In re: Novicelli
Appellant: Richard Peter Novicelli
Trustee: William A. Leonard
Interested Party: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2010cv01150
Filed: July 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 28 Notice of Pending Negotiations and Offer of Judgment, filed by Richard Peter Novicelli, construed by the Court as a Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. The parties shall file notice of voluntary dismissal, a stipulation to dis miss, or joint status report no later than 6/17/11. If the action has not been dismissed, Plaintiff shall file his opening brief no later than 6/20/11. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Ex Parte Motion for Enlargement of Time. Opening brief due no later than 4/18/2011. No further extension shall be granted. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying 7 Motion for Stay of Enforcement and Execution Pending Appeal from Order Terminating Automatic Stay. FURTHER ORDERED that Appellant file his opening brief no later than 12:00 p.m., March 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/21/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Novicelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard Peter Novicelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: William A. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee (Las Vegas)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?