Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Bennett et al

Plaintiff: Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc., Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC and Herbert Reed
Defendant: Jean Bennett, Five Platters, Inc. and Personality Productions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv01981
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 90 Emergency Motion to Set Aside Order and Judgment and Denying 93 Plaintiffs' Counter Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 14, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiffs against Jean Bennett. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 26, 2011 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees 67 is GRANTED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 18, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 71 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 26, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 67 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 23, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 68 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/23/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 30, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant's motion to dismiss 53 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment of trademark infringement 46 is GRANTED. The preliminary injunction 19 is converted into a permanent injunction with full force an d effect against all defendants. Plaintiffs' motion for declaratory relief as to defendant's common law claims 46 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' motion to extend time to file motion for attorneys' fees 63 is DENIED as untimely. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 16, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to Defendants Five Platters, Inc. and Personality Productions, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/16/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 6, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $8,796.00 in attorney fees and $3,489.90 in costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 5/6/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 31, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a hearing by telephone conference call is scheduled for April 13, 2011, at 9:00 AM on Plaintiffs Motion For Attorneys Fees and Costs 33 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 17, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that a hearing is scheduled for 3/30/2011 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston re 37 Motion to Extend Time to Retain Counsel. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant, Jean Bennett, must be present in court for this hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 25, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the Filing of a Joint Interim Discovery Status Report due by 5/13/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 1/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 21, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs shall post bond in the amount of $100.00. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Jean Bennett's counter-motion for summary judgment 13 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/21/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Bennett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Platters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personality Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb Reed Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herb Reed Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Reed
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?