Colony Insurance Company v. Kuehn et al

Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Defendant: Joe Fallini, Susan Fallini, Thomas Gibson, Gibson & Kuehn, LLP and Harold Kuehn
Case Number: 2:2010cv01943
Filed: November 4, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company against Defendants Thomas Gibson, Gibson & Kuehn, LLP, Harold Kuehn, Joe Fallini, and Susan Fallini. Colony's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. This Court finds and declares tha t Plaintiff has no duty ot defend or indemnify Defendants Harold Kuehn, Thomas Gibson and Gibson & Kuehn, LLP in connection with the Fallini lawsuit. This Final Judgment and declaration are binding as against Defendants Joe Fallini and Susan Fallini. Colony is entitled to costs of suit incurred herein. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 25, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 82 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall provide a proposed form of declaratory judgment consistent with this Order within seven days. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 18, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 83 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that Defendant Kuehn is instructed to show cause within 14 days of this order why he should not be held in civil contempt. FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant Kuehn fails to comply with this Order within 14 days, he will be fined $250.00 per day until such time as he complies with this Order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 25, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting and Affirming 64 Report and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' affirmative defense regarding Mr. Kuehn's alleged mental state be STRICKEN from Defendants' answer. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/25/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 1, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Kuehn is ordered to pay the Fallini Defendants the sum total of $1,350 by June 1, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 5/1/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 28, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Ralph E. Porter. FURTHER ORDERED that Thomas Gibson shall have until 1/20/12 to advise the Court if he will retain new counsel. While Thomas Gibson may choose to retain new counsel or proceed in proper person, Gibson & Kuehn LLP must retain new counsel if it intends to continue to litigate this matter. Clerk shall update the docket to reflect the last know addresses of Thomas Gibson and Gibson & Kuehn LLP and serve them with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 17, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 28 Defendants Thomas Gibson and Gibson and Kuehn, LLP's Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 38 Colony Insurance Company's Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 5, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Kuehn is ordered to pay Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company the sum total of $4,058. Defendant is further ordered to make the payment to Plaintiff by November 4, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 20, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 41 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. Plaintiffs motion to compel Defendants Thomas Gibson and/or Gibson & Kuehn, LLP to answer Interrogatory No. 8 is Denied. Plaintiffs motion to strike or dismiss Defendants Thomas Gibson and/or Gibson & Kuehn, LLPs affirmative defenses is Denied, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 2, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Amend the Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/29/2012. Motions due by 3/29/2012. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 30, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 40 Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Harold Kuehn. Counsel for Plaintiff shall, no later than 15 days from entry of this order, serve and file a memorandum. Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to the Nevada State Bar. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/29/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, Mailed Copy to NV State Bar - SLR)
May 11, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 31 Substitution of Counsel. Defendant Thomas J. Gibson substitutes Attorney Ralph E. Porter as counsel in place and stead of Attorney Thomas J. Gibson. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 20, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on this matter scheduled for 4/28/2011 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colony Insurance Company v. Kuehn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph P. Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Fallini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Fallini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibson & Kuehn, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Kuehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?