R&O Construction Company v. New Creation Masonry, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R&O Construction Company
Defendant: New Creation Masonry, Inc., Rox Pro International Group, Ltd., Real Stone Source, LLC and WD Partners, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv01749
Filed: September 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Adopting and Accepting 154 and 156 Report and Recommendations. Granting 147 and 148 Motions for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Denying 126 and 127 Motions for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/19/2012. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/19/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting 119 Motion for Final Judgment. The clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of defendant WD Partners, Inc. and against plaintiff R&O Construction Company. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/12/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 77 Defendant Real Stone Source, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting 111 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Arizona Stone & Architectural Products NV, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a brief sur-reply of not more than 10 pages, within 15 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 73 Defendant WD Partners, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting 83 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Exhibit 1 and the declaration of Robert S. Larsen attached as exhibit 2 to 73 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting 92 Motion to Strike declaration of Nakesha Duncan attached as Exhibit 1 to 77 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant Real Stone Source, LLC's Designation and Report of Eric C. Hoff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 58 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Expert Report of R.P. Phelps and Portions of Exp ert Report of David Gray LaFortune is GRANTED to the extent that Phelp's report is stricken and portions of LaFortunes's report are stricken as described in Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Reports of Michael John Gannon and Steve Easton is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 71 Defendant WD Partner's Motion to Strike 69 Reply is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 72 Defendant Arizona Stone's Motion to Strike 70 Reply is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in all other respects, the motions are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 7/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation to Modify Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order filed by WD Partners, Inc.. Discovery due by 3/10/2011. Motions due by 4/8/2011. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/12/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 12/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM).
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 30 plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to serve defendant Rox Pro International Group, Ltd., d/b/a Rox Products International. ( FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 3/24/2010.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/22/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING 8 parties' Stipulation for an extension of time for Def WD Partners to respond to 1 Complaint. WD Partners, Inc. answer due 10/20/2009. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/2/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R&O Construction Company v. New Creation Masonry, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Creation Masonry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rox Pro International Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Stone Source, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WD Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&O Construction Company
Represented By: Michael D. Stanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?