Clemons v. Hayes et al
Plaintiff: De'Marian Clemons
Defendant: Elizabeth L. Acevedo, Dr. Gable, M.D. Robert Clinton Hayes, Naphcare and Rhuyoa
Case Number: 2:2010cv01163
Filed: July 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER that 45 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying 38 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying as moot 23 Motion for General Traverse. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/25/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting in part 31 Motion to Stay and Denying 33 Motion to Strike. The Hearing that is scheduled for 5/27/2011 at 9:30 a.m. is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/26/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying 9 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Motion for Copy of Complaint and 12 Motion to Receive Free Copies are Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for the Issuance of Summons. Clerk shall issue sommons. 4 blank USM-285 forms mailed to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/24/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk shall file the Complaint. Status Report re: Acceptance of Service due by 11/18/2010. Answer to complaint due 30 days after the notice of acceptance of service. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/27/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. Hayes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth L. Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Robert Clinton Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhuyoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De'Marian Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?