September 28, 2023 |
Filing
565
ORDER for Supplemental brief re 564 Unopposed Motion. Brief due by 10/12/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/28/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 9/29/2023 (HAM).
|
January 31, 2023 |
Filing
563
ORDER Granting 562 Motion to Change Venue or Transfer to Elko County, Nevada for Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/31/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
|
January 9, 2017 |
Filing
551
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED the January 31, 2017 Calendar Call and the February 6, 2017 trial setting are vacated. By February 10, 2017, the parties shall submit a stipulation and proposed order dismissing this case or a joint report on the status of their efforts to finalize their settlement. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 01/09/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
September 15, 2016 |
Filing
547
ORDER Granting 540 Motion for an Exception to the Attendance Requirements at the Settlement Conference and 546 Joinder. Central Washington Asphalt, Donald Frank Hannon, Chip Fenton, and Fenton Trucking are excused from attending the September 28, 2016 settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 09/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
September 8, 2016 |
Filing
543
ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accepting 531 Report and Recommendation GRANTING 523 Motion. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
August 11, 2016 |
Filing
537
ORDER Granting 536 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
July 22, 2016 |
Filing
525
ORDER re 523 Motion filed by Central Washington Asphalt, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 21, 2016 |
Filing
524
ORDER Granting 518 Motion to Substitute Party. Estate of Mitchell Forrest Zemke substituted for Mitchell Forest Zemke. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Filing
522
ORDER re 520 Unopposed Motion. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
March 7, 2016 |
Filing
505
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiffs' 464 Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions Due to Spoliation. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 03/07/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
March 4, 2016 |
Filing
503
ORDER Granting 474 Motion to Strike Joinders 461 , 462 , and 463 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 18, 2016 |
Filing
499
ORDER Denying as Moot Defendants' 438 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 02/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
October 27, 2015 |
Filing
495
ORDER Granting 493 Motion for Removal of Electronic Servicelist as to Elizabeth Mikesell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
September 8, 2015 |
Filing
471
ORDER Granting 470 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply to 430 , 431 , 432 , 433 , 434 , 435 , 436 , and 437 Motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 10/9/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
August 13, 2015 |
Filing
451
ORDER Granting 450 Stipulation to Extend Time to Re ply to 429 Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 8/27/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
445
ORDER Denying 386 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying 418 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
July 14, 2015 |
Filing
443
ORDER Granting 442 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 428 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 8/28/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
July 10, 2015 |
Filing
440
ORDER Granting 439 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 430 , 432 , 434 , 436 , and 438 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/28/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
426
ORDER Granting 425 Stipulation for Dismissal of Phillip Law's Claims, with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
424
ORDER Granting 423 Stipulation to Extend Deposition Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing
422
ORDER Granting 421 Stipulation for Dismissal of Dorren Law's Claims with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
April 1, 2015 |
Filing
417
ORDER Accepting 411 Report and Recommendation. It Is Ordered that 387 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is Granted. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
February 4, 2015 |
Filing
400
ORDER Granting 342 Motion to Reopen Discovery. The Slagowskis are granted LEAVE to file a Motion to Compel by 2/16/2015. Responses are due by 2/23/2015. Replies are due by 3/2/2015. Discovery is REOPENED for the limited purpose of cond ucting discovery on the newly added aiding-and-abetting claims. Rejecting 374 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Motions due by 7/7/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/3/2015. Denying 351 Motion for Attorney Fees.Denying 370 Motio n to Preclude. Deferring 387 MOTION Determination of Good Faith Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2015 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach re: 387 MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
January 28, 2015 |
Filing
397
ORDER that Central Washington Asphalt must comply with Local Rule 26-7(a) and file a copy of Defendant Hannon's Draft Answers and Final Answers under seal by January 30, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Central Washington Asphalt must highlight or underline the differences between the Draft Answers and Final Answers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
December 11, 2014 |
Filing
385
ORDER Setting a Hearing for 2/3/2015 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach RE: 342 MOTION to Reopen Case for the Limited Purpose of Adding a New Cause of Action in the Amended Complaint 351 MOTION f or Attorney Fees 370 MOTION in Limine To (1) Preclude Use of Inadvertently Disclosed, Privileged Document During Discovery or Trial, (2) Compel Return or Destruction of this Privileged Document, and (3) for Sanctions and 374 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
November 17, 2014 |
Filing
372
ORDER Denying 367 Motion to Compel. Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order due by 11/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
October 10, 2014 |
Filing
340
ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 334 Defendants' Emergency Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that stipulation regarding schedule to complete depositions is due by 10/15/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if CWA De fendants file a motion to reopen discovery based on the new allegation in the amended complaint, that motion must be filed by 10/15/14. Any opposition to the motion to reopen discovery must be filed by 10/25/14. The reply in support of the motion to reopen discovery must be filed by 10/30/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
328
ORDER Denying 161 Motion to Dismiss. Granting 273 Motion to Amend the FRCP Rule 16 Case Management Conference Order to Allow Plaintiffs to Amend their Complaint. Plaintiff's 306 Objection to 302 Report and Recommendation is Sustained. Denying 318 Motion to Strike.Plaintiffs shall filed and serve their amended complaint immediately. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 22, 2014 |
Filing
326
ORDER re 305 Non-Opposition to 304 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 18, 2014 |
Filing
323
ORDER Denying without prejudice 143 , 151 , and 153 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
August 11, 2014 |
Filing
310
ORDER Denying 293 Objection to 288 Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing
288
ORDER Denying 251 Motion in Limine. Denying 266 Supplemental Motion in Limine. Denying 271 Motion to Strike. Denying 279 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
February 18, 2014 |
Filing
240
ORDER Denying as moot 204 and 205 Objections. Granting in part and Denying in part 208 and 210 Objections. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
July 2, 2013 |
Filing
124
ORDER Denying 73 Defendants' Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings; Denying 81 Plaintiffs' Counter-Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Sanctions; Denying 98 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions re Discovery; and Denying 101 Defend ants' Counter-Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Sanctions. The depositions of the individual Defendants must be conducted on or before 01/03/2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Dispositive Motions are due by 1/15/2014 and Proposed Joint Pre trial Order is due by 2/14/2014. Defendants 99 Emergency Motion for Protective Order was GRANTED in the courts 05/29/2013, 103 Minute Order STAYING the 06/03/2013, deposition. The Slagowski Plaintiffs counsel may re-notice Mr. Fentons deposition and examine Mr. Fenton first. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 07/02/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
97
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 5/22/2013 by Deputy Clerk: Ari Caytuero. IT IS ORDERED that 96 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone at 73 Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings Pending Anticipated Criminal Proceedings is GRANTED. The call in number is 1-702-868-4911, pass-code 123456. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 31, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER that Patricia Dean's Motion 5 to remove Candace Slagowski and have herself named as Guardian ad Litem is DENIED. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 5/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|