Righthaven LLC v. Leighton et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: John Leighton and Leighton Law, P.A.
Case Number: 2:2010cv02067
Filed: November 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2011 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Roger L. Hunt, on January 7, 2011.To properly distribute the case load for the magistrate judges in the District of Nevada, IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge George W. Foley, Jr., U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings consistent with his jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2-10-cv-2067-JCM-GWF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
December 28, 2010 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Answer to Complaint and Certificate Required by Local Rule 10-6 by Defendants John Leighton, Leighton Law, P.A. re 8 Certificate of Interested Parties, 7 Answer to Complaint. (Stoberski, Michael)
December 27, 2010 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by John Leighton, Leighton Law, P.A.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Stoberski, Michael)
December 27, 2010 Filing 7 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by John Leighton, Leighton Law, P.A.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/6/2011. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/10/2011.(Stoberski, Michael)
December 2, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
November 30, 2010 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to John Leighton and Leighton Law, P.A. (EDS)
November 29, 2010 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Coons, John)
November 24, 2010 Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 complaint) (EDS)
November 24, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS)
November 24, 2010 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (EDS)
November 24, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Leighton, Leighton Law, P.A. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1805918), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/4/2010. Proof of service due by 3/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Leighton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leighton Law, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?