Roman v. Chase et al
Plaintiff: Ed Roman
Defendant: Bernie Chase, William Harger and Chris Andreoli
Case Number: 2:2009cv01476
Filed: August 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 44 Notice of Death as to Plaintiff Ed Roman. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that plaintiffs motion for default judgment 40 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ERRATA to ORDER granting 36 Stipulation to Continue Roman's Response Date to Defendants Bernie Chase's and Chris Andreoli's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 2/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that defendants Bernie Chase and Chris Andreolis motion to dismiss or, motion for more definite statement 19 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman v. Chase et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernie Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Harger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Andreoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?