Libres v. Bank Of America et al
Plaintiff: Eduardo D Libres
Defendant: LR Financial, LLC, Lawyers Title of Nevada, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Bank Of America and Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00115
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 21 Defendant Laywers Title of Nevada, Inc's Motion for Judgment. The case is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Laywers Title of Nevada, Inc's. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/6/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying 23 Motion to Allow Plaintiff a Discovery Pursuant to Rule 26 without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 8/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to 21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Response due by 8/29/2011. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Extend Deadline. Responses due by 8/1/2011 re 21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss as to Defendants Bank of America, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Libres v. Bank Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LR Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawyers Title of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary T. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Represented By: Diana S. Erb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Represented By: Diana S. Erb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Diana S. Erb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo D Libres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?