Righthaven LLC v. Rawlings et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Richard J. Rawlings and United States Marijuana Party
Case Number: 2:2010cv01527
Filed: September 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Anne Pieroni. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 6, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with Certificate of Service by Anne Pieroni. by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 4/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Pieroni, Anne)
April 6, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shawn A. Mangano on behalf of Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. with Certificate of Service (Mangano, Shawn)
March 14, 2011 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT re Notice of Settlement with Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Pieroni, Anne)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Defendants shall have a period of 10 calendar days from the filing date of this order within which to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/10/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 15, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne Pieroni on behalf of Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. with Certificate of Service (Pieroni, Anne)
February 15, 2011 Filing 14 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/25/2011. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/1/2011.(Bowers, Chad)
January 7, 2011 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt, on 1/7/2011. To properly distribute the case load for the magistrate judges in the District of Nevada, IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge George W. Foley, Jr., U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings consistent with his jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:10-cv-01527-JCM-GWF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Fritz Clapp for Richard J. Rawlings,Fritz Clapp for United States Marijuana Party and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/4/2010. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
November 1, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 7 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Fritz Clapp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1766600) filed by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Fritz Clapp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1766600) filed by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Bowers, Chad)
October 21, 2010 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 10/21/2010. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 7 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Fritz Clapp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1766600) filed by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Fritz Clapp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1766600) filed by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party, 9 Notice of Corrected Image/Document,, IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Fritz Clapp defendant's counsel is directed to correct page 4 (Designation of Nevada counsel not out of state counsel needs to be named) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#7) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Clapp's Verified Petition.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
October 18, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 7 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Fritz Clapp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1766600) filed by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Fritz Clapp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1766600) filed by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Bowers, Chad)
October 15, 2010 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 10/15/2010. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. RE: 7 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Fritz Clapp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1766600) filed by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Fritz Clapp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1766600) filed by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party IT IS THE ORDER OF THE COURT that Fritz Clapp defendant's counsel is directed to correct question 9 (no line can be left blank) in petitioner's Verified Petition (#7) within (14) days of the entry of this order and re-file using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event in CM/ECF. Petitioner's failure to take such corrective measures will result in the denial of Mr. Clapp's Verified Petition.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
October 15, 2010 Filing 7 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Fritz Clapp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Chad Bowers (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1766600) filed by Defendants Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party. Motion ripe 10/15/2010. (Bowers, Chad) 9 Corrected image filed on 10/19/2010. (MJZ) Corrected image 11 added on 11/1/2010 (RFJ).
October 6, 2010 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint,. Richard J. Rawlings served on 9/12/2010, answer due 10/3/2010. (Coons, John)
September 29, 2010 Filing 5 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (SD)
September 17, 2010 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
September 9, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Richard J. Rawlings re 1 Complaint. (SD)
September 9, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (SD)
September 8, 2010 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt. (SD)
September 8, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard J. Rawlings, United States Marijuana Party (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1731057), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/18/2010. Proof of service due by 1/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Rawlings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Rawlings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marijuana Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?