Allen v. Clark County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Allen
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center, Cornelius, County of Clark, Las Vegas, Nevada, Department of Social Services, Clark County, Doug Gillespie, McGrorey, Naphcare, Rebecca Newman, Norma and Russo
Case Number: 2:2010cv00857
Filed: June 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER Denying 321 Motion to Reopen Aformentioned Civil Rights Case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 319 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendants Nevada Department of Corrections (NDOC), James Greg Cox, Jack Palmer, Brian Williams, Dr. Romeo Aranas, and Dr. David Mar with prejudice. Each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 01/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 286 Defendants Nevada Department of Corrections, Board of Prison Commissioners, Brian Sandoval, Catherine Cortez-Masto, Ross Miller, James Cox, Jack Palmer, Brian Williams, Romeo Aranas, and David Mar 9;s Motion to Dismiss. The following claims remain: Eighth Amendment Deliberate Indifference against Cox, Palmer, Williams, Aranas, and Mar in their official capacities for injunctive relief, and against Aranas and Mar in their individual capacities. Eighth Amendment policies, procedures, and customs against Cox, Palmer, Williams, Aranas, and Mar in their official capacities for injunctive relief, and against Aranas and Mar in their individual capacities. Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress against Aranas and Mar in their individual capacities. All other Defendants and claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 7/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER Granting 297 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Depose an Incarcerated Individual. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/1/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER Granting 259 Motion for Correction of Court's Order and Nunc Pro Tunc Correction of 258 Order. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 2/7/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Denying 101 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 8/30/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Affirming 141 Order Appointing Counsel for Plaintiff in this action only and Overruling 148 Objection. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 8/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Granting 127 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Civil Rights Complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 7/5/2011 to file a motion to amend his complaint. Denying without Prejudice 129 Motion Reasserting Need to Have Court Order that Nevada Department of Corrections Restore Plaintiff's Copy Privileges. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/23/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Confidentiality of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/19/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting 105 and 113 Motions for a Copy of Proposed Amended Complaint, Granting in Part 119 Motion to Request Court to Order that Plaintiff Be Allowed to Make Copies of Legal Work at Southern Desert Correctional Center or Any Other Nevada Department of Corrections Facility and Denying as Moot 120 Motion to Stay. Copy of 57 mailed to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/10/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 AMENDED. ORDER Plaintiffs Motion to Delay Response to all Defendants Motions 106 and Motion to Postpone Defendants Deposition 107 are granted. This action is stayed pending resolution of Plaintiffs Interlocutory Appeal to the Ninth Circuit. All deadlines are stayed, including Plaintiffs deadline to file an amended complaint, discovery deadlines and briefing deadlines for pending motions. Once the Ninth Circuit has ruled on Plaintiffs appeal, the Court will issue a new briefing schedule and new deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting 106 Plaintiff's Motion to Delay Response to all Defendants' Motions and 107 Plaintiff's Motion to Postpose Defendants' Deposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the taking of Plaintiff's deposition, all discovery deadlines and pending motions are STAYED pending the resolution of Plaintiff's appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/10/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for leave to file his amended complaint and request for copies (#92) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 1/27/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motions to Reorder Summons or Extend the Time to Perfect Service 30 41 42 are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion to Court Order Clark County Detention Center to Give Plaintiff Physical Access to Legal Library 29 , Motion to Court Order Clark County Detention Center to Give Plaintiff Physical Access to Legal Library 39 , and Plain tiffs Motion to Amend Plaintiffs Previous Motion to Order Facility to Give Plaintiff Physical Access to Law Library 54 are denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motions for Preliminary Injunction 4 10 73 are DENIED. Plaintiffs Motions for Summary Judgment 23 24 25 26 27 28 are DENIED as moot. Defendants Motion to Dismiss 20 and Renewed Motion to Dismiss 66 are GRANTED. T he following defendants are therefore dismissed from this case: Kite Nurse Cornelius, Dr. McGrorey, Rebecca Newman, Nurse Norma, and Dr. Russo. The CCDC and Sheriff Gillespies Motion to Dismiss 47 is GRANTED. The CCDC and Gillespie are therefore di smissed from this case. Plaintiff is given leave to file a motion to amend, with a proposed amended complaint attached, no later than four (4) weeks from the date of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 1/20/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Striking 31 and 40 Motions to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 12/7/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that plaintiffs 5 motion for transcripts is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs 6 motion to court order Clark County Detention Center to allow plaintiff to obtain envelopes addressed to defendants is GRANTED .IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs 2 motion for a leave of court permission to file a longer complaint is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 9/7/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the CCDC Accounting Supervisor, 330 S. Casino Center Blvd., Las Vegas, NV 89101.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, even if this actio n is dismissed, or is otherwiseunsuccessful, the full filing fee shall still be due, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915, as amended by the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act of 1996. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall detach and FILE theco mplaint. (Docket #[1-1]). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Nancy McLane is DISMISSED from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims of deliberate indifference to his serious medical needs against all remaining defendants may pro ceed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Count 10 is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons (See Order for Details) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 3 Motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 8/2/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Order to CCDC Accounting Supervisor, Order, Complaint and Summons to USMS, Order, Complaint, Summons and USM 285s to Plaintiff - SD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Clark County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Clark, Las Vegas, Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Social Services, Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGrorey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?