Dixon v. Bannister et al
Plaintiff: Fredric Dixon
Defendant: Robert Bannister, Nevada Department Of Corrections, Howard Skolnik and State Of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2010cv01714
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Remove Kara L. Krause from CM/ECF Notifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying 29 Motion for Clarification of the Courts Screening Order and Request for Leave to File a Subsequent Motion for Summary Judgment With Respect to Any Remaining Claims. Plaintiffs state law claims are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to pursue those claims in state court. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/31/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 31 Motion to Stay All Further Proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall send a copy of Order 28 to the Plaintiff along with a copy of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that a response, if any, by the Plaintiff to Defendants' Motion for Clarification 29 must be filed on or before 6/15/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 5/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment to the extent Plaintiffs claims are based on the U.S. Constitution. The Clerk of Court shall correct the caption to reflect the correct name of Defendant Bruce Bannister, incorrectly named as Robert Bannister. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING (a) all claims against the State of Nevada and the Nevada Department of Corrections; and (b) all claims for monetary damages against Defendants Robert Bannister, Howard Skolnik, and John Doe. The Court will grant Plaintiff leave to amend the complaint within 30 days of entry of this order as to the claims for monetary damages against Defendants Bannister, Skolnik and Doe in their individual capacity. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall clearly title the amended complaint. Cle rk shall provide Plaintiff with a copy of the Complaint along with two copies of a 1983 complaint form and instructions. ( Amended Complaint deadline: 2/4/2011.) Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 1/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; copies of complaint and blank 1983 form with instructions to Plaintiff- MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Bannister et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bannister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department Of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Skolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Nevada
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredric Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?