Hotel Employees and Restaurant Employees International Union Welfare Fund et al v. Kephart & Corti Productions, Inc. et al
Case Number: 2:2009cv02043
Filed: October 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 41 MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that 49 MOTION to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Denying 57 Motion to Reconsider Oral Motion to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that Plaintiffs oral motion for an order to show cause is DENIED. Plaintiffs Proposed Order to Show Cause 52 and Amended Proposed Order to Show Cause 53 are NOT APPROVED and are Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Ex Parte Motion. Judgment Debtor Robert Kephart shall personally appear before this court on 8/9/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 32 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants Comedy stop and Robert Kephart in the amount of $49,531.20. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying as Moot 28 Motion to Enlarge Time for Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/25/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Tropicana LV. 4m Proof of Service due by 10/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hotel Employees and Restaurant Employees International Union Welfare Fund et al v. Kephart & Corti Productions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?