Perez-Zarate v. Bravo Pro Maintenance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rosendo Perez-Zarate
Defendant: Bravo Pro Maintenance, Inc., Adrian Ramirez and Alfonso Ramirez
Case Number: 2:2009cv01567
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Denying 63 Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment Against Garnishee Defendants. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 7/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying 57 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 7/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JUDGMENT in favor of Rosendo Perez-Zarate against Bravo Pro Maintenance, Inc., Adrian Ramirez, Alfonso Ramirez, Gabriel Ramirez, and Guillermo Alonso in the amount of $611,124.74. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 11/23/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery. Plaintiffs requests for admissions are deemed admitted by each and all defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall, not later than October 1, 2010, pay the plaintiffs attorneys fees and costs in the amount of $1,500.00 incurred in bringing the motion.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs request for an order striking the defendants Answers is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 9/9/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 29 the Moran Law Firm's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for defendants. Defendants shall have until 6/28/10 to retain new counsel or file a memoranda explaining why they have not retained counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all proceedings in this case shall be STAYED until 6/28/10. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines will be modified and approved as follows: Discovery due by 10/8/2010. Motions due by 11/9/2010. Proposed Join t Pretrial Order due by 12/10/2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Moran Law Firm shall provide each defendant with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 5/13/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Zarate v. Bravo Pro Maintenance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bravo Pro Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfonso Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosendo Perez-Zarate
Represented By: Brooke A. Bohlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?