Hampton v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Audrey Hampton
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. and Federal Loan Mortgage Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv01775
Filed: October 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Dismissal Granting 98 STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER that counsel for parties shall file a Joint Pretrial Order by 6/16/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that a stay of the completion of discovery and the filing of the joint pretrial order is granted until February 8, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to file a status report on or before February 5, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/5/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that parties shall file a status report with the Court no later than 3/15/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that a Status Report is due by 12/4/2012. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 09/05/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 6/5/2012. Motions due by 7/5/2012. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/6/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/5/2012. Motions due by 4/4/2012. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/4/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The negligent and intentional misrepresentation claims remain. All other claims are dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Loan Mortgage Company is DISMISSED from this case. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 5/11/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (#1, Ex. 1) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs Motion to Stay 17 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/11/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: J. Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: J. Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Loan Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Hampton
Represented By: Gary S. Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?