McDonald v. Palacios et al
Plaintiff: |
Thomas M McDonald |
Defendant: |
Steven C Palacios and Sarah Nelson |
Case Number: |
2:2009cv01470 |
Filed: |
August 6, 2009 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
County: |
Clark |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
Kent J. Dawson |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 23, 2016 |
Filing
214
BENCH ORDER - FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. (See pdf Order for details and specifics.) The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of McDonald on the Palacios Parties counter claims against him, and in favor of Bailes on the Palacios Parties third-party claims against him. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Krick and UBB. All remaining named Defendants, as described in this Order, and all remaining claims, counterclaims and third party claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
June 10, 2015 |
Filing
206
ORDER Granting 205 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing Post-Hearing Briefs. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline to post-hearing briefs is extended to, and including, July 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
April 1, 2015 |
Filing
187
ORDER granting 185 Stipulation of Dismissal of Third Party Defendant Barbara McDonald, each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs incurred herein. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing
157
ORDER granting 155 Motion for Clarification. The Order 152 also applies to UBB. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
April 19, 2013 |
Filing
112
ORDER that third party plaintiffs and third party defendants Leonard S. Krick and United Business Brokers of Nevada, LLC schedule a settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. forthwith. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 29, 2012 |
Filing
84
ORDER that Plaintiffs request to substitute Thomas G. Grace in the place and stead of Tisha Black Chernine is GRANTED, subject to the provisions of LR IA 10-6(c) and (d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
September 27, 2011 |
Filing
77
ORDER Granting 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Sixth cause of action for Declaratory Relief is GRANTED IN PART as stated herein. FURTHER ORDERED that the Third and Ninth causes of ac tion of Defendants' Counterclaim are DISMISSED with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 63 Motion for Countermotion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 58 Motion to Dismiss Complaint as it relates to Third Party Defendant Leonard S. Krick is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/27/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 12, 2010 |
Filing
19
ORDER Denying 11 Defendants Palacios and Nelson's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/12/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?