Amtrust Bank et al v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Amtrust Bank, Iota Cinnamon, LLC, Iota Coral, LLC, Iota Jade, LLC, Iota Red, LLC, Iota Royal, LLC and Iota Violet, LLC
Defendant: Alpha Vista, LLC, Bartlett Sunrise, LLC, Corrales Peters, LLC, Cottongin, LLC, HH INV, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, Jonah LLC, Rex H. Lewis, Mesa Verde, Inc., Midway Cornman, LLC, Omega Vista, LLC, Pebble Cimarron LLC and Regena Teepee, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv00439
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER Granting 336 Stipulation to Dismiss. The Appointment of Receiver of James H. Donnell is terminated. All pending claims, actions and orders remaining in this case are dismissed and vacated. Each party shall bear it's own fees and costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER Granting 329 Proposed Order re Initial Report and Petition for Further Instructions of Receiver James H. Donell. On or before 7/11/2018 the Receiver shall file a second report with this Court summarizing his efforts and presenting any additional recommendations regarding the pendency and administration of the receivership and the Receivership Entities. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 261 the Renewed Motion for an Order Holding Judgment Debtor Lewis in Contempt is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 293 the Objection to the Order to Show Cause is DENIED AND OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tha t 299 the Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Rex H. Lewis shall appear before this Court on 5/7/18, at 11:00 a.m. for a status conference. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER that the parties shall appear for a hearing on Monday, March 19, 2018, at 11:00 am, in courtroom 6A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part the Woman US Entities' 270 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER Granting 279 Stipulation to Reschedule Hearings re 261 , 265 , and 270 Motions. Evidentiary Hearing rescheduled for 10/16/2017 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER re 265 Renewed Motion to Appoint Receiver and 270 Motion to Intervene. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER re 261 Motion for an Order Holding Judgment Debtor Rex Lewis in Contempt. Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The parties must prepare a Joint Pre-Hearing Order by 8/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER Granting 273 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 270 MOTION to Intervene . Responses due by 8/17/2017. Replies due by 8/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER Granting 268 Stipulation to Extend re 265 Second MOTION to Appoint Receiver in Aid of Execution. (Responses due by 7/27/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER that judgment creditors' 249 Motion for Contempt is Denied and that judgment creditors' 250 Motion to Modify Injunction is Denied. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER that Judgment Creditors' 233 Motion for Contempt is DENIED with leave to refile pending a decision by the Ninth Circuit and Judgment Creditors' 234 Motion to Modify Injunction is DENIED with leave to refile pending a decision by the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER that a hearing on the Judgment Creditors' 232 Motion to Amend Protective Order is scheduled for 2/23/2017 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER Denying Judgment Creditor's 177 Motion for a Mandatory Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER that 217 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and 218 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER that 215 the Iota Entities Motion to Consolidate is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Five Springs LLCs 216 Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Retraining Wrongful Foreclosure is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to Intervenor Five Springs' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Restraining Wrongful Foreclosure 216 must be filed on or before Friday, 12/18/15. No reply necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER that 204 Motion to Quash a Writ of Execution is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Denying Judgement Creditors' 178 Motion to Appoint Receiver, Denying Judgment Creditors' 181 Motion for an Order Holding Rex Lewis in Contempt, and Denying Lewis' 184 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Granting 189 Stipulation to Extend time to respond and reply to renewed 181 motion, response now due 9/21/15 and reply now due 10/12/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER that Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's 146 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety. Judgment Debtor's 125 Motion for Relief From Judgment and 89 Motion to Withdraw Funds from his IRA are Denied. Judgment Cred itor's 108 Motion to Declare Judgment Debtor's Residence Subject to Execution is Granted. FURTHER ORDERED that judgment debtor is sanctioned under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(b)(2)(A)(i)-(ii) and prohibited from attempting to de monstrate that his homestead or dwelling is exempt from execution under Nevada law. Judgment Creditor's 167 Motion to Strike is Granted. Judgment Debtor's 164 Reply is STRICKEN from the record and Judgment Debtor's 169 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief is Denied. