Keohokalole v. Williams et al
Petitioner: |
Charles Keohokalole |
Respondent: |
Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Williams |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv00859 |
Filed: |
June 4, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Kent J. Dawson |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 17, 2013 |
Filing
31
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that the 8 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
July 19, 2011 |
Filing
27
ORDER that both motions to extend time 24 26 are GRANTED. Respondents answer filed June 20, 2011, will be considered timely filed. Petitioner is granted to and including October 17, 2011, to file a response to the petition. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
May 17, 2011 |
Filing
23
ORDER Granting with prejudice 13 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall file an answer to the petition within 30 days from the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner may file his repl y to the answer no later than 30 days after being served the answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 22 Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
January 14, 2011 |
Filing
18
ORDER Granting 12 Motion for Leave to File Late Pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Motion to Time Bar Respondents and Grant Habeas Corpus is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall file his response to 13 MOTION to Dismiss by 1/28/2011. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
November 3, 2010 |
Filing
10
ORDER that the Clerk shall reopen this case.Denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Granting 7 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall go forward on 8 Petitioners First Amended Petition, f iled August 13, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the 8 Petitioners First Amended Petition, upon respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have forty-five (45) days from entry of this order within which to answer, or otherwise respond to, the petition. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/3/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: NEF Regenerated for 8 - SD)
|
July 19, 2010 |
Filing
4
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. ORDER that this petition for writ of habeas corpus isDISMISSED without prejudice to petitioners right to file a new petition after he has exhausted his state court remedies. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this case. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?