Minshew v. Donley et al
Plaintiff: Mary Maureen Minshew
Defendant: Alpha-Omega Change Engineering, Kurt Bergo, Michael B. Donley, George Salton and Secretary of the Air Force
Case Number: 2:2010cv01593
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Granting 196 Joint Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear their respective attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 01/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER that the parties shall submit their stipulation to dismiss no later than December 20, 2013, or alternatively a Joint Status Report advising when settlement proceeds will be delivered and the stipulation filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER that 176 Motion to Submit Exhibits Under Seal is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 180 Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal Docket Nos. 114, 118-21, 130-31, 136, 138-41, 144, 146-47, 151, 154, and 159-64. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file redacted versions of Docket Nos. 115, 148, and 149, including all exhibits, consistent with the above rulings on or before April 5, 2013. The redacted filings will not be filed under seal. F URTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file redacted versions of Docket Nos. 142 and 155, including all exhibits, consistent with the above rulings on or before April 5, 2013. The redacted filings will not be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER that 114 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 118 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is hereby granted in favor of Defendant Alpha-Omega Change Engineering and against Plaintiff Mary Maur een Minshew. FURTHER ORDERED that 138 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendants Kurt Bergo and George Salton and against Plaintiff Mary Maureen Minshew. FURTHER ORDERED that 140 Motion for S ummary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is granted to the extent that the Court hereby dismisses count four of Plaintiff Mary Maureen Minshews Amended Complaint for lack of jurisdiction. The Motion is denied in all other res pects. FURTHER ORDERED that the following motions are GRANTED: 137 Motion to File Under Seal Summary Judgment Briefs; 143 Motion to File Reply Under Seal; 145 Motion to Submit Reply Under Seal; 150 Motion to Submit Combined Reply Unde r Seal; 152 Motion to Submit Erratum Under Seal; 153 Motion to File Under Seal Reply Memorandum. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall show cause, in writing no later than January 18, 2013, why each of the sealed filings at Docket Nos. 1 14-15, 118-21, 130-31, 136, 138-42, 144, 146-49, 151, 154-55, and 159-64 should not be unsealed. If the parties fail to show cause, the sealed filings at Docket Nos. 114-15, 118-21, 130-31, 136, 138-42, 144, 146-49, 151, 154-55, and 159-64 will be un sealed. A party seeking to seal only portions of a document shall provide a proposed redacted copy of the document.FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining parties shall file a proposed joint pretrial order on or before December 21, 2012. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER that Defendant Alpha Omega Change Engineering, Inc's request to substitute Brian L. Bradford in place and stead of Carleton R. Burch 156 is GRANTED, subject to the provisions of LR IA 10-6(c) and (d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting 117 Motion to Seal 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment and respective Declarations and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/15/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting 111 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions. Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 106 Motion to Seal 104 Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Denying as moot 77 MOTION to Stay. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2011 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/28/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting in Part 61 Proposed Consent Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying 46 Motion to Dismiss Bivens Claim. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 47 Request to Excuse Colonel Jurt Bergo from Attending ENE scheduled for 1/28/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minshew v. Donley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha-Omega Change Engineering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Bergo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Donley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Salton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Maureen Minshew
Represented By: Kelly R. Dahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?