v. $3630.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $3630.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 2:2010cv02200
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE in favor of the United States of America against the: (1) $3,630.00 in United States Currency; (2) Brandon Johnson; (3) Nina Scott; (4) La-Ninja Rockymore; and (5) Tara Stafford; and all persons or entities who claim an interest in the defendant property in the above-entitled action. FURTHER ORDERED that said property be, and the same is hereby forfeited to the United States of America, and no right, title, or interest in the property shall exist in an y other party. HEREBY CERTIFIED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2465(a)(2), that there was reasonable cause for the seizure or arrest of the defendant property. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 4/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE in favor of United States of America against $3630.00 in United States Currency and all persons or entities who claim an interest in the defendant property in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that said property be, and the same is hereby forfeited to the United States of America, and not right, title, or interest in the property shall exist in any other party. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/20/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Lift Stay. Proof of service due by 5/29/2012. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/30/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Government shall have until March 30, 2012 to file a motion for summary judgment or other pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/14/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED counsel for the Government shall file a Status Report no later than August 12, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 8/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the Property. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/22/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. $3630.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kathleen Bliss
Represented By: Nicholas D Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3630.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?