Righthaven LLC v. Newman Featured Case

Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Garry Newman
Case Number: 2:2010cv01762
Filed: October 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER on Mandate as to 41 USCA Order DISMISSING 38 Notice of Appeal filed by Righthaven LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/30/11. (EDS)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, Dismissing 38 Notice of Appeal filed by Righthaven LLC. This Order shall act as the mandate for the Court of Appeals. (ASB)
November 9, 2011 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD on 38 Notice of Appeal. The record on appeal, consisting of the reporter's transcripts and the United States District Court clerk's record is ready for the purpose of the appeal. This file exists in electronic format and is accessible via CM/ECF - PACER. The documents comprising the United States District Court clerk's record have been numbered in conformance with Rule 11(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. These document numbers are reflected on the United States District Court's docket sheet and should be used for reference purposes in the briefs. Appeals in Habeas Corpus and 28 USC 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence cases are treated as civil appeals in the Court of Appeals. Criminal appeals briefing schedules will be issued upon the filing of this document. Notice sent to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. (no image attached) (ECS)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER for Time Schedule as to 38 Notice of Appeal filed by Righthaven LLC. USCA Case Number 11-17690. (ECS)
November 7, 2011 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 35 Order Dismissing Case by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-2175649. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Mangano, Shawn)
October 7, 2011 Filing 37 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 Order Dismissing Case, # 2 Judgment) (ASB)
October 7, 2011 Filing 36 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Facepunch Studios Ltd and Garry Newman and against Righthaven LLC with prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying 23 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order Dated July 22, 2011. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/23/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 1, 2011 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter and Personal First Amended Complaint ; filed by Defendant Garry Newman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(DiRaimondo, Anthony)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 30 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter and Personal First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 8/22/2011. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 22, 2011 Filing 31 RESPONSE to 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter and Personal First Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 9/1/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
August 19, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (Second Request) re 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter and Personal First Amended Complaint, 29 Order on Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Dispositive matter, by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 8/19/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter and Personal First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 8/19/2011. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 17, 2011 Filing 28 NON-OPPOSITION to 27 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) re 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter and Personal First Amended Complaint ; filed by Defendant Garry Newman. (DiRaimondo, Anthony)
August 16, 2011 Filing 27 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) re 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter and Personal First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 8/16/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
August 5, 2011 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
August 1, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Subject Matter and Personal First Amended Complaint by Defendant Garry Newman. Responses due by 8/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(DiRaimondo, Anthony)
August 1, 2011 Filing 24 RESPONSE to 23 Emergency MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 21 Amended Complaint, 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Add and Terminate Parties, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings On Shortened Time Pursuant to LR 6-1(a), filed by Defendant Garry Newman. Replies due by 8/11/2011. (DiRaimondo, Anthony).
July 22, 2011 Filing 23 Emergency MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re 21 Amended Complaint, 22 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Add and Terminate Parties, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings On Shortened Time Pursuant to LR 6-1(a) by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Responses due by 8/8/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant Garry Newman terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 16, 2011 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT As a Matter of Right Pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(1) with Jury Demand against Garry Newman, filed by Righthaven LLC. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 11/13/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits1A-2A) (Mangano, Shawn)
June 28, 2011 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Garry Newman in Support of 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ; by Defendant Garry Newman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Certificate of Incorporation of Facepunch Studios Ltd.)(Zralek, Stephen) Modified text on 7/7/2011 (SRK).
June 28, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; by Defendant Garry Newman. Responses due by 7/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Copyright Office records re: Work in Question, # 2 Exhibit B - Copy of SAA (Strategic Alliance Agreement) between Righthaven and Stephens Media, LLC, produced in Righthaven v. Democratic Underground, Doc. 79-1 at pp. 6-32, # 3 Exhibit C - Order Unsealing SAA in Righthaven v. Democratic Underground, Doc. 93, # 4 Exhibit D - Order Dismissing Complaint in Righthaven v. Democratic Underground, ___ F.3d ___, 2011 WL 2378186 (D. Nev. June 14, 2011), # 5 Exhibit E - Copy of SAA (Strategic Alliance Agreement) between Righthaven and Stephens Media, LLC, and of May 9, 2011 Clarification, attached to Declaration of Righthaven CEO Steven Gibson, filed in Righthaven v. Hoehn as Doc. 25 thereto, # 6 Exhibit F - Order Dismissing Complaint in Righthaven v. Hoehn, No. 2:11-cv-00050-PMP-RJJ (D. Nev. June 20, 2011), # 7 Exhibit G - Cable News Network, L.P. v. GoSMS.com, Inc., No. 00-Civ-4812 (LMN), 2000 WL 1678039 (S.D.N.Y. Nov. 6, 2000) (unpublished), # 8 Exhibit H - Salomon v. A. Salomon & Co., Ltd., 1897 A.C. 22 (H.L.))(Zralek, Stephen) .
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen J. Zralek and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Kirk B. Lenhard for Garry Newman. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/21/11. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 20, 2011 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC, Other Affiliate Stephens Media LLC for Righthaven LLC added. Amended Certificate of Interested Parties. (Mangano, Shawn)
June 10, 2011 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Defendant's Responsive Pleading by Defendant Garry Newman. (DiRaimondo, Anthony)
June 10, 2011 Filing 15 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stephen J. Zralek and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kirk B. Lenhard (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-2014348) filed by Defendant Garry Newman. Motion ripe 6/10/2011. (Lenhard, Kirk)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Righthaven, LLC. Anne Pieroni withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 6, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with Certificate of Service by Anne Pieroni. by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 4/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Pieroni, Anne)
April 6, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shawn A. Mangano on behalf of Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. with Certificate of Service (Mangano, Shawn)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Foreign Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/21/2011) (ASB).
March 16, 2011 Filing 10 First MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter For Service of Foreign Individual re 9 Notice re 4m Dismissal, 3 Summons Issued, 7 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 3/16/2011. (Pieroni, Anne)
February 16, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The complaint in this action was filed on* 10/12/10.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Garry Newman.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 3/18/2011. (SRK)
February 1, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne Pieroni on behalf of Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. with Certificate of Service (Pieroni, Anne)
October 25, 2010 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Garry Newman re 1 Complaint. (ECS)
October 22, 2010 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Coons, John)
October 15, 2010 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
October 12, 2010 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (ECS, copy of complaint sent)
October 12, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Garry Newman re 1 Complaint. (ECS)
October 12, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (ECS)
October 12, 2010 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (ECS)
October 12, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Garry Newman (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1762200), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/22/2010. Proof of service due by 2/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?