Ultra Internet Media, S.A. v. Harrah's License Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Ultra Internet Media, S.A.
:
Case Number: 2:2010cv00455
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Granting 193 Motion to Exceed Page Limit Pursuant and Granting 198 Motion to Strike or File a Surreply. Movants shall file a surreply in response to GigaMedia's reply in support of the motion for partial summary judgment forthwith.. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Granting 177 Motion to Seal 176 Reply to Response to Motion. Clerk shall seal reply. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DENYING 104 Ultra Internet Media's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Affiliation; DENYING 107 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Harrah's Representations of Control; and GRANTING 109 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Full Tilt Poker as Everest's Competitor. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Denying 118 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Response to Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER that the parties shall file a joint Interim Discovery Status Report on March 7, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 2/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant GigaMedia's 94 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATED ORDER extending deadlines. Responses due by 1/4/2011 and Replies due by 1/25/2011 re 104 107 109 MOTIONS for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Denying [#6 in 2:10-cv-607-KJD-LRL] UIM's Motion to Dismiss Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/30/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER that HLC's Motion to Dismiss 38 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 57 Motion for Alternative Service of Process On Counter-Defendant GigaMedia Limited Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/8/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting defendant's 40 Motion to Strike plaintiff's demand for a jury trial. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/7/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING 2 UMI's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/13/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ultra Internet Media, S.A. v. Harrah's License Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Harrah's License Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultra Internet Media, S.A.
Represented By: David T. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?