2012. On or before October 10, 2012, Plaintiffs shall file an affidavit regarding the reasonable costs, in cluding attorneys fees, incurred in bringing the 418 Motion to Compel. A response to said affidavit of fees and costs shall be filed on or before October 17, 2012. A hearing on the affidavit of fees and costs set for 10/22/2012 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 09/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER Granting 481 Motion to Strike All References to the Deposition of Jeffrey Benton Chain and All Related Arguments Contained in the Motion For Sanctions Against Albert D. Massi, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER Granting 396 and 398 Counter-Motions to Strike Deposition of Jeffrey Benton Chain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER Granting 391 Counter Motion to Strike the Deposition of Jeffrey Benton Chain and all Arguments Contained in the Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Relating Thereto. Granting 399 Counter Motion to Strike the Deposition of Jeffrey Benton Chain and All Arguments Contained in the Reply to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER that Defendants/Cross-Defendants Todd Bergman and T.W.B. Enterprises, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss 444 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/14/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER Denying 338 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 334 Order. Denying as moot 403 Counter Motion to Strike. Denying 351 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Denying 359 Counter Motion for Attorney Fees. D enying 355 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Counterclaim brought by Benessere, et al. Denying 356 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Third-Party Complaint brought by Benessere, LLC, et al. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 370 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs Kabins Family, LLC and Lori C. Kabins Separate Property Trust and against Millennium Construction, Inc. in the amount of $11,182,387.44, plus interest for compensatory damages, $33,547,162.32 for exemplary and punitive damages, $33,547,162.32 for treble damages, and attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER Denying 316 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that parties shall file a joint, updated proposal for the completion of discovery on or before 4/14/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER that the reasonable costs, including attorney's fees, incurred to bring 247 Motion to Compel are awarded to the defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that awarded expenses are to be paid by the Plaintiff and Plaintiff's attorneys jointly and severally. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that payment shall be made on or before 4/7/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/29/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 329 AMENDED ORDER that the Court will treat the Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record 327 as a Motion to Remove Counsel From CM/ECF Service List. The Motion to Remove Counsel From CM/ECF Service List 327 is GRANTED in that J. Scott Burris, Esq. shall be removed forthwith from the CM/ECF service list on this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 12/28/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss Third-party Complaint 208 is DENIED as moot. The Motion to Dismiss First Amended Third-party Complaint 238 is GRANTED in part, with leave to amend in part. The Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims 262 is GRA NTED, with leave to amend in part. The Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims 288 is GRANTED, with leave to amend in part. The Motion to Dismiss Amended Crossclaim 291 is GRANTED, with leave to amend. The Motion to Vacate Magistrate Order 285 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/27/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kabins Family Limited Partnership et al v. Chain Consortium et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kabins Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Jodi Donetta Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori C. Kabins
Represented By: Jodi Donetta Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chain Consortium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3900, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 99th & Indian School, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 99th & Indian School Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benessere, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd W. Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Canamex 77 One, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye 80 West Three, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capri I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capri II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Chain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Chain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cipriani, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cipriani Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottonwood Retail, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEIII, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gila Bend 384, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Gutzman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Assets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Matthew Kammeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAN Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Commercial Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael's Plaza, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Properties & Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix 83rd, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allyn F. Povilaitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCRE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.W.B. Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?