Fuoroli et al v. Westgate Planet Hollywood Las Vegas, LLC, Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael C. Fuoroli and Tiffany S Fuoroli
Defendant: Chasun Irwin, Westgate Planet Hollywood Las Vegas, LLC, Central Florida Investments, Inc. and Denise Chen
Case Number: 2:2010cv02191
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER that 181 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs is DENIED without prejudice as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 182 Motion to Amend or Correct the Judgment, or, in the alternative, for New Trial is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER that the oral motion of the defendants for judgment pursuant to FRCP 50(a) is granted. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the defendants on the claims of the plaintiff. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER that 111 Motion to Modify Pretrial Order is GRANTED as enumerated in this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that 112 Motion to Amend Answer is GRANTED. Defendants shall file the Proposed Amended Answer (Doc. #112, Exh. A) within three days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 90 Motion for Reconsideration. FURTHER ORDERED that 99 Motion to Strike is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' jury demand is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting 92 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to 88 MOTION to Reopen Discovery (First Request) re 61 Scheduling Order. Response due by 7/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Denying 70 Defendants' Renewed Motion to Strike Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that 62 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Denying 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Denying as Moot 50 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/23/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that defendants motion to dismiss 11 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part pursuant to the analysis set forth in the body of the order. Defendants motion to strike jury trial 12 is hereby DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/16/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuoroli et al v. Westgate Planet Hollywood Las Vegas, LLC, Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Fuoroli
Represented By: Hans Baldau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany S Fuoroli
Represented By: Hans Baldau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasun Irwin
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Represented By: Kathryn G Saft
Represented By: Kaempfer Crowell Renshaw Gronauer & Fiorentino
Represented By: Lisa J Zastrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westgate Planet Hollywood Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Represented By: Kathryn G Saft
Represented By: Kaempfer Crowell Renshaw Gronauer & Fiorentino
Represented By: Lisa J Zastrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Florida Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa J Zastrow
Represented By: Kaempfer Crowell Renshaw Gronauer & Fiorentino
Represented By: Kathryn G Saft
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Chen
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Represented By: Kathryn G Saft
Represented By: Kaempfer Crowell Renshaw Gronauer & Fiorentino
Represented By: Lisa J Zastrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?