Leahy et al v. Lone Mountain Aviation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hannah Joy Leahy, Rebecca Susan Leahy, Susie Leahy and William John Leahy, III
Defendant: Lone Mountain Aviation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00082
Filed: January 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Denying 68 , 69 , 70 , 71 , 72 , and 73 Motions in Limine. Granting as unopposed 74 , 75 , 76 , and 78 Motions in Limine. Granting 77 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying 51 Motion in Limine and 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a Joint Pretrial Order within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions. Motions due by 2/6/2012. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Unopposed Motion Regarding Recovery of Fire Damaged Engine and Frame Log Books. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leahy et al v. Lone Mountain Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Joy Leahy
Represented By: Patrick E. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Susan Leahy
Represented By: Patrick E. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Leahy
Represented By: Patrick E. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William John Leahy, III
Represented By: Patrick E. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Mountain Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: J. Mitchell Cobeaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?