Rivard-Crook et al v. Accelerated Payment Technologies, Inc.

Defendant: Accelerated Payment Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ramon Corona, Bill Crook, Monique DeChaine, Charles Drake, Jr., Lenora Hayes, Risa Herrera, Nate Imahara, Erika Knapp, Sandra Laue, John Lawrence, Arcelia Maldonado, Barbara Rivard-Crook, Kelly Stevens and Rick Wright
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv02215
Filed: December 20, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2013 134 Featured Case ORDER that, in the event the District Judge affirms this Courts 106 Order, Defendant Accelerated Payment Technologies, Inc. shall pay the Rivard-Crook Plaintiffs attorneys fees in the amount of $8,940.00 within 14 days after the District Judg es order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event the District Judge affirms this Courts 106 Order, Defendant Accelerated Payment Technologies, Inc. shall pay Consolidated Plaintiffs attorneys fees in the amount of $1,854.00 within 14 days after the District Judges order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 02/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 10, 2013 170 Featured Case ORDER Denying 107 Defendant's Rule 72 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Foley's Order. Defendant is ordered to comply with Judge Foley's Order within 5 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 9, 2011 17 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Confidentiality of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 5, 2013 184 Featured Case ORDER re parties' 181 and 182 applications for a status check as to 138 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 147 Motion to Complete Discovery. The Court is working on motions submitted before August 31, 2013, and will be moving through them chronologically. Oral argument will be scheduled if the Court determines argument is necessary. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 8, 2014 189 Featured Case ORDER Denying 138 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 1, 2014 206 Featured Case ORDER Granting 203 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Remove Counsel of Record. Attorneys Madeline L DiCicco and Lance W Johns terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 04/01/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 7, 2014 208 Featured Case ORDER Denying 194 Motion for Clarification. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 24, 2012 39 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff Todd Granat and Steve Gautiers Emergency Motion for Protective Order and Attorneys Fees 35 is granted. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall, no later than 15 days from entry of this order, serve and file a memorandum, supported by th e affidavit of counsel, establishing the amount of attorneys fees and costs incurred in the motions addressed in this order. Defendant shall have 15 days from service of the memorandum of costs and attorneys fees in which to file a responsive memoran dum addressing the reasonableness of the costs and fees sought, and any equitable considerations deemed appropriate for the court to consider in determining the amount of costs and fees which should be awarded. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall have 11 days from service of the responsive memorandum in which to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 22, 2012 45 Featured Case ORDER that Defendant Accelerated Payment Technologies is to pay Plaintiffs Todd Granat and Steve Gautier the total sum of $2,067.50. Defendant is further ordered to make full payment to Plaintiffs by Thursday, April 5, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/22/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
April 12, 2012 49 Featured Case REVISED Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/12/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 10, 2012 85 Featured Case ORDER Granting 63 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint within seven (7) days from the entry of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 64 Plaintiffs Motion for the Imposition of a Constructive Trust is DENIED. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rivard-Crook et al v. Accelerated Payment Technologies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accelerated Payment Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Silbergeld
Represented By: Eileen O'Brien
Represented By: Tegan C Machnich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Corona
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Crook
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique DeChaine
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Drake, Jr.
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora Hayes
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Risa Herrera
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nate Imahara
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Knapp
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Laue
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lawrence
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arcelia Maldonado
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Rivard-Crook
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Stevens
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Wright
Represented By: Craig A. Marquiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]