United Stats of America v. Heli USA Airways, Inc.
Plaintiff: United Stats of America
Defendant: Heli USA Airways, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01339
Filed: July 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America and against Heli USA Airways, Inc., pursuant to 26 U.S.C. § 6332(d)(1) in the amount of $50,553.83, plus statutory interest pursuant to 26 U.S.C. §6621, accruing after December 2, 2011; an d JUDGMENT is entered in favor of the United States of America and against the defendant, Heli USA Airways, pursuant to 26 U.S.C. § 6332(d)(2) in the amount of $25,276.91, plus statutory interest pursuant to 26 U.S.C. §6621, accruing after December 2, 2011. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/1/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 19 United States' Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the government submit a proposed final judgment by 12/2/2011. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 1/31/2011. Motions due by 3/2/2011. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Stats of America v. Heli USA Airways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Stats of America
Represented By: Virginia Cronan Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heli USA Airways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?