Righthaven LLC v. EMTCity.com et al
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: EMTCity.com and Christopher J. Malley
Case Number: 2:2010cv00854
Filed: June 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Anne Pieroni as counsel of record for Righthaven. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Defendant EMTCity.com shall file its Certificate as to Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 4:00 p.m., April 18, 2011. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 22 Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Defendants Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference 12 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties shall conduct a Rule 26(f) conference for the purpose of discussing and scheduling the limited discovery directed by the district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/26/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. EMTCity.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMTCity.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?