Nalder et al v. United Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James Nalder and Gary Lewis
Defendant: United Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2009cv01348
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting ECF No. 149 Stipulation re ECF No. 146 Motion to Amend. Reply due by 10/23/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees and Costs are awarded in favor of Plaintiffs James Nalder and Gary Lewis and against Defendant United Automobile Insurance Company in the amount of $3,378.24 in prejudgment interest, $8,028.40 in costs, and $72,546.18 in attorney fees. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 06/03/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 88 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting 89 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying 75 Motion for Plaintiff to Post Cost Bond on Appeal Pursuant to F.R.A.P.7. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 10/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 2/16/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Colleen Larsen. Denying 65 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 1/26/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Colleen Larsen. Denying 45 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Defendant's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to all of Plaintiffs' claims. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 12/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nalder et al v. United Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nalder
Represented By: David F Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lewis
Represented By: David F Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas E Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?