Righthaven LLC v. Free Republic, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Free Republic, LLC, James C. Robinson and John Robinson
Case Number: 2:2010cv01194
Filed: July 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2010 Filing 12 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 order) (EDS)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 10 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 10/20/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 19, 2010 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Coons, John)
July 27, 2010 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC re 8 Summons Returned Executed, 1 Complaint, 5 Amended Complaint,. John Robinson served on 7/26/2010, answer due 8/16/2010. (Coons, John)
July 27, 2010 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC re 6 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, 5 Amended Complaint,. Free Republic, LLC served on 7/26/2010, answer due 8/16/2010. (Coons, John)
July 23, 2010 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
July 22, 2010 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Free Republic, LLC. and John Robinson re 5 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued as to John Robinson)(EDS)
July 21, 2010 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Free Republic, LLC, James C. Robinson, John Robinson, filed by Righthaven LLC. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 11/18/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(Coons, John)
July 20, 2010 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 complaint) (EDS)
July 20, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Free Republic, LLC. (EDS)
July 19, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS)
July 19, 2010 Case assigned to Judge Lloyd D. George and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (EDS)
July 19, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Righthaven LLC (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1679627), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/29/2010. Proof of service due by 11/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Free Republic, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Free Republic, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: John Charles Coons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?