Chudacoff, MD v. University Medical Center Of Southern Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Richard Chudacoff, MD
Defendant: University Medical Center Of Southern Nevada, Steve Sisolak, Tom Collins, Larry Brown, Lawrence Weekly, Chris Giunchigliani, Susan Brager, Rory Reid, Medical and Dental Staff of the University Medical Center of Southern Nevada, Kathleen Silver, John Ellerton, M.D., frederick lippmann, jim christensen, charles bloom, marietta nelson, j. dylan curry and kshama daphtary
Case Number: 2:2009cv01679
Filed: August 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice, each party to bear their own fees and costs incurred herein. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Granting 172 Michael K. Naethe's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff. Attorney Michael K. Naethe terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 03/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Granting 127 and 128 Motions to Substitute Attorney Kim Irene Mandelbaum in place and stead of Attorney Lynn M. Hansen for The Medical and Dental Staff of the University Medical Center of Southern Nevada and John Ellerton, M.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/7/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to Chief Judge Robert C. Jones for reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/4/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER DISMISSING for lack of jurisdiction 95 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Richard Chudacoff, MD. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 97 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 75 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Chudacoff, MD is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Denying 77 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/11/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. Granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting 55 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs First and Second claims for declaratory and injunctive relief and for violation of 42 U.S.C. § 1983 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs remaining claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/28/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chudacoff, MD v. University Medical Center Of Southern Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Chudacoff, MD
Represented By: Michael K. Naethe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Medical Center Of Southern Nevada
Represented By: Bradley M Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sisolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Weekly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Giunchigliani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Brager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical and Dental Staff of the University Medical Center of Southern Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ellerton, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: frederick lippmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jim christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: charles bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: marietta nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: j. dylan curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kshama daphtary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?