Righthaven LLC v. Pak.org et al
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Defendant: Azkar Choudhry and Pak.org
Case Number: 2:2010cv02155
Filed: December 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 43 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendants and the case closed. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Denying 28 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/21/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, to strike the declaratory relief counterclaim. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/3/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Pak.org et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azkar Choudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pak.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?