A/P Hotel, LLC v. Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A/P Hotel, LLC
Defendant: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Woodlands Commercial Bank
Case Number: 2:2010cv00720
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 100 Application for Allowance of Fees and Costs or Receiver and Receiver's Counsel for the period 1/17/11 through 3/16/11. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 3/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDERED that 98 Joint Motion to Stay the Case or, in the alternative, to Extend Discovery Deadlines Pending Closing of Settlement is granted as follows: Expert Disclosure deadline is extended until 4/4/11; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadlin e is extended until 5/2/11; Close of Discovery is extended until 5/23/2011; and Dispositive Motion Deadline is extended until 6/20/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDERED that the Application is approved in its entirety; FURTHER ORDERED that the Receiver shall make payment to himself in the amount of $10,000 for fees and $0.00 for costs for a total payment to Receiver of $10,000; FURTHER ORDERE D that the Receiver shall make payment to his counsel in the amount of $2,987.50 for fees and $14.00 for costs for a total payment to Receiver's counsel in the amount of $3,001.50. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 2/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting 69 Motion for Allowance of Fees and Costs of Receiver and Receiver's Counsel for the period 9/17/10 through 11/16/10. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 1/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Dismiss as to Woodlands Commercial Bank. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 12/8/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 62 Motion for Allowance of Fees and Costs of Receiver and Receiver's Counsel for the Period July 17, 2010 Through September 16, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 12/3/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that the Application 50 is approved in its entirety. As soon as possible, the Receiver shall make a payment to himself in the amount of $10,000 for fees and $0.00 for costs for a total payment to Receiver of $10,000. As soon as possible, the Receiver shall make payment to his counsel in the amount of $2,515 for fees and $31.03 for costs for a total payment to Receiver's counsel in the amount of $2,546.03. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 11/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 50 Motion for Allowance of Fees and Costs of Receiver and Receiver's Counsel for the Period March 17, 2010 Through May 16, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 41 Motion for Allowance of Fees and Costs of Receiver and Receiver's Counsel for the Period March 17, 2010 through May 16, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER for the Filing of a Joint Interim Discovery Status Report due by 10/25/2010, 12/27/2010, and 2/24/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A/P Hotel, LLC v. Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A/P Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Jon T Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodlands Commercial Bank
Represented By: Andrew P Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?