Righthaven LLC v. Angle Featured Case

Plaintiff Righthaven LLC alleged that Defendant Sharron Angle copied, on an unauthorized basis, two articles - "It's the jobs, stupid" and "Angle: Reid's clout misguided" - from the Las Vegas Review-Journal and displayed them on the sharronangle.com website.

Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Sharron Angle
Case Number: 2:2010cv01511
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2010 Filing 11 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 order) (EDS)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 9 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 11/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 16, 2010 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Coons, John)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Sharron Angle answer due 10/25/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 10/14/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 8, 2010 Filing 7 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Sharron Angle. (Byrne, Patrick)
October 6, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC re 1 Complaint, 3 Summons Issued. Sharron Angle served on 9/11/2010, answer due 10/2/2010. (Coons, John)
September 17, 2010 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
September 7, 2010 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 complaint) (EDS)
September 7, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sharron Angle. (EDS)
September 3, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS)
September 3, 2010 Case assigned to Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (EDS)
September 3, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sharron Angle (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1727004), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/13/2010. Proof of service due by 1/1/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Angle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharron Angle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: John Charles Coons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?