Mine O'Mine, Inc. v. Calmese et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mine O'Mine, Inc.
Defendant: Dan Mortensen and True Fan Logo, Inc.
:
Counter Defendant: Mine O'Mine, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00043
Filed: January 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2012 Filing 107 NOTICE of Payment by Defendant Michael D Calmese. (A check was NOT included with this filing). (MMM)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER on Mandate as to 104 USCA Order Dismissing 101 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael D Calmese. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/3/12. (ASB)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to 83 101 Notices of Appeal. Appellants unopposed motion to consolidate appeal Nos. 11-17972 and 12-15915 is granted. Appeal Nos. 11-17972 and 12-15915 are consolidated. To the extent appellants motion to consolidate also seeks to consolidate appeal Nos. 11-35053, 12-15537 and 12-15915, the motion is denied. Appeal No. 12-15537 is dismissed as duplicative of pending appeal No. 11-17972. Briefing in appeal No. 11-17912 is complete. The previously established briefing schedule in appeal No. 12-15915 remains in effect. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal No. 12-15537. (ECS)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER for Time Schedule as to 101 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael D Calmese. USCA Case Number 12-15915. (ASB)
April 20, 2012 Filing 102 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for 101 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (MMM)
April 19, 2012 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 99 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, by Defendant Michael D Calmese. Filing fee $ 455.00 (NOT paid). E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (MMM)
April 16, 2012 Filing 100 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiff Mine O'Mine, Inc. against Defendants Michael D Calmese, True Fan Logo, Inc.. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 4/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 72 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Mine O'Mine is awarded costs and fees in the amount of $47,873.51. FURTHER ORDERED that 73 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER for Time Schedule as to 83 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael D Calmese. USCA Case Number 12-15537. (ASB)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER of USCA, Federal Circuit, as to 83 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael D Calmese, Transferring the appeal to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (MMM)
December 30, 2011 Filing 96 USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number NVLAS008402 re 83 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael D Calmese. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (EDS)
December 30, 2011 Filing 95 NOTICE of Check Forwarding by US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (EDS)
December 15, 2011 Filing 94 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit re 83 Notice of Appeal. (EDS)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER for Time Schedule as to 83 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael D Calmese. USCA Case Number 11-17972. (ECS)
December 15, 2011 Filing 92 Misstatement of Transmittal re 85 Transmittal to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re 83 Notice of Appeal. cc: US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit; US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit; Michael J. McCue, Jennifer K. Craft; Michael D. Calmese. (EDS)
December 12, 2011 Filing 91 Appeal Remark re 83 Notice of Appeal forwarded to Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals : (SLR)
December 5, 2011 Filing 90 TRANSMITTAL RETURN of Notice of Appeal from USCA re 83 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 2012-1084. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of docketing)(SLR)
November 30, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of the First Notice of Appeal by Defendant Michael D Calmese. (SLR)
November 23, 2011 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Notice of Appeal at the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals on 11/16/11 by Defendant Michael D Calmese. (ECS)
November 23, 2011 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Notice of Appeal at the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals on 11/9/11 by Defendant Michael D Calmese. (ECS)
November 23, 2011 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs ; filed by Plaintiff Mine O'Mine, Inc.. (McCue, Michael)
November 17, 2011 Filing 85 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re 83 Notice of Appeal. (ECS)
November 17, 2011 Filing 84 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for 83 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (SLR)
November 16, 2011 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 71 Judgment by Defendant Michael D Calmese. Notice sent to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. (SLR)
November 16, 2011 Filing 82 AMENDED DECLARATION of Michael D. Calmese of 79 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Michael D Calmese. (SLR)
November 14, 2011 Filing 81 RESPONSE to 73 MOTION to Seal 72 filed by Defendant Michael D Calmese. Replies due by 11/24/2011. (SLR)
November 14, 2011 Filing 80 DECLARATION of Michael D. Calmese In Support of 79 Response to Motion by Defendant Michael D Calmese. (SLR)
November 9, 2011 Filing 79 RESPONSE to 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, filed by Defendant Michael D Calmese. Replies due by 11/19/2011. (SLR)
November 7, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Mine O'Mine, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. McCue, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael J. McCue, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael J. McCue, # 4 Declaration of Jennifer K. Craft, # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jennifer K. Craft, # 6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jennifer K. Craft)(McCue, Michael)
November 7, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 73 MOTION to Seal 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs MOTION to Seal 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Mine O'Mine, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached). (McCue, Michael)
November 4, 2011 Filing 73 MOTION to Seal 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Mine O'Mine, Inc.. Motion ripe 11/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. McCue, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael J. McCue, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Michael J. McCue, # 4 Declaration of Jennifer K. Craft, # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jennifer K. Craft, # 6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jennifer K. Craft)(McCue, Michael) Corrected image 76 added on 11/8/2011 (RFJ).
November 4, 2011 Filing 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Plaintiff Mine O'Mine, Inc.. Responses due by 11/21/2011. (McCue, Michael) Corrected image 77 added on 11/8/2011 (RFJ).
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 67 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/21/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Granting in part and Denying in part 58 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying 59 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying 49 Motion to Compel; Denying 55 Motion for Default Judgment; and Denying 57 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/10/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER Denying 37 Motion to Compel and Granting 39 Motion to Compel. Discovery due by 11/19/2010. Motions due by 12/20/2010. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/19/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 26 MOTION to Extend Time by 7 Days to Serve Objections and Responses to Defendant's Discovery Request and Denying 27 MOTION to Compel. Plaintiffs will have until 4:00pm on 8/24/2010 to serve responses to Defendant's discovery requests and interrogatories. Status and Dispute Resolution Conference set for 9/13/2010 @ 01:45 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying 9 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/22/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mine O'Mine, Inc. v. Calmese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Mine O'Mine, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ko Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mine O'Mine, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ko Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Mortensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Fan Logo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?