Coleman v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Coleman
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Power Default Services, Inc., T.D. Service Company and America Home Mortgage Acceptance, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00178
Filed: February 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant T.D. Service's Joinder 155 is APPROVED. Motion 153 is GRANTED. Motion 150 is DENIED. Renewed Motion 158 is DENIED. Renewed Motion 159 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this action shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This case is hereby closed. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying 108 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting 122 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Dana Jonathon Nitz and Raymond Jereza substituted in place and stead of Jeffrey Todd, Michael R Brooks, and Regina A. Habermas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 115 Request for Exception to Order Scheduling Settlement Conference. T.D.'s insurance carrier is excused from the settlement conference. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant T.D. Service Company must have a representative with settlement authority present in person at the settlement conference scheduled for October 18, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER that the Court Clerk will update the docket to reflect Defendant Homeward Residential, Inc., formerly known as American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc. FURTHER ORDERED that 106 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is DENIED. FURTHER ORDER ED that that the Joint Pretrial is due on or before September 13, 2013, which is 30 days after the date set for filing of dispositive motions. FURTHER ORDERED that 103 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Interim Status Report is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/29/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 95 MOTION Authorizing Recordation of Rescission of Trustee's Deed Upon Sale. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/2/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Denying 69 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. FURTHER ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 71) is hereby DISSOLVED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Preliminary Injunction Hearing currently scheduled for Friday, February 1, 2013 is hereby VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file copies of the following orders in the docket of the Eviction Action, or in the docket of any appeal thereof: (1) this Order; (2) the Courts Order granting the Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 71); and (3) the Courts Order granting in-part and denying-in-part Defendants Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 77). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/31/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 53 Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss. The Motion to Strike is DENIED. The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as to Plaintiffs first cause of action for Statutorily Defective Foreclosure Under N.R.S. § 170.080, and GRANTED as to Plaintiffs second cause of action for Quiet Title. FURTHER ORDERED that 65 Motion to Stay Pretrial Proceedings is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER that 68 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED. The temporary restraining order shall be effective until a hearing ont he Motion for Preliminary Injunction 69 can be held. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that the Motions to Strike 45 47 48 are DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs Motion Barring Defendant American Home Mortgage Servicing Inc.s Motion to Reopen Bankruptcy Case 40 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/20/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 8 and 12 Motions to Dismiss, Denying 22 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens, and Denying as Moot 29 and 36 Motions to Amend/Correct Complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 1/3/2012. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Strike 15 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Default Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Home Mortgage Acceptance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?