Miller v. Skogg et al
Plaintiff: |
Jean Kilat Miller |
Defendant: |
David Applegate, Linda Cervin, Kevin McCarthy, Rick W. Skogg, Diana M. Steiner and Shane Watson |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv01121 |
Filed: |
July 8, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Kent J. Dawson |
Presiding Judge: |
Lawrence R. Leavitt |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1345 Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 21, 2011 |
Filing
65
ORDER that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint 33 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/21/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing
63
ORDER that Defendants Diana M. Steiner and Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc.s Motion to Quash Service and Motion for Order Prohibiting Plaintiff from Filing Any Additional Documents Concerning this Defendant 55 , Defendants David Applegate, GMAC Mortgage , LLCs Joinder 57 and Defendants Rick W. Skogg, Aurora Loan Services, Linda Cervin and MERS, Inc.s Joinder 58 are granted in part and denied in part. Service of process is quashed as to Defendants Diana M. Steiner, Ticor Title of Nevada, Inc., Da vid Applegate, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Linda Cervin and MERS, Inc. Rick W. Skoggs and Aurora Loan Services request to quash service 58 is denied. Defendants motion to prohibit plaintiff from filing any additional documents 55 and joinders thereto 57 58 are denied. Foley, Jr on 5/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
March 4, 2011 |
Filing
44
ORDER that Plaintiffs Motions for Temporary Restraining Order 35 41 are DENIED. Plaintiffs Motions for Preliminary Injunction 36 42 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
February 3, 2011 |
Filing
28
ORDER that Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 8 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed as to Defendants David Applegate (GMAC), Kevin McCarthy (Quality Loan Service Corporations), Linda Cervin (MERS), and Diana M. Steiner (Ticor Title of Nevada Inc. And GMAC Mortgage, LLC). Plaintiffs Motions to Amend/Correct Complaint 13 15 are DENIED. Defendants Motion to Dismiss 5 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/3/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
January 26, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER Granting 25 Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Zachary Ball added and attorney Ronald L Warren terminated as to Diana M. Steiner. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?