October 2, 2012 |
Filing
97
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company against Defendants Thomas Gibson, Gibson & Kuehn, LLP, Harold Kuehn, Joe Fallini, and Susan Fallini. Colony's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. This Court finds and declares tha t Plaintiff has no duty ot defend or indemnify Defendants Harold Kuehn, Thomas Gibson and Gibson & Kuehn, LLP in connection with the Fallini lawsuit. This Final Judgment and declaration are binding as against Defendants Joe Fallini and Susan Fallini. Colony is entitled to costs of suit incurred herein. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 25, 2012 |
Filing
95
ORDER Granting 82 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall provide a proposed form of declaratory judgment consistent with this Order within seven days. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/25/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 18, 2012 |
Filing
94
ORDER REGARDING 83 Report and Recommendation. ORDERED that Defendant Kuehn is instructed to show cause within 14 days of this order why he should not be held in civil contempt. FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant Kuehn fails to comply with this Order within 14 days, he will be fined $250.00 per day until such time as he complies with this Order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 25, 2012 |
Filing
93
ORDER Adopting and Affirming 64 Report and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' affirmative defense regarding Mr. Kuehn's alleged mental state be STRICKEN from Defendants' answer. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/25/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 1, 2012 |
Filing
90
ORDER that Defendant Kuehn is ordered to pay the Fallini Defendants the sum total of $1,350 by June 1, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 5/1/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 28, 2011 |
Filing
65
ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Ralph E. Porter. FURTHER ORDERED that Thomas Gibson shall have until 1/20/12 to advise the Court if he will retain new counsel. While Thomas Gibson may choose to retain new counsel or proceed in proper person, Gibson & Kuehn LLP must retain new counsel if it intends to continue to litigate this matter. Clerk shall update the docket to reflect the last know addresses of Thomas Gibson and Gibson & Kuehn LLP and serve them with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 17, 2011 |
Filing
56
ORDER Denying 28 Defendants Thomas Gibson and Gibson and Kuehn, LLP's Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 38 Colony Insurance Company's Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
October 5, 2011 |
Filing
55
ORDER that Defendant Kuehn is ordered to pay Plaintiff Colony Insurance Company the sum total of $4,058. Defendant is further ordered to make the payment to Plaintiff by November 4, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing
54
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 41 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. Plaintiffs motion to compel Defendants Thomas Gibson and/or Gibson & Kuehn, LLP to answer Interrogatory No. 8 is Denied. Plaintiffs motion to strike or dismiss Defendants Thomas Gibson and/or Gibson & Kuehn, LLPs affirmative defenses is Denied, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 2, 2011 |
Filing
52
ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Amend the Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/29/2012. Motions due by 3/29/2012. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 30, 2011 |
Filing
50
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 40 Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Harold Kuehn. Counsel for Plaintiff shall, no later than 15 days from entry of this order, serve and file a memorandum. Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to the Nevada State Bar. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/29/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, Mailed Copy to NV State Bar - SLR)
|
May 11, 2011 |
Filing
32
ORDER Granting 31 Substitution of Counsel. Defendant Thomas J. Gibson substitutes Attorney Ralph E. Porter as counsel in place and stead of Attorney Thomas J. Gibson. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on this matter scheduled for 4/28/2011 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|