Rader v. Teva Parenteral Medicine, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Rader
Defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Quality Care Consultants, LLC, Sicor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sicor, Inc. and Teva Parenteral Medicine, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00818
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Denying 26 MOTION to Certify Class ACTION PER FED.R.CIV.P. 23 filed by Charles Rader. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 41 Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/20/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 54 STIPULATION to extend deadline. Deadline for the Product Defendants to complete class certification discovery and to file their opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class 26 is extended to 5/2/2011. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that defendants Teva Parenteral Medicine, Inc., Sicor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sicor, Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, and McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.s emergency motion to stay proceedings 49 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/3/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt for reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/6/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/27/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Seal Exhibit A of 16 Response to Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/18/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rader v. Teva Parenteral Medicine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: James R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Care Consultants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sicor Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sicor, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Parenteral Medicine, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rader
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?