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Granting 158 Motion to Waive Appearance or, in the Alternative, to Appear Telephonically at the Status Conference on 7/9/2015 at 3:30 p.m. The call must be made five minutes prior to the hearing time and on a land line. The court will join the call and convene the proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re 125 Motion for Relief from 55 Judgment and 59 Amended Judgment. Responses due by 4/30/2015. Replies due by 5/11/2015. The hearing scheduled for 9:00 a.m., 4/28/2015 is vacated and rescheduled to 10:00 a.m., 5/19/2015 in courtr oom 3D. Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2015 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach re 89 , 90 , [91[, 100 , 108 , 110 , 125 , and 127 Motions. Rex H. Lewis shall appear personally at 10:00 a.m.,5/19/2015 in courtroom 3D for the hearing on the Judgment Creditors' 91 Motion to Hold Judgment Debtor Rex Lewis in Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER re 127 Counter Motion for Protective Order. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2015 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Responses due by 4/21/2015. Replies due by 4/27/2015. Rex H. Lewis shall appear personally at 9:00 a.m. on 4/28/2015 in Courtroom 3D for the hearing on the Judgment Creditors' 91 Motion to Hold Judgment Debtor Rex Lewis in Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re 120 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Declare Documents Produced by Michael W. Kern Discoverable Under Seal. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2015 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/24/2015 Granting 115 Joint Motion to Reschedule Hearing on Pending Motions. The hearing scheduled for 4/30/2015 is Vacated and the following Motions are rescheduled to 9:00 am on 4/28/2015 in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach: 89 MOTION by Judgment Debtor Rex H. Lewis for Permission to Withdraw Funds from IRA Account to Pay Legal Fees; 90 MOTION to Require Rule 26(g) Certification; 91 MOTION To Hold Judgment Debtor Rex Lewis in Contempt; 92 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum to Accurate Strategy, LLC; 96 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum to Accurate Strategy, LLC; and 100 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Declare Documents Produced by Michael W. Kern Discoverable. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting Iota Violet, LLC's 81 Motion to Compel. Lewis must provide substantive answers, responsive documents, and a Rule 26(g) certification in response to Iota Violet's discovery request by 1/16/2015. Iota Violet, LLC's re quest for joint and severable attorney's fees against Lewis and his counsel is Denied without prejudice. Rex H. Lewis' 84 Motion to Limit the Scope of his Judgment Debtor Exam is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 76 Motion to Strike 70 Stipulated Order or in the Alternative Motion Seeking Relief from Said Order Relative to Waiver of Objections. The words "without objection" are stricken from the 70 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Rex H. Lewis to Respond to Judgment Creditors' Discovery Requests and to Continue Judgment Debtor Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Rex H. Lewis's 71 Motion to Dissolve Order Enjoining Lewis from Transferring Assets or Alternatively for Permission to Withdraw Funds. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 60 Ex Parte Motion Permitting Judgment Creditors to Serve Additional Interrogatories and to Examine Judgment Debtor Rex H. Lewis. Judgment debtor Rex H. Lewis shall appear at the offices of BALLARD SPAHR LLP located at 100 North City Parkway, Suite 1750, Las Vegas, Nevada on August 6, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT in favor of Recoveredge L.P. and against Jonah LLC, Omega Vista, LLC, Rex H. Lewis. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting FDIC's 43 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Plaintiff RecoverEdge L.P.'s 45 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted and Plaintiff RecoverEdge L.P.'s 46 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. Plaintiff RecoverEdge L.P. shall submit an appropriate judgment consistent with this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Substitute Recoveredge, L.P.s as the Real Party in Interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting 34 Motion to Dismiss. Granting 36 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/27/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amtrust Bank et al v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Vista, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartlett Sunrise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrales Peters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottongin, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HH INV, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonah LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex H. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Verde, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midway Cornman, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Vista, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pebble Cimarron LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regena Teepee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amtrust Bank
Represented By: Eleissa C Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iota Cinnamon, LLC
Represented By: Eleissa C Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iota Coral, LLC
Represented By: Eleissa C Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iota Jade, LLC
Represented By: Eleissa C Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iota Red, LLC
Represented By: Eleissa C Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iota Royal, LLC
Represented By: Eleissa C Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iota Violet, LLC
Represented By: Eleissa C Lavelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?