Righthaven LLC v. PAHRUMP LIFE et al

Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: PAHRUMP LIFE, MAREN SCACCIA and MICHAEL SCACCIA
Case Number: 2:2010cv01575
Filed: September 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that the Court's dismissal of plaintiff Righthaven LLC for lack of standing is a dismissal on the merits. Accordingly, the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/22/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that parties submit by 8/30/11 further briefing re 64 Proposed Order Submission Dismissing Righthaven's Complaint and Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that opposition to 45 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint due 7/5/2011. Reply due by 7/11/2011. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2011 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that hearing on 21 Order to Show Cause is VACATED and RESET for 7/27/11 at 10:00 in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/27/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 39 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to File an Omnibus Response to 36 Amicus Curiae Brief. Response due by 6/22/2011. Reply due by 6/27/2011. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 23 Amicus' Motion for Leave to Appear and Granting 24 Amicus' Motion for Leave to File and Amicus Brief. IT IS FURTHER ODERED that the hearing set for 5/12/11 at 10:30am is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 6/6/2011 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/11/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 4/28/2011. By Deputy Clerk: David Oakes. denying 12 Motion for Summary Judgment.; ( Show Cause Hearing set for 5/12/2011 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. PAHRUMP LIFE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAHRUMP LIFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREN SCACCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL SCACCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